Reynolds Consumer Products LLC et al v. Glencore AG et al
Plaintiff: Reynolds Consumer Products LLC and Southwire Company, LLC
Defendant: Glencore AG, Henry Bath LLC, Pacorini Vlissingen BV, Access World (USA) LLC, Glencore International AG, JP Morgan Securities PLC, Goldman Sachs & Co., JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Metro International Trade Services LLC, Glencore, Ltd., J. Aron & Company, MITSI Holdings LLC and Goldman Sachs International
Case Number: 1:2016cv05955
Filed: July 26, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Katherine B Forrest
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by David E Koropp on behalf of Reynolds Consumer Products LLC, Southwire Company, LLC. New Address: Honigman Miller Schwartz and Cohn LLP, 155 North Wacker Drive, 31st Floor, Chicago, IL, 60606, 312-701-9300. (Koropp, David)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Robert J. Palmersheim on behalf of Reynolds Consumer Products LLC, Southwire Company, LLC. New Address: HONIGMAN MILLER SCHWARTZ AND COHN LLP, 155 North Wacker Drive, 31st Floor, Chicago, IL, 60606, (312) 701-9335. (Palmersheim, Robert)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Anand C Mathew on behalf of Reynolds Consumer Products LLC, Southwire Company, LLC. New Address: HONIGMAN MILLER SCHWARTZ AND COHN LLP, 155 North Wacker Drive, 31st Floor, Chicago, Illinois, 60606, (312) 701-9300. (Mathew, Anand)
December 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 82 NOTICE OF APPEAL from #65 Memorandum & Opinion,, #66 Clerk's Judgment, #81 Memorandum & Opinion,,,,. Document filed by Reynolds Consumer Products LLC, Southwire Company, LLC. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number 0208-13146452. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (Mathew, Anand)
December 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #82 Notice of Appeal,. (nd)
December 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for #82 Notice of Appeal, filed by Southwire Company, LLC, Reynolds Consumer Products LLC were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (nd)
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 81 OPINION & ORDER re: (67 in 1:16-cv-05955-KBF) MOTION for Reconsideration re; (65) Memorandum & Opinion, filed by Southwire Company, LLC, Reynolds Consumer Products LLC. For the reasons set forth above, this Court DISMISSES the following actions: Agfa Corporation and Agfa Graphics, N.V. v. The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., et al., Case No. 14-cv-211; Mag Instrument Inc. v. The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. et al., Case No. 14-cv-217; Eastman Kodak Company v. The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. et al., Case No. 14-cv-6849; FUJIFILM Manufacturing U.S.A., Inc. v. Goldman Sachs & Co. et al., 15-cv-8307; and Reynolds Consumer Products LLC and Southwire Company, LLC v. Glencore AG et al., Case No. 16-cv-5955. In addition, as it would be futile to allow the amendment proposed by the Reynolds and Southwire plaintiffs (see Case No. 16-cv-5955, ECF Nos. 67, 69), that motion is also DENIED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at Case No. 16-cv-5955, ECF No. 67. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 11/30/2016) (cla)
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 80 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Glencore plc for Access World (USA) LLC. Document filed by Access World (USA) LLC.(Nannes, John)
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 79 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John M. Nannes on behalf of Access World (USA) LLC. (Nannes, John)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 78 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Glencore plc for Glencore, Ltd.. Document filed by Glencore, Ltd..(Lauer, Eliot)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 77 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eliot Lauer on behalf of Glencore, Ltd.. (Lauer, Eliot)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Katherine B. Forrest: Oral Argument held on 11/10/2016. (jp)
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 76 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #67 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #65 Memorandum & Opinion,, . . Document filed by Reynolds Consumer Products LLC, Southwire Company, LLC. (Wybiral, Leslie)
October 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 75 OPPOSITION BRIEF re: #67 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #65 Memorandum & Opinion,, . . Document filed by Access World (USA) LLC, Glencore, Ltd., Goldman Sachs & Co., Goldman Sachs International, Henry Bath LLC, J. Aron & Company, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., JP Morgan Securities PLC, MITSI Holdings LLC, Metro International Trade Services LLC.(Pepperman, Richard)
