Jamison v. Carada
Plaintiff: D'Anthony Jamison
Defendant: Nathan Carada
Case Number: 1:2017cv01764
Filed: March 9, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Unassigned
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER REGULATING PROCEEDINGS... This case is dismissed. If the settlement is not consummated within 30 days of this order, or an authorized enlarged date, either party may apply by letter for restoration of the action within 10 days after the close of said period. All pending court dates are cancelled. The Clerk is directed to close the case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 11/25/20) (yv)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER REGULATING PROCEEDINGS: On November 13, 2020, I held a telephonic status conference in the above-captioned matter. Parties are hereby ordered to appear for a status conference on December 4, 2020 at 10 am. Parties shall inform the court of any settlement reached prior to the status conference. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 11/13/2020) (jca)
October 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER granting 112 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. The requested extension is granted. DE # 112 resolved. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 10/9/2020) (cf)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER: granting 106 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. The request is granted. The conference is adjourned to November 13, 2020, at 11:00 a.m. DE # 106 resolved. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 9/29/2020) (ama)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER: The undersigned will not be available to conduct the trial of this case because of the demands of her additional duties in the District of Puerto Rico. Accordingly, another district judge will be requested to try the case unless both parties c onsent to proceed for all purposes before the designated Magistrate Judge, the Honorable Stewart D. Aaron. The parties are directed to meet and confer and, if both consent, so notify the Court by letter filed on the docket with a completed consent fo rm (the form may be completed in counterparts) no later than September 21, 2020, at 5:00 p.m. If both parties do not consent, they shall file a joint letter stating that both parties do not consent, without revealing the respective positions of the parties, no later than September 21, 2020, at 5:00 p.m. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 9/15/2020) (ama)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER: It is hereby Ordered that, no later than Friday, July 24, 2020, the parties shall file a joint letter indicating whether either party intends to file a dispositive motion and, if so, setting forth a proposed briefing schedule. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 7/20/2020) (ama)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER SCHEDULING TELEPHONIC SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: A settlement conference is scheduled before Magistrate Judge Stewart Aaron on Friday, July 17, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. The settlement shall proceed by telephone unless the parties advise the Court that they have access to and prefer proceeding by alternative remote means, such as by video. The Court will provide dial-in information to the parties by email before the conference. The parties must comply with the Settlement Conference Procedures f or Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron, available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-stewart-d-aaron. SO ORDERED. (Telephonic Settlement Conference set for 7/17/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 6/17/2020) (kl)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MEMORANDUM ORDER: denying 80 Motion for Reconsideration. In his opposition to Defendant's motion for reconsideration, Plaintiff asserts that the Court "should reconsider its decision dismissing plaintiff's malicious prosecution clai m." (Docket Entry No. 86 at 4.) Plaintiff's request fails to comply with the requirements for motion papers set forth in Local Civil Rule 7.1. Even if Plaintiff's request was properly submitted, it is untimely: Local Civil Rule 6.3 req uires motions for reconsideration to be filed within 14 daysafter the entry of the Court's determination of the original motion. Plaintiff's request for reconsideration comes more than two months after the Court decided Defendant's mot ion for summary judgment and Plaintiff has not proffered any explanation for his delay. Accordingly, Plaintiff's request for reconsideration of the Court's December Order (to the extent that it dismissed Plaintiff's malicious prosecuti on claim) is denied. This case remains referred to Magistrate Judge Aaron for general pretrial management. The parties are directed to contact Judge Aaron's chambers by Wednesday, June 17, 2020, to schedule a settlement conference. (Docket Entry No. 78.) This Memorandum Order resolves Docket Entry No. 80. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 6/10/2020) (ama)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting 84 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. The requested extension is Granted. No further extensions. DE # 84 resolved. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 2/03/2020) (ama)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting 76 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Request GRANTED. The Settlement Conference scheduled for January 21, 2020 is adjourned sine die. The parties shall jointly contact Judge Aaron's chambers no later than seven days after a decision on Defendant's motion for reconsideration is issued and propose three mutually convenient dates to reschedule the Settlement Conference. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 1/10/2020) (mro)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER: A settlement conference is scheduled before Magistrate Judge Stewart Aaron on Tuesday, January 21, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 11C, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007. The parties must comply with the Settleme nt Conference Procedures for Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron, available at http://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/ judge/Aaron. SO ORDERED. (Settlement Conference set for 1/21/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 12/6/2019) (js) Modified on 12/6/2019 (kl).
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MEMORANDUM ORDER: re: 50 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Nathan Cavada. For the foregoing reasons, Defendant's motion for summary judgment is granted as to (i) Plaintiff's false arrest claim arising from his April 4, 2014, arrest, (ii) Plaintiff's malicious prosecution claim, (iii) Plaintiff's denial of a right to fair trial claim arising from charges brought on April 4, 2014, and (iv) Plaintiff's handcuffing excessive force claim. Defendant's motion is de nied in all other respects. The parties must promptly contact Magistrate Judge Aaron's chambers to schedule a settlement conference. This case remains referred to Judge Aaron for general pretrial management. This Memorandum Order resolves Docket Entry No. 50. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 12/05/2019) (ama)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 OPINION AND ORDER re: 43 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Discovery conference or permission to move under Rule 37 addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Vik Pawar, Esq. dated 9/5/18, filed by D'Anthony Jamison. For the for egoing reasons, Plaintiff's Letter Motion for sanctions is DENIED. However, it is hereby Ordered that: 1) The Corporation Counsel of the City of New York shall produce to Plaintiff's counsel no later than September 28, 2018, any releva nt documents in the possession, custody or control of Larson; and 2) As agreed by defense counsel, Larson shall be made available for a three-hour deposition by Plaintiff during the period October 2 to October 12, 2018. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 9/12/2018) (kl)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jamison v. Carada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D'Anthony Jamison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Carada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?