Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington v. Trump Featured Case

Plaintiff: Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington
Defendant: Donald J. Trump
Case Number: 1:2017cv00458
Filed: January 23, 2017
Court: New York Southern District Court
Office: Foley Square Office
County: NewYork
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 21, 2017 Terminate Transcript Deadlines (dt)
December 21, 2017 104 CLERK'S JUDGMENT: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Memorandum Decision and Order dated December 21, 2017, Defendant's motion to dismiss for lack of standing under Rule 12(b)(1) is granted; accordingly, Plaintiffs' claims and this case are dismissed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 12/21/2017) (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Right to Appeal)(dt)
December 21, 2017 Transmission to Judgments and Orders Clerk. Transmitted re: 103 Order on Motion to Dismiss to the Judgments and Orders Clerk. (rjm)
December 21, 2017 103 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER. Defendant's motion to dismiss is GRANTED. Accordingly, Plaintiffs' claims and this case are DISMISSED. So ordered. Granting 34 Motion to Dismiss. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 12/21/2017) (rjm)
December 1, 2017 102 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Deepak Gupta dated December 1, 2017 re: Defendant's Letter dated November 24, 2017 (Docket No. 101). Document filed by Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington, Eric Goode, Jill Phaneuf, Restaurant Opportunities Centers (ROC) United, Inc..(Gupta, Deepak)
November 24, 2017 101 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Jean Lin dated November 24, 2017 re: Post-hearing Development. Document filed by Donald J. Trump.(Lin, Jean)
November 8, 2017 100 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 10/18/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
November 8, 2017 99 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 10/18/2017 before Judge George B. Daniels. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Alena Lynch, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/29/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/11/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/6/2018.(McGuirk, Kelly)
October 25, 2017 98 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Brett Shumate dated 10/25/2017 re: correcting misstatement made during Oct. 18, 2017, hearing. Document filed by Donald J. Trump.(Shumate, Brett)
October 18, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge George B. Daniels: Oral Argument held on 10/18/2017 re: 34 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim. filed by Donald J. Trump. Plaintiff Counsel: Deepak Gupta, Jonathan E. Taylor, Joshua Matz, Joseph M. Sellers, Daniel Townsend; Defense Counsel: Jean Lin, Brett Shumate Also Present: Norm Eisen, Noah Bookbinder, Zephyr Teachout, and Court Reporter present. (Vega, Elizabeth)
October 7, 2017 97 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Deepak Gupta dated 10/7/2017 re: Supplemental Authority (Report of Office of Congressional Ethics). Document filed by Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington, Eric Goode, Jill Phaneuf, Restaurant Opportunities Centers (ROC) United, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Office of Congressional Ethics Report)(Gupta, Deepak)
October 3, 2017 96 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Daniel J. Walker dated October 3, 2017 re: Docket No. 70. Document filed by Legal Historians.(Walker, Daniel)
September 27, 2017 95 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brett Shumate on behalf of Donald J. Trump. (Shumate, Brett)
September 22, 2017 94 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 34 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim. . Document filed by Donald J. Trump. (Lin, Jean)
September 21, 2017 93 Featured Case ORDER denying 86 Motion to be heard at Oral Argument: The motion filed by amicus curiae Seth Barrett Tillman and Judicial Education Project ("JEP") requesting leave to be heard at oral argument is DENIED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/21/2017) (jwh)
September 21, 2017 92 Featured Case ORDER granting 82 Motion for Leave to Appear and join in the amicus brief filed on Tillman's behalf: The motion filed by amicus curiae Seth Barrett Tillman and Judicial Education Project ("JEP") seeking leave for JEP to appear jointly with Tillman as amici curiae and for JEP to join in the amicus brief filed on Tillman's behalf is GRANTED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/21/2017) (jwh)
September 21, 2017 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 90 Order. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (jwh)
September 21, 2017 91 Featured Case ORDER denying 84 Motion for Leave to File Document: The motion filed by amicus curiae Seth Barrett Tillman and Judicial Education Project ("JEP") for leave to respond to the brief of amici curiae by certain legal historians is DENIED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/21/2017) (jwh)
September 20, 2017 89 Featured Case MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting 80 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Attorney Matthew Douglas Spurlock terminated.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/20/2017) (jwh)