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER: 1. The following cases shall be re-opened for the purpose of considering any such additional arguments: Agfa Corporation and Agfa Graphics, N.V. v. The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., et al., Case No. 14-cv-211; Mag Instrument Inc. v. The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. et al., Case No. 14-cv-217; Eastman Kodak Company v. The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. et al., Case No. 14-cv-6849; FUJIFILM Manufacturing U.S.A., Inc. v. Goldman Sachs & Co. et al., 15-cv-8307, Reynolds Consumer Products LLC and Southwire Company, LLC v. Glencore AG et al., Case No. 16-cv-5955. All other matters relating to these cases remain stayed. 2. The parties shall continue to brief the motions for reconsideration according to the previously ordered schedule. (Case No. 13-md-2481, ECF No. 1087; Case No. 16-cv-5955, ECF No. 71.) 3. Oral argument on the motions to reconsider shall be held on Thursday, November 10, 2016 at 9:00 a.m. This order should not be construed in any way as constituting or reflecting the Court's view regarding the Individual Plaintiffs or Reynolds and Southwire's ability to distinguish their claims from the dismissed claims of the First Level Purchasers. The Clerk of Court is directed to re-open the actions at Case Nos. 14-cv-211, 14-cv-217, 14-cv-6849, 15-cv-8307 and 16-cv-5955. ( Oral Argument set for 11/10/2016 at 09:00 AM before Judge Katherine B. Forrest.) (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 10/24/2016) (cla)
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 73 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent The Goldman Sachs Group Inc for Goldman Sachs & Co., Goldman Sachs International, J. Aron & Company; Corporate Parent Reuben Brothers SA for MITSI Holdings LLC, Metro International Trade Services LLC. Document filed by Goldman Sachs & Co., Goldman Sachs International, J. Aron & Company, MITSI Holdings LLC, Metro International Trade Services LLC.(Pepperman, Richard)
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 72 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard C. Pepperman, II on behalf of Goldman Sachs & Co., Goldman Sachs International, J. Aron & Company, MITSI Holdings LLC, Metro International Trade Services LLC. (Pepperman, Richard)
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #70 Letter, filed by Metro International Trade Services LLC, Goldman Sachs & Co., Goldman Sachs International. ENDORSEMENT: Fine. Plaintiffs in each case would have until 11/3/16 to reply, at which time the matter shall be fully briefed. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 10/21/2016) (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 10/21/2016) (tro)
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Richard C. Pepperman, II dated October 21, 2016 re: Defendants' Joint Response to Individual Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration. Document filed by Goldman Sachs & Co., Goldman Sachs International, Metro International Trade Services LLC.(Pepperman, Richard)
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 10/26/2016 (tro)
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 DECLARATION of Leslie Wybiral in Support re: #67 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #65 Memorandum & Opinion,, .. Document filed by Reynolds Consumer Products LLC, Southwire Company, LLC. (Wybiral, Leslie)
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #67 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #65 Memorandum & Opinion,, . . Document filed by Reynolds Consumer Products LLC, Southwire Company, LLC. (Wybiral, Leslie)
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #65 Memorandum & Opinion,, . Document filed by Reynolds Consumer Products LLC, Southwire Company, LLC.(Wybiral, Leslie)
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 CLERK'S JUDGMENT: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Opinion and Order dated October 5, 2016, defendants' motion to dismiss the TAC is granted and the following cases: 13-md-2481, 14-cv-0211, 14-cv-0217, 14-cv-3116, 14-cv-6849, 15-cv8307 and 16cv5955 are closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 10/6/2016) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Right to Appeal, #2 Notice of Right to Appeal)(dt)
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 OPINION & ORDER re: (1049 in 1:13-md-02481-KBF) JOINT MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Goldman Sachs & CO., MITSI Holdings LLC, Metro International Trade Services, L. L. C., Goldman Sachs International, J. Aron & Co. For the reasons set forth above, the Court GRANTS defendants' motion to dismiss the TAC. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motion at ECF No. 1049 and to terminate the following actions: 13-md-2481, 14-cv-0211, 14-cv-0217, 14-cv-3116, 14-cv-6849, 15-cv-8307 and 16-cv-5955. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 10/5/2016) MDL Clerk notified.(cla)
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Transmission to Judgments and Orders Clerk. Transmitted re: #65 Memorandum & Opinion, to the Judgments and Orders Clerk. (cla)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF MATTHEW G. MRKONIC granting #63 Motion for Matthew G. Mrkonic to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 9/29/2016) (rjm)
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MOTION for Matthew George Mrkonic to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12794008. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Reynolds Consumer Products LLC, Southwire Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Mrkonic, Matthew)
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #63 MOTION for Matthew George Mrkonic to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12794008. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
September 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. MITSI Holdings LLC waiver sent on 8/23/2016, answer due 10/24/2016. Document filed by Southwire Company, LLC; Reynolds Consumer Products LLC. (Mathew, Anand)
September 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Metro International Trade Services LLC waiver sent on 8/23/2016, answer due 10/24/2016. Document filed by Southwire Company, LLC; Reynolds Consumer Products LLC. (Mathew, Anand)
