Roberts v. Capital One Financial Corporation
Plaintiff: Tawanna M. Roberts
Defendant: Capital One Financial Corporation
Case Number: 1:2016cv04841
Filed: June 22, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Lorna G. Schofield
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 oc Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that, by February 22, 2022, the parties shall file either the joint letter providing a final accounting or a joint letter providing (1) an update on the status of the distribution and (2) a proposed deadline for filing the joint letter providing a final accounting. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 2/15/2022) (vfr)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 200 CLERK'S RULE 54(b) JUDGMENT re: 198 Order. in favor of Tawanna M. Roberts against Capital One, N.A.. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasonsstated in the Court's Final Approval Order dated December 1, 2020, A pproving Class ActionSettlement, the action is dismissed with prejudice, on the merits, and without taxation of costs infavor or against any party. There being no just reason for delay, final judgment is entered pursuantto Rule 54(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure See the attached Final Approval OrderApproving Class Action Settlement, Doc.#198. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 12/2/2020) (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Right to Appeal) (dt) Modified on 12/2/2020 (dt).
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 198 FINAL APPROVAL ORDER APPROVING CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AND ADJUDGED as follows: This Court has jurisdiction over the subject matter of the Action and over all parties to the Action, including all Settlement Class Members. Th is Order incorporates the definitions in the Settlement Agreement, and all capitalized terms used in this Order have the same meanings as set forth in the Settlement Agreement, unless otherwise defined herein. The Notice provided to the Settlement Class in accordance with the Preliminary Approval Order was the best notice practicable under the circumstances, and constituted due and sufficient notice of the proceedings and matters set forth therein, to all persons entitled to notice. The Noti ce fully satisfied the requirements of due process, Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23, and all other applicable law and rules. Upon the entry of this Order, the Class Representative and all Settlement Class Members shall be enjoined and barred fro m asserting any claims against Capital One and the Released Parties arising out of, relating to, or in connection with the Released Claims. There being no just reason for delay, the Clerk of Court is hereby directed to enter final judgment forthwith pursuant to Rule 54(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and further set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 12/1/2020) (rro) Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing.
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that by November 12, 2020, Plaintiffs shall certify that the settlement administrator notified class members whose opt-out requests of the reasons for such rejections, as well as their inclusion in the class. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 11/10/2020) (va)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that by November 5, 2020, Plaintiffs shall file: (1) An updated chart accounting for all actual and proposed disbursements of the gross settlement amount, with a courtesy copy in Excel format emailed to Schofield_NYSDC hambers@nysd.uscourts.gov. (2) An updated proposed final approval order, with a courtesy copy in Word format emailed to Schofield_NYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov. (3) Any published empirical data demonstrating typical attorneys' fees a s a percentage of class settlement for cases with comparable settlement amounts. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall direct the settlement administrator to notify the class members whose opt-out requests were rejected of the reasons for such rejections, as well as whether they are included in the class. Plaintiffs shall certify such notification is complete by November 5, 2020. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 10/29/2020) (ks)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER: WHEREAS, the Final Approval Hearing in this matter is scheduled for October 29, 2020, at 10:50 a.m. (Dkt. No. 176). It is hereby ORDERED that the Final Approval Hearing is adjourned to October 29, 2020 at 11:30 a.m. The Final Approval Hearing will be conducted via remote videoconference as specified in Docket No. 192. ( Telephone Conference set for 10/29/2020 at 11:30 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 10/28/2020) (cf)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER: WHEREAS, the Final Approval Hearing in this matter is scheduled for October 29, 2020, at 10:50 a.m. (Dkt. No. 176). It is hereby ORDERED that the Final Removal Hearing will be held remotely. If the parties wish to conduct the hearing via vi rtual videoconferencing technology, then they shall file a joint letter by October 16, 2020, setting forth the logistics of such technology. If the parties do not file such letter, the Final Approval Hearing will be held on the following conference call line: 888-363-4749, access code 558-3333. ( Telephone Conference set for 10/29/2020 at 10:50 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 10/13/2020) (cf)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER: WHEREAS, a preliminary settlement approval hearing is scheduled for January 7, 2020, at noon in Courtroom 110. It is hereby ORDERED that the January 7, 2020, 12:00 p.m. preliminary approval hearing will instead take place an hour earlier on January 7, 2020, at 11:00 a.m., in Courtroom 1106, 40 Foley Square. The hearing no longer will take place in Courtroom 110. (Status Conference set for 1/7/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 1106, Thurgood Marshal Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/3/2020) (cf)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 OPINION AND ORDER: re: 18 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Capital One Financial Corporation. For the foregoing reasons, Defendant Capital One, N.A.'s motion to dismiss is GRANTED. Defendant's motion for oral argument is DENIED as moot. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motion at Docket No. 18 and close this case. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 5/04/2017) (ama)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts v. Capital One Financial Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tawanna M. Roberts
Represented By: Laurie Rubinow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Financial Corporation
Represented By: Jessica Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?