September 20, 2017 88 Featured Case ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting 81 Motion for Carrie Severino to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/20/2017) (jwh)
September 20, 2017 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 81 MOTION for Carrie Severino to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14145588. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
September 19, 2017 87 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 86 MOTION of Amicus Curiae Scholar Seth Barrett Tillman and Proposed Amicus Curiae Judicial Education Project for Leave to be heard at Oral Arguments. . Document filed by Scholar Seth Barrett Tillman. (Ray, Robert)
September 19, 2017 86 MOTION of Amicus Curiae Scholar Seth Barrett Tillman and Proposed Amicus Curiae Judicial Education Project for Leave to be heard at Oral Arguments. Document filed by Scholar Seth Barrett Tillman.(Ray, Robert)
September 19, 2017 85 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 84 MOTION for Leave to File -Motion of Scholar Seth Barrett Tillman and Judicial Education Project for Leave to file Response to Amici Curiae by Certain Legal Historians. . Document filed by Scholar Seth Barrett Tillman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M part 1, # 15 Exhibit M part 2, # 16 Exhibit M part 3, # 17 Exhibit M part 4, # 18 Exhibit M part 5, # 19 Exhibit M part 6, # 20 Exhibit M part 7, # 21 Exhibit M part 8, # 22 Exhibit M part 9, # 23 Exhibit N, # 24 Exhibit O, # 25 Exhibit P part 1, # 26 Exhibit P part 2, # 27 Exhibit P part 3, # 28 Exhibit P part 4, # 29 Exhibit Q, # 30 Exhibit R)(Ray, Robert)
September 19, 2017 84 MOTION for Leave to File -Motion of Scholar Seth Barrett Tillman and Judicial Education Project for Leave to file Response to Amici Curiae by Certain Legal Historians. Document filed by Scholar Seth Barrett Tillman.(Ray, Robert)
September 19, 2017 83 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 82 MOTION for Leave to Appear - For Judicial Education Project to Appear and Join in the Amicus Brief previously filed on behalf of Tillman. . Document filed by Scholar Seth Barrett Tillman. (Ray, Robert)
September 19, 2017 82 MOTION for Leave to Appear - For Judicial Education Project to Appear and Join in the Amicus Brief previously filed on behalf of Tillman. Document filed by Scholar Seth Barrett Tillman.(Ray, Robert)
September 19, 2017 81 MOTION for Carrie Severino to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14145588. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Judicial Education Project. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Ray, Robert)
September 18, 2017 80 MOTION for Matthew Spurlock to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington. Return Date set for 9/18/2017 at 04:00 PM.(Spurlock, Matthew)
August 31, 2017 79 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by George Fuad Farah on behalf of Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington, Eric Goode, Jill Phaneuf, Restaurant Opportunities Centers (ROC) United, Inc.. (Farah, George)
August 25, 2017 78 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Deepak Gupta dated 08/25/2017 re: Second Circuit's decision in Centro De Law v. Town of Oyster Bay. Document filed by Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington, Eric Goode, Jill Phaneuf, Restaurant Opportunities Centers (ROC) United, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Second Circuit's Decision in Centro de Law v. Town of Oyster Bay)(Gupta, Deepak)
August 25, 2017 77 NOTICE of Errata re: 54 Declaration in Opposition to Motion, 50 Declaration in Opposition to Motion, 52 Declaration in Opposition to Motion,. Document filed by Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington, Eric Goode, Jill Phaneuf, Restaurant Opportunities Centers (ROC) United, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Errata Corrected Declaration of Saru Jayaraman, # 2 Errata Corrected Declaration of Eric Goode, # 3 Errata Corrected Declaration of Christopher C. Muller)(Gupta, Deepak)
August 15, 2017 76 Featured Case ORDER granting 62 Motion to File Amicus Brief: The Motion for Leave to file Brief of Amicus Curiae by Sarah P. Cha yes in support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motion at ECF No. 62. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 8/15/2017) (jwh)
August 15, 2017 75 Featured Case ORDER: granting 63 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. The Motion for Leave to file Brief of Amici Curiae by Senator Richard Blumenthal and Representative John Conyers, Jr. in support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motion at ECF No. 63. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 8/15/2017) (ap)
August 15, 2017 74 Featured Case ORDER granting 64 Letter Motion to File Amicus Brief: The Motion for Leave to file Brief of Amici Curiae by scholars of administrative law, constitutional law, and federal jurisdiction in support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motion at ECF No. 64. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 8/15/2017) (jwh)
August 15, 2017 73 Featured Case ORDER granting 70 Motion for Leave to File Document: The Motion for Leave to file Brief of Amici Curiae by certain legal historians in support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motion at ECF No. 70. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 8/15/2017) (jwh)