September 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. JP Morgan Securities PLC waiver sent on 8/22/2016, answer due 10/21/2016. Document filed by Southwire Company, LLC; Reynolds Consumer Products LLC. (Mathew, Anand)
September 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. waiver sent on 8/22/2016, answer due 10/21/2016. Document filed by Southwire Company, LLC; Reynolds Consumer Products LLC. (Mathew, Anand)
September 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. J. Aron & Company waiver sent on 8/23/2016, answer due 10/24/2016. Document filed by Southwire Company, LLC; Reynolds Consumer Products LLC. (Mathew, Anand)
September 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Henry Bath LLC waiver sent on 8/22/2016, answer due 10/21/2016. Document filed by Southwire Company, LLC; Reynolds Consumer Products LLC. (Mathew, Anand)
September 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Goldman Sachs International waiver sent on 8/23/2016, answer due 10/24/2016. Document filed by Southwire Company, LLC; Reynolds Consumer Products LLC. (Mathew, Anand)
September 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Goldman Sachs & Co. waiver sent on 8/23/2016, answer due 10/24/2016. Document filed by Southwire Company, LLC; Reynolds Consumer Products LLC. (Mathew, Anand)
September 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Glencore, Ltd. waiver sent on 8/22/2016, answer due 10/21/2016. Document filed by Southwire Company, LLC; Reynolds Consumer Products LLC. (Mathew, Anand)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent China Metals Storage Transportation Development Co. for Henry Bath LLC. Document filed by Henry Bath LLC.(Haller, David)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. for JP Morgan Securities PLC. Document filed by JP Morgan Securities PLC.(Haller, David)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. for JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Document filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A..(Haller, David)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David William Haller on behalf of Henry Bath LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., JP Morgan Securities PLC. (Haller, David)
September 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting (1072 in 13md2481) Motion for Leave to File Document; granting (355 in 14cv1136) Motion for Leave to File Document. The Court has received the first level purchaser plaintiffs' motion for leave to file a sur-reply in response to defendants' reply memorandum in support of their motion for judgment on the pleadings. (ECF No. 1072.) The application is GRANTED so long as the sur-reply is filed not later than Friday, September 16, 2016 at 5:00 p.m. E.D.T. The Court would prefer that the sur-reply be less than 10 pages., ( Surreplies due by 9/16/2016.) (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 9/12/2016) (lmb)
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER: The Court is in receipt of defendants' motion for judgment on the pleadings pursuant to Rule 12(c) (the "Motion") (ECF No. 1049) and plaintiffs' opposition thereto (ECF No. 1059). The Court believes that the Motion can be resolved under Rule 12(c), but notes that plaintiffs have cited to the evidentiary record in their opposition (see ECF No. 1059) and have submitted a statement of undisputed facts (ECF No. 1059-1). The Court hereby gives notice that the Motion is converted pursuant to Rule 12(d) to one for summary judgment. To the extent plaintiffs would like to present any additional evidence pertinent to the Motion, they must do so immediately (the Court assumes that, based on the recent filing, plaintiffs have already included that which they deemed appropriate). Defendants, of course, may do the same in their forthcoming reply brief, the schedule for which is adjusted as follows: In light of this order, the Court hereby extends the deadline for defendants to submit their reply brief in support of the Motion to Wednesday, September 7, 2016., ( Replies due by 9/7/2016.) (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 8/30/2016) (lmb)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER: On August 18, 2016, the Court ordered expedited briefing on defendants' Rule 12(c) motion. (ECF No. 1052.) The Court is in receipt of the First Level Purchasers' (the "FLPs") August 18, 2016 letter motion for reconsideration, which has been filed under seal (ECF No. 1053), as well as defendants' August 19, 2016 response thereto (ECF No. 1054). The Court declines to reconsider the expedition of briefing. These issues have been well briefed in the past and all that the FLPs need submit is a short piece arguing the effect of the Second Circuit's ruling. That can be done in a few days. We need to resolve this issue one way or the other to move on. Standing is a fundamental question and the defendants' Rule 12(c) motion is by no means frivolous. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 8/19/2016) (lmb)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER administratively terminating doc. 917 Motion to Certify Class in case 1:13-md-02481-KBF. The Court hereby adjourns the remaining class certification briefing and argument schedule (see ECF No. 990). The Court intends to resolve the Rule 12(c) motion (ECF No. 1049) immediately following full briefing. The Clerk of Court is directed to administratively terminate plaintiffs' motion for class certification at ECF No. 917. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 8/19/2016) (lmb) Modified on 8/19/2016 (lmb).
