Williams v. New York City Department of Education et al
Plaintiff: Wanda Williams
Defendant: New York City Department of Education and Teri Stinson
Case Number: 1:2017cv01996
Filed: March 17, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Alison J. Nathan
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER granting 111 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The Court GRANTS the Plaintiff's motion to extend the time to file a notice of appeal. See Fed. R. App. P. 4(a)(5). The Plaintiff filed her notice of appeal, which the court constr ued as a motion to extend time, within thirty days of the expiration of the time for appeal set forth in Rule 4(a