August 15, 2017 72 Featured Case ORDER granting 71 Motion to File Amicus Brief: The Motion for Leave to file Brief of Amici Curiae by former government ethics officers in support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motion at ECF No. 71. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 8/15/2017) (jwh)
August 11, 2017 71 MOTION to File Amicus Brief . Document filed by Former Government Ethics Officers. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Amicus brief, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Singh, Tejinder)
August 11, 2017 70 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae By Certain Legal Historians on Behalf of Plaintiffs . Document filed by Legal Historians. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Certificate of Service, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Daniel)
August 11, 2017 69 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel John Walker on behalf of Legal Historians. (Walker, Daniel)
August 11, 2017 68 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David H. Gans on behalf of Richard Blumenthal, John Conyers, Jr. (Gans, David)
August 11, 2017 67 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tejinder Singh on behalf of Former Government Ethics Officers. (Singh, Tejinder)
August 11, 2017 66 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gregory Phillip Feit on behalf of Bruce Ackerman, Matthew D. Adler, Samuel Bagenstos, Zachary D. Clopton, Cary Coglianese, Seth Davis, Michael C. Dorf, Daniel Farber, Martha A. Field, Daniel Hemel, Pamela S. Karlan, Leah Litman, Jenny S. Martinez, Jonathan S. Masur, Jon D. Michaels, Richard Primus, Eli Savit, Peter M. Shane, Scott J. Shapiro, David C. Vladeck, Brian Wolfman. (Feit, Gregory)
August 11, 2017 65 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrea Likwornik Weiss on behalf of Bruce Ackerman, Matthew D. Adler, Samuel Bagenstos, Zachary D. Clopton, Cary Coglianese, Seth Davis, Michael C. Dorf, Daniel Farber, Martha A. Field, Daniel Hemel, Pamela S. Karlan, Leah Litman, Jenny S. Martinez, Jonathan S. Masur, Jon D. Michaels, Richard Primus, Eli Savit, Peter M. Shane, Scott J. Shapiro, David C. Vladeck, Brian Wolfman. (Weiss, Andrea)
August 11, 2017 64 LETTER MOTION to File Amicus Brief of Scholars of Administrative Law, Constitutional Law, and Federal Jurisdiction in Support of Plaintiffs addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Andrea Likwornik Weiss dated August 11, 2017. Document filed by Bruce Ackerman, Matthew D. Adler, Samuel Bagenstos, Cary Coglianese, Zachary D. Clopton, Seth Davis, Michael C. Dorf, Daniel Farber, Martha A. Field, Daniel Hemel, Pamela S. Karlan, Leah Litman, Jenny S. Martinez, Jonathan S. Masur, Jon D. Michaels, Richard Primus, Eli Savit, Peter M. Shane, Scott J. Shapiro, David C. Vladeck, Brian Wolfman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Brief of Amici Curiae)(Weiss, Andrea)
August 11, 2017 63 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief of Senator Richard Blumenthal and Representative John Conyers, Jr., as Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs. Document filed by Richard Blumenthal, John Conyers, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Brief of Senator Richard Blumenthal and Representative John Conyers, Jr., as Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs)(Gans, David)
August 11, 2017 62 MOTION to File Amicus Brief of Amica Curiae Sarah P. Chayes in Support of the Plaintiff. Document filed by Sarah P Chayes. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Brief of Amica Curiae Sarah P. Chayes in Support of Plaintiffs)(Maazel, Ilann)
August 11, 2017 61 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Emma Lerner Freeman on behalf of Sarah P Chayes. (Freeman, Emma)
August 11, 2017 60 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ilann M. Maazel on behalf of Sarah P Chayes. (Maazel, Ilann)
August 9, 2017 59 Featured Case ORDER: Oral argument on Defendant's motion to dismiss filed in the above-reference action is scheduled for October 18, 2017 at 10:30 a.m. ( Oral Argument set for 10/18/2017 at 10:30 AM before Judge George B. Daniels.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 8/9/2017) (mro)
August 5, 2017 58 DECLARATION of Rachel J. Roginsky, ISHC in Opposition re: 34 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim.. Document filed by Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington, Eric Goode, Jill Phaneuf, Restaurant Opportunities Centers (ROC) United, Inc.. (Gupta, Deepak)
August 4, 2017 57 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 34 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim. CORRECTED COPY. Document filed by Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington, Eric Goode, Jill Phaneuf, Restaurant Opportunities Centers (ROC) United, Inc.. (Gupta, Deepak)
August 4, 2017 56 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE 57 Declaration) - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 34 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim. . Document filed by Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington, Eric Goode, Jill Phaneuf, Restaurant Opportunities Centers (ROC) United, Inc.. (Gupta, Deepak) Modified on 8/7/2017 (db).