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material..., Motions terminated: #44 LETTER MOTION for Discovery Entry of Protective Order addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Robert J. Palmersheim dated August 18, 2016. filed by Southwire Company, LLC, Reynolds Consumer Products LLC. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 8/19/2016) (lmb)
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - LETTER MOTION for Discovery Entry of Protective Order addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Robert J. Palmersheim dated August 18, 2016. Document filed by Reynolds Consumer Products LLC, Southwire Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Protective Order)(Palmersheim, Robert) Modified on 8/25/2016 (db).
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Robert J. Palmersheim dated August 16, 2016 re: Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' August 8, 2016 Letter. Document filed by Reynolds Consumer Products LLC, Southwire Company, LLC.(Palmersheim, Robert)
August 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Reynolds Consumer Products LLC's ("Reynolds") and Southwire Company, LLC's ("Southwire") August 8, 2016 letter (ECF No. 39) responding to the Court's July 29, 2016 Order (ECF No. 17), as well as the MDL defendants' response (ECF No. 40). The Court hereby directs Reynolds and Southwire to respond, not later than Tuesday, August 16, 2016, to the MDL defendants' proposal (contained at the end of their letter) that this action should not be synced with the MDL and that the Court should hold off on setting a detailed schedule until two months after the Court issues a decision on class certification. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 8/10/2016) (mro)
August 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Southwire Operations, LLC for Southwire Company, LLC. Document filed by Southwire Company, LLC.(Burke, Louis)
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from David W. Haller dated August 8, 2016 re: Integration of Reynolds/Southwire Action with Existing Cases. Document filed by Henry Bath LLC, JP Morgan Securities PLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Haller, David)
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STATUS REPORT. re Proposal for Syncing Action With MDL Document filed by Reynolds Consumer Products LLC, Southwire Company, LLC.(Palmersheim, Robert)
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Reynolds Consumer Products Holdings LLC for Reynolds Consumer Products LLC. Document filed by Reynolds Consumer Products LLC.(Burke, Louis)
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF ROBERT J. PALMERSHEIM granting #19 Motion for Robert J. Palmersheim to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 8/2/2016) (kgo)
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF DAVID E. KOROPP granting #28 Motion for David E. Koropp to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 8/2/2016) (kgo)
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF ANAND C. MATHEW granting #18 Motion for Anand C. Mathew to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 8/2/2016) (kgo)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Pacorini Vlissingen BV. (rch)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Access World (USA) LLC. (rch)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Glencore AG. (rch)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Glencore International AG. (rch)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Glencore, Ltd.. (rch)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Henry Bath LLC. (rch)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION for David Emilio Koropp to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12594774. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Reynolds Consumer Products LLC, Southwire Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Koropp, David)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Henry Bath LLC. (dgo)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to JP Morgan Securities PLC. (dgo)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (dgo)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to MITSI Holdings LLC. (dgo)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Metro International Trade Services LLC. (dgo)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to J. Aron & Company. (dgo)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Goldman Sachs International. (dgo)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Goldman Sachs & Co.. (dgo)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION for Robert John Palmersheim to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12593737. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Reynolds Consumer Products LLC, Southwire Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Palmersheim, Robert)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION for Anand Cherukara Mathew to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12593410. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Reynolds Consumer Products LLC, Southwire Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Mathew, Anand)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Plaintiffs Reynolds Consumer Products LLC and Southwire Company, LLC commenced this action on July 26, 2016, alleging similar claims against substantially the same defendants as those in the multidistrict litigation ("MDL") currently pending before this Court, In re Aluminum Warehousing Antitrust Litigation, No. 13-md-2481 (KBF), (S.D.N.Y.). (ECF No. 1.) In light of this substantial overlap, plaintiffs are directed to confer with the parties in the MDL and present the Court with a proposal for syncing up this action up with the MDL not later than August 8, 2016. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 7/29/2016) (lmb)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Katherine B. Forrest. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:13-md-02481-KBF. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #28 MOTION for David Emilio Koropp to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12594774. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis is so designated. (wb)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #19 MOTION for Robert John Palmersheim to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12593737. