Van Duppen v. Mylan N.V. et al
Plaintiff: Stef Van Duppen
Defendant: Mylan N.V., Mylan, Inc., Heather Bresch and John D. Sheehan
Case Number: 1:2016cv07926
Filed: October 11, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: New York
Presiding Judge: J. Paul Oetken
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 165 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... So Ordered. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 7/10/2020) (js)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 140 OPINION AND ORDER: re: 123 MOTION to Dismiss . filed by Kenneth S. Parks, Mylan N.V., James Nesta, Rajiv Malik, Robert J. Coury, John D. Sheehan, Heather Bresch, Paul B. Campbell, Mylan, Inc., 129 MOTION to Certify Class . filed by Meitav DS Provident Funds and Pension Ltd., Menorah Mivtachim Insurance Ltd., Phoenix Insurance Company Ltd., Menorah Mivtachim Pensions and Gemel Ltd. For the foregoing reasons, Defendants motion to partially dismiss the Third Amended Class Action Complaint is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Plaintiffs motion for class certification is GRANTED. Defendants shall file an answer to the surviving claims within three weeks from the date of this order. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motions at Docket Numbers 123 and 129. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 4/6/2020) (js)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 102 OPINION AND ORDER: re: 95 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Kenneth S. Parks, Mylan N.V., Rajiv Malik, Robert J. Coury, John D. Sheehan, Heather Bresch, Paul B. Campbell, Mylan, Inc. For the foregoing reasons, Defendants' motion to partially di smiss the Second Amended Class Action Complaint is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Defendants shall file an answer to the surviving claims within three weeks from the date of this order. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motion at Docket Number 95. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 3/29/2019) (ama)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 OPINION AND ORDER re: 45 MOTION to Dismiss . filed by Kenneth S. Parks, Mylan N.V., John D. Sheehan, Heather Bresch, Paul B. Campbell, Robert J. Coury, Mylan, Inc. Defendants' motion to dismiss the Amended Class Action Compla int is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Defendants shall file an answer to the surviving claims by two weeks from the date of this order. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motion at Docket Number 45. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 3/28/18) (yv)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Van Duppen v. Mylan N.V. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stef Van Duppen
Represented By: Phillip C. Kim
Represented By: Phillip C. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan N.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Bresch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John D. Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?