August 4, 2017 55 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE 58 Declaration) - DECLARATION of Rachel J. Roginsky, ISHC in Opposition re: 34 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim.. Document filed by Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington, Eric Goode, Jill Phaneuf, Restaurant Opportunities Centers (ROC) United, Inc.. (Gupta, Deepak) Modified on 8/7/2017 (db).
August 4, 2017 54 DECLARATION of Christopher C. Muller, Ph.D. in Opposition re: 34 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim.. Document filed by Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington, Eric Goode, Jill Phaneuf, Restaurant Opportunities Centers (ROC) United, Inc.. (Gupta, Deepak)
August 4, 2017 53 DECLARATION of Jill Phaneuf in Opposition re: 34 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim.. Document filed by Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington, Eric Goode, Jill Phaneuf, Restaurant Opportunities Centers (ROC) United, Inc.. (Gupta, Deepak)
August 4, 2017 52 DECLARATION of Eric Goode in Opposition re: 34 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim.. Document filed by Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington, Eric Goode, Jill Phaneuf, Restaurant Opportunities Centers (ROC) United, Inc.. (Gupta, Deepak)
August 4, 2017 51 DECLARATION of James Mallios in Opposition re: 34 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim.. Document filed by Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington, Eric Goode, Jill Phaneuf, Restaurant Opportunities Centers (ROC) United, Inc.. (Gupta, Deepak)
August 4, 2017 50 DECLARATION of Saru Jayaraman in Opposition re: 34 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim.. Document filed by Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington, Eric Goode, Jill Phaneuf, Restaurant Opportunities Centers (ROC) United, Inc.. (Gupta, Deepak)
August 4, 2017 49 DECLARATION of Thomas Colicchio in Opposition re: 34 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim.. Document filed by Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington, Eric Goode, Jill Phaneuf, Restaurant Opportunities Centers (ROC) United, Inc.. (Gupta, Deepak)
August 4, 2017 48 DECLARATION of Deepak Gupta in Opposition re: 34 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim.. Document filed by Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington, Eric Goode, Jill Phaneuf, Restaurant Opportunities Centers (ROC) United, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Part 1 (Definition of Emolument), # 2 Exhibit Part 2 (Definition of Emolument), # 3 Exhibit Part (Definition of Emolument), # 4 Exhibit Part 4 (Definition of Emolument), # 5 Exhibit Part 5 (Definition of Emolument), # 6 Exhibit Part (Definition of Emolument), # 7 Exhibit Part 7 (Definition of Emolument), # 8 Exhibit Part 8 (Definition of Emolument), # 9 Exhibit Part 9 (Definition of Emolument), # 10 Exhibit Part 10 (Definition of Emolument), # 11 Exhibit Part 11 (Definition of Emolument))(Gupta, Deepak)
July 11, 2017 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge George B. Daniels. Judge Ronnie Abrams is no longer assigned to the case. (ma)
July 7, 2017 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 48 MEMO ENDORSEMENT. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (ap)
July 7, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines: Replies due by 9/22/2017. (cf)
July 7, 2017 47 Featured Case ORDER granting 46 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. In light of the parties' agreement and the factors noted below, the Government's application is granted. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 7/7/2017) (cf)
July 6, 2017 46 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time and for Reconsideration of the Court's July 5, 2017 Order addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Jean Lin dated July 6, 2017. Document filed by Donald J. Trump.(Lin, Jean)
July 6, 2017 45 Featured Case ORDER granting 43 Motion for Joshua Michael Blackman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Ronnie Abrams)(Text Only Order) (Abrams, Ronnie)
July 5, 2017 44 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 40 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply; granting in part and denying in part 40 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The parties' request is granted in part. Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is due on August 4, 2017. Defendant's Reply is due on September 11, 2017. No further adjournments will be granted absent good cause. The parties' proposals with respect to page limits are approved. (Responses due by 8/4/2017, Replies due by 9/11/2017.) (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 7/5/2017) (cf)
July 5, 2017 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 43 MOTION for Joshua Michael Blackman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
July 5, 2017 43 MOTION for Joshua Michael Blackman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Scholar Seth Barrett Tillman. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Ray, Robert)
June 30, 2017 42 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Jonathan Ellis Taylor on behalf of Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington, Eric Goode, Jill Phaneuf, Restaurant Opportunities Centers (ROC) United, Inc.. New Address: Gupta Wessler PLLC, 1900 L Street, NW, Suite 312, Washington, DC, USA 20036, (202) 888-1741. (Taylor, Jonathan)
June 30, 2017 41 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Deepak Gupta on behalf of Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington, Eric Goode, Jill Phaneuf, Restaurant Opportunities Centers (ROC) United, Inc.. New Address: Gupta Wessler PLLC, 1900 L Street, NW, Suite 312, Washington, DC, USA 20036, (202) 888-1741. (Gupta, Deepak)
