White v. United States of America
Plaintiff: O'Kene White
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2016cv05057
Filed: June 27, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: New York
Presiding Judge: Loretta A. Preska
Nature of Suit: Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: On October 15, 2020, the Court granted Mr. White an extension, until December 31, 2020, to file a successive petition pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2255 and ordered that failure to file by that date would result in closing of the case (dkt. no. 150 in 8-cr-360). Because no successive § 2255 petition has been filed, the Clerk of Court shall mark this action (16-cv-3957) closed anddeny all pending motions as moot. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/31/2021) (ama)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. Counsel shall confer and inform Judge Preska by letter no later than October 9, 2020 of the status of the action/remaining claims/defendants. Failure to do so may result in the dismissal of the case, without prejudice, for failure to prosecute. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 9/29/2020) (rjm)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. Plaintiff and Counsel shall confer and inform Judge Preska by letter no later than March 9, 2020 of the status of the action/remaining claims/defendants. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/2/20) (yv) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: O'Kene White
Represented By: Colleen P Cassidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Andrew Ken-Wei Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?