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #18 MOTION for Anand Cherukara Mathew to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12593410. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Pacorini Vlissingen BV, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Reynolds Consumer Products LLC, Southwire Company, LLC. (Burke, Louis)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Access World (USA) LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Reynolds Consumer Products LLC, Southwire Company, LLC. (Burke, Louis)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Glencore AG, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Reynolds Consumer Products LLC, Southwire Company, LLC. (Burke, Louis)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Glencore International AG, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Reynolds Consumer Products LLC, Southwire Company, LLC. (Burke, Louis)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Glencore, Ltd., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Reynolds Consumer Products LLC, Southwire Company, LLC. (Burke, Louis)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Henry Bath LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Reynolds Consumer Products LLC, Southwire Company, LLC. (Burke, Louis)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JP Morgan Securities plc, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Reynolds Consumer Products LLC, Southwire Company, LLC. (Burke, Louis)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Reynolds Consumer Products LLC, Southwire Company, LLC. (Burke, Louis)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mitsi Holdings LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Reynolds Consumer Products LLC, Southwire Company, LLC. (Burke, Louis)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Metro International Trade Services LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Reynolds Consumer Products LLC, Southwire Company, LLC. (Burke, Louis)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to J. Aron & Company, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Reynolds Consumer Products LLC, Southwire Company, LLC. (Burke, Louis)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Goldman Sachs International, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Reynolds Consumer Products LLC, Southwire Company, LLC. (Burke, Louis)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Goldman Sachs & Co., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Reynolds Consumer Products LLC, Southwire Company, LLC. (Burke, Louis)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (dgo)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (dgo)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order CASE REFERRED TO Judge Katherine B. Forrest as possibly related to 1:13-md-02481-KBF. (dgo)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents Access World (USA) LLC, Glencore AG, Glencore, Ltd., Goldman Sachs & Co., Goldman Sachs International, Henry Bath LLC, J. Aron & Company, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., JP Morgan Securities PLC, MITSI Holdings LLC, Metro International Trade Services LLC, Pacorini Vlissingen BV, Glencore International AG added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Southwire Company, LLC, Reynolds Consumer Products LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Southwire Company, LLC, Reynolds Consumer Products LLC.(Burke, Louis)
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:13-md-02481-KBF. Document filed by Reynolds Consumer Products LLC, Southwire Company, LLC.(Burke, Louis)
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Burke, Louis)
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Access World (USA) LLC, Glencore AG, Glencore, Ltd., Goldman Sachs & Co., Goldman Sachs International, Henry Bath LLC, J. Aron & Company, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., JP Morgan Securities PLC, MITSI Holdings LLC, Metro International Trade Services LLC, Pacorini Vlissingen BV. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-12579397)Document filed by Southwire Company, LLC, Reynolds Consumer Products LLC.(Burke, Louis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reynolds Consumer Products LLC et al v. Glencore AG et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reynolds Consumer Products LLC
Represented By: Matthew George Mrkonic
Represented By: Anand C Mathew
Represented By: David E. Koropp
Represented By: Leslie Scot Wybiral
Represented By: Robert J. Palmersheim
Represented By: Louis Fox Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southwire Company, LLC
Represented By: Matthew George Mrkonic
Represented By: Anand C Mathew
Represented By: David E. Koropp
Represented By: Leslie Scot Wybiral
Represented By: Robert J. Palmersheim
Represented By: Louis Fox Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glencore AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Bath LLC
Represented By: David William Haller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacorini Vlissingen BV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Access World (USA) LLC
Represented By: John M. Nannes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glencore International AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Securities PLC
Represented By: David William Haller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman Sachs & Co.
Represented By: Richard C. Pepperman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: David William Haller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metro International Trade Services LLC
Represented By: Richard C. Pepperman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glencore, Ltd.
Represented By: Eliot Lauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Aron & Company
Represented By: Richard C. Pepperman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MITSI Holdings LLC
Represented By: Richard C. Pepperman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman Sachs International
Represented By: Richard C. Pepperman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?