Diarra v. New York City
Plaintiff: Moussa Diarra
Defendant: City Of New York
Case Number: 1:2016cv07075
Filed: September 10, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S. Broderick
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 295 ORDER re: 291 Letter, filed by Moussa Diarra, 290 Letter, filed by Moussa Diarra. Diarra has provided no facts or law that I overlooked in his motion that would support the reconsideration of my earlier decision. His motion for reconsideration is therefore DENIED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 11/23/2022) (kv)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ORDER: The Court has received and reviewed Plaintiff's letter, entitled "Failure to Follow Law by District Judge Broderick (Rule 60 (d) 3)" (docket entry no. 292), and a second letter, styled as an addendum to the first (docket entry no. 293). To the extent Plaintiff seeks action based on his allegations of judicial misconduct, Plaintiff's request is improperly directed to the undersigned in her capacity as Chief Judge because such complaints are properly directed to the "clerk of the court of appeals for the circuit." 28 U.S.C.A. § 351(a) (Westlaw through P.L. 117-102). To the extent Plaintiff is requesting that the undersigned reassign this case to a new Judge, the request is denied. The Chief Judge does not have authority to take such action in cases assigned to other members of the Court. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 11/17/2022) (vfr)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER re: 288 Letter, filed by Moussa Diarra, 287 Letter, filed by City Of New York. Accordingly, Mr. Diarra's request for leave to move to reopen this case is DENIED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 11/7/2022) (kv)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 274 MEMO ENDORSEMENT denying 273 Motion to Unseal. ENDORSEMENT: APPLICATION DENIED. Consistent with my February 11, 2020 Order, (Doc. 255), Plaintiff originally filed the documents on the docket and, as stated in his letter, possesses copies of the documents that were eventually filed under seal. Therefore, Plaintiff has permission to use any copies of the documents in his possession solely in connection with the National Action Network investigation. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 9/29/2022) (kv)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 239 OPINION AND ORDER re: 178 MOTION for Summary Judgment pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56. filed by City Of New York. For the foregoing reasons, Defendant's motion for summary judgment is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to enter judgment for Defendant, terminate the pending motion, (Doc. 178), and close this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 9/20/2018) (rro) Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing. Modified on 9/21/2018 (rro).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diarra v. New York City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moussa Diarra
Represented By: Kissinger Nkosinathi Sibanda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?