WEEKS MARINE, INC. et al
Petitioner: Weeks Marine Inc
Claimant: Tappan Zee Constructors LLC, Donna Amon, Leslie Conklin, Yirda Guerrero-Hernandez, New York Marine Towing, Inc. and Specialist LLC
Counter_claimant: Donna Amon
Counter_defendant: Weeks Marine Inc and IN THE MATTER OF THE COMPLAINT OF WEEKS MARINE, INC.,AS OWNER OF THE M/V TREVOR, A 69' STEEL TOWING VESSEL, OFFICIAL NO. 597716, FOR EXONERATION FROM AND LIMITATION OF LIABILITY
Cross_claimant: Tappan Zee Constructors LLC
Cross_defendant: New York Marine Towing, Inc. and Specialist LLC
Case Number: 1:2016cv04643
Filed: June 20, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: White Plains Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M. Karas
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 611 ORDER granting 610 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference or re-set time. The status conference today will be held at 12:30pm instead of 3:30pm as originally scheduled. SO ORDERED. Telephone Conference set for 11/9/2020 at 12:30 PM before Judge Kenneth M. Karas. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 11/9/2020) (jca)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 591 ORDER granting 588 LETTER MOTION to Seal Confidential Documents. Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 10/15/2020) (jca)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 533 ORDER granting in part 532 LETTER MOTION for Discovery deadline extension request. Discovery may be extended by 30 days, as to each phase. SO ORDERED. ***Deadlines Terminated*** The following deadline(s) was terminated: Expert Discovery Deadline, Fact Discovery Deadline. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 2/6/2020) (jca)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WEEKS MARINE, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Weeks Marine Inc
Represented By: RONALD BETANCOURT
Represented By: Todd Patrick Kenyon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Tappan Zee Constructors LLC
Represented By: MATTHEW M. GORDEN
Represented By: JOSEPH J. PERRONE
Represented By: Joseph John Perrone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Donna Amon
Represented By: Caspar Friedrich Ewig
Represented By: Casey M O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Leslie Conklin
Represented By: Andrew V. Buchsbaum
Represented By: Bernard D. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Yirda Guerrero-Hernandez
Represented By: Ryan Joseph Lawlor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: New York Marine Towing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Specialist LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Donna Amon
Represented By: Caspar Friedrich Ewig
Represented By: Casey M O'Brien
Represented By: Caspar Friedrich Ewig
Represented By: Casey M O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Weeks Marine Inc
Represented By: RONALD BETANCOURT
Represented By: Todd Patrick Kenyon
Represented By: RONALD BETANCOURT
Represented By: Todd Patrick Kenyon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: IN THE MATTER OF THE COMPLAINT OF WEEKS MARINE, INC.,AS OWNER OF THE M/V TREVOR, A 69' STEEL TOWING VESSEL, OFFICIAL NO. 597716, FOR EXONERATION FROM AND LIMITATION OF LIABILITY
Represented By: Jeanne-marie D. Van hemmen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Tappan Zee Constructors LLC
Represented By: Joseph John Perrone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: New York Marine Towing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Specialist LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?