June 30, 2017 40 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Joseph Sellers and Jean Lin dated June 30, 2017., JOINT LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages to Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Joseph Sellers and Jean Lin dated June 30, 2017. Document filed by Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington, Eric Goode, Jill Phaneuf, Restaurant Opportunities Centers (ROC) United, Inc..(Sellers, Joseph)
June 28, 2017 39 Featured Case ORDER granting 37 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. The letter motion seeking leave to file brief of scholar Seth Barrett Tillman as amicus curiae in support of Defendant is granted. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 6/28/2017) (cf)
June 27, 2017 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. 38 MOTION for Joshua Michael Blackman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Virginia;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
June 27, 2017 38 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Joshua Michael Blackman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Scholar Seth Barrett Tillman. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Ray, Robert) Modified on 6/27/2017 (wb).
June 16, 2017 37 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief . Document filed by Scholar Seth Barrett Tillman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - Brief for Scholar Seth Barrett Tillman as Amicus Curiae in Support of the Defendant)(Ray, Robert)
June 16, 2017 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. 36 MOTION for Joshua Michael Blackman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13792657. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): expired Certificate of Good Standing from VIRGINIA.;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (ma)
June 16, 2017 36 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Joshua Michael Blackman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13792657. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Scholar Seth Barrett Tillman. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Ray, Robert) Modified on 6/16/2017 (ma).
June 9, 2017 35 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 34 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim. . Document filed by Donald J. Trump. (Lin, Jean)
June 9, 2017 34 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim. Document filed by Donald J. Trump. Responses due by 7/14/2017(Lin, Jean)
June 9, 2017 33 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James R. Powers on behalf of Donald J. Trump. (Powers, James)
June 5, 2017 32 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan Ellis Taylor on behalf of Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington, Eric Goode, Jill Phaneuf, Restaurant Opportunities Centers (ROC) United, Inc.. (Taylor, Jonathan)
May 31, 2017 31 Featured Case ORDER granting 30 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Application granted. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 5/31/2017) (ras)
May 31, 2017 30 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Jean Lin dated May 31, 2017. Document filed by Donald J. Trump.(Lin, Jean)
May 10, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 6/9/2017. Responses due by 7/14/2017 Replies due by 8/11/2017. (cf)
May 10, 2017 29 Featured Case ORDER granting 27 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document; granting 27 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint. APPLICATION GRANTED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 5/10/2017) (cf)
May 10, 2017 28 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 22 Amended Complaint, against Donald J. Trump.Document filed by Jill Phaneuf, Restaurant Opportunities Centers (ROC) United, Inc., Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington, Eric Goode. Related document: 22 Amended Complaint, filed by Restaurant Opportunities Centers (ROC) United, Inc., Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington, Jill Phaneuf.(Gupta, Deepak)
May 10, 2017 27 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Joseph M. Sellers and Jean Lin dated 05/10/2017., LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Dispositive Motion addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Joseph M. Sellers and Jean Lin dated 05/10/2017. Document filed by Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington, Jill Phaneuf, Restaurant Opportunities Centers (ROC) United, Inc..(Gupta, Deepak)
April 19, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 7/14/2017. Replies due by 8/11/2017. (ap)
April 19, 2017 26 Featured Case ORDER: granting 25 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Motions due by 6/2/2017. Response due by 7/14/2017. Reply due by 8/11/2017. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 4/19/2017) (ap)
April 19, 2017 25 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time for Briefing of Dispositive Motion addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Jean Lin dated April 19, 2017. Document filed by Donald J. Trump.(Lin, Jean)
April 18, 2017 24 Featured Case ORDER granting 23 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. APPLICATION GRANTED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 4/18/2017) (cf)
April 18, 2017 23 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Deepak Gupta dated 04/18/2017. Document filed by Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington, Jill Phaneuf, Restaurant Opportunities Centers (ROC) United, Inc..(Gupta, Deepak)
April 18, 2017 22 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint against Donald J. Trump.Document filed by Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington, Restaurant Opportunities Centers (ROC) United, Inc., Jill Phaneuf. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington.(Gupta, Deepak)
April 10, 2017 21 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Deepak Gupta on behalf of Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington. New Address: Gupta Wessler PLLC, 1735 20th Street, NW, Washington, DC, USA 20009, (202) 888-1741. (Gupta, Deepak)
