Caufield et al v. Colgate-Palmolive Co et al
Plaintiff: Paul Caufield and Rebecca M Staley
Defendant: Colgate-Palmolive Co., Colgate-Palmolive Co. Employee's Ret. Income Plan, Laura Flavin, Daniel Marsili and Employee Relations Committee of Colgate-Palmolive Co.
Case Number: 1:2016cv04170
Filed: June 3, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Lorna G. Schofield
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that per the Ruling, the entire proceeding is stayed pending appeal, including the parties' obligations to (i) file motions for attorneys' fees and expenses and (ii) notify the Class. Case stayed. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 8/27/2020) (va)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 284 OPINION, ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT re: 278 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Count II, Errors 1 and 3 of the Complaint, and for Entry of Final Judgment under Rule 54(b). filed by Rebecca McCutcheon, Paul Caufield. For the foregoing r easons, Plaintiffs motion is GRANTED. The relief provided in this Opinion, Order and Final Judgment is stayed to allow the parties to pursue an appeal. Defendants' request for oral argument (Dkt. No. 283) is DENIED as moot. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the motion at Docket No. 278. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 8/24/2020) (cf) Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing.
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 275 ORDER: ORDERED that Counts III-V are dismissed with prejudice on consent of the parties. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs' request for leave to file a motion for summary judgment as to Count II, Errors 1 and 3, and request entry of final ju dgment under Rule 54(b) is GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall file the notice of motion, memorandum of law and proposed order by August 4, 2020. Defendants shall file a response by August 11, 2020. Plaintiffs shall file a reply by August 14, 2020. The parties ' initial memoranda of law shall not exceed ten pages. The reply shall not exceed five pages. The parties shall rely, to the extent necessary, on exhibits filed in connection with Defendant's motion for summary judgment. No additional exhib its shall be filed. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs' request for a pre-motion conference is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the open motion at Docket No. 267.(Motions due by 8/4/2020. Responses due by 8/11/2020. Replies due by 8/14/2020.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 7/29/2020) (jwh)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER: WHEREAS, on July 10, 2020, the Court issued an Opinion and Order, granting in part and denying in part Defendants' motion for summary judgment (Dkt. No. 265). This action is therefore trial ready. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties sha ll file a letter by July 23, 2020, stating whether they wish to be referred to a Magistrate Judge, a court appointed mediator or wish to retain their own mediator for the purpose of settlement discussions, prior to the Court issuing an order setting a trial date. The parties would be assigned a different Magistrate Judge for settlement discussions than the one assigned for general pre-trial (see Dkt. No. 71). (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 7/16/2020) (jwh)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 265 OPINION AND ORDER re: 235 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Counts I and II of the Complaint. filed by Employee Relations Committee of Colgate-Palmolive Co., Colgate-Palmolive Co., Daniel Marsili, Colgate-Palmolive Co. Employee& #039;s Ret. Income Plan, Laura Flavin. For the foregoing reasons, Defendants motion for summary judgement is GRANTED in part, and DENIED in part as follows: Count I granted Count II: Error 1 denied Error 2 granted Error 3 denied Error 4 granted as to the Class, denied as to McCutcheon Defendants' request for oral argument is DENIED as moot, as is Plaintiffs' request for a pre-motion conference on the application to file a surreply. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the motion at Docket No. 235. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 7/10/2020) (cf)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file the Expert Report and Reply Expert Report of Lawrence Deutsch on ECF by May 8, 2020. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 5/8/2020) (rjm)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall file the Declaration and Expert Report of Jeff Leonard, FSA, EA, MAA & CFA on ECF by May 1, 2020. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/30/2020) (rro)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 OPINION AND ORDER re: 59 MOTION to Certify Class, MOTION to Appoint Counsel Plaintiffs Notice of Motion for Class Certification and for Appointment of Class Counsel, filed by Rebecca M Staley, Paul Caufield. Plaintiffs have shown that the appointment of the Gottesdiener Law Firm as class counsel is warranted. Plaintiffs' motion for class certification is GRANTED. It is hereby ordered that Plaintiff Rebecca McCutcheon is appointed the class representative to sue on behalf of a class of "any person who, under any of Appendices B, C or D of the Plan, is entitled to a greater benefit than his or her Accrued Benefit as defined in Plan § 1.2, provided such person received a lump sum payment from the Plan, and the beneficiaries and estates of any such person." It is further ordered that Gottesdiener Law Firm, PLLC is appointed class counsel. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the motion at Docket No. 59 and to amend the caption of this case to be: "McCutcheon, et al. v. Colgate-Palmolive Co., et al.", and as further set forth herein. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 7/27/2017) (ras)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 OPINION AND ORDER re: 25 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint. filed by Employee Relations Committee of Colgate-Palmolive Co., Colgate-Palmolive Co., Daniel Marsili, Colgate-Palmolive Co. Employee's Ret. Income Plan , Laura Flavin. For the foregoing reasons, Defendants Colgate-Palmolive Co., Colgate-Palmolive Co. Employees' Retirement Income Plan, Laura Flavin, Daniel Marsili and the Employee Relations Committee of Colgate-Palmolive Co.'s motion to dismiss is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motion at Docket No. 25. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 2/24/2017) (kgo) Modified on 2/24/2017 (kgo).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caufield et al v. Colgate-Palmolive Co et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Caufield
Represented By: Eli Gottesdiener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca M Staley
Represented By: Eli Gottesdiener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colgate-Palmolive Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colgate-Palmolive Co. Employee's Ret. Income Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Flavin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Marsili
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Employee Relations Committee of Colgate-Palmolive Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?