February 27, 2017 20 BRIEF AMICUS CURIAE OF MARK RICHARDS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT. (sc)
February 17, 2017 19 Featured Case MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 18 Letter filed by Donald J. Trump. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Donald J. Trump answer due 4/21/2017. (Motions due by 4/21/2017., Responses due by 6/2/2017, Replies due by 6/30/2017.) (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 2/17/2017) (cf)
February 17, 2017 18 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Jean Lin dated February 17, 2017 re: Joint Proposed Schedule. Document filed by Donald J. Trump.(Lin, Jean)
February 17, 2017 17 Featured Case ORDER granting 16 Motion for Daniel A. Small to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Ronnie Abrams)(Text Only Order) (Abrams, Ronnie)
February 16, 2017 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 16 MOTION for Daniel A. Small to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13323914. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
February 16, 2017 16 MOTION for Daniel A. Small to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13323914. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing re Motion for Admission PHV for Daniel Small, # 2 Affidavit Affidavit of Daniel Small re Motion to Admit PHV, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order re Daniel Small Motion for Admittance PHV)(Small, Daniel)
February 15, 2017 15 Featured Case ORDER granting 12 Motion for Deepak Gupta to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Ronnie Abrams)(Text Only Order) (Abrams, Ronnie)
February 14, 2017 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Donald J. Trump served on 2/3/2017, answer due 4/4/2017. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington. (Attachments: # 1 Receipt - US Attorney, # 2 Receipt - Defendant Donald J. Trump, # 3 Receipt - Attorney General)(Spurlock, Matthew)
February 14, 2017 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF PRO BONO COUNSEL by Robert Abraham Braun on behalf of Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington (Braun, Robert)
February 14, 2017 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 12 MOTION for Deepak Gupta to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13313768. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
February 14, 2017 12 MOTION for Deepak Gupta to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13313768. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Gupta, Deepak)
February 10, 2017 11 Featured Case ORDER granting 10 Motion for Joseph M. Sellers to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Ronnie Abrams)(Text Only Order) (Abrams, Ronnie)
February 10, 2017 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 10 MOTION for Joseph M. Sellers to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13296555. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
February 9, 2017 10 MOTION for Joseph M. Sellers to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13296555. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of J.Sellers, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Sellers, Joseph)
January 24, 2017 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Douglas Spurlock on behalf of Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington. (Spurlock, Matthew)
January 23, 2017 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jean Lin on behalf of Donald J. Trump. (Lin, Jean)
January 23, 2017 7 Featured Case ORDER: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. Within two weeks of service of the Summons and Complaint, the parties shall submit a joint letter advising the Court of any contemplated motions, proposing a briefing schedule with respect thereto, and providing any additional information the parties believe may assist the Court in adjudicating the matter. Plaintiff is ordered to serve Defendant with a copy of this Order and to file an affidavit on the Court's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) system certifying that such service has been effectuated. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 1/23/2017) (cf)
January 23, 2017 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Donald J. Trump. (laq) (laq).
January 23, 2017 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney to RE-FILE Document No. 4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the defendant must be named on the summons form to be issued;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (laq)
January 23, 2017 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Donald J. Trump, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington. (Spurlock, Matthew)
January 23, 2017 Case Designated ECF. (laq)
January 23, 2017 Magistrate Judge James C. Francis IV is so designated. (laq)
January 23, 2017 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (laq)
January 23, 2017 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Attorney General of the United States, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington. (Spurlock, Matthew) Modified on 1/23/2017 (laq).
January 23, 2017 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington.(Spurlock, Matthew)
January 23, 2017 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Spurlock, Matthew)
January 23, 2017 1 COMPLAINT against Donald J. Trump. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-13224937)Document filed by Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington.(Spurlock, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington v. Trump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald J. Trump
Represented By: Jean Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington
Represented By: Robert Abraham Braun
Represented By: Deepak Gupta
Represented By: Joseph M. Sellers
Represented By: Daniel A. Small
Represented By: Matthew Douglas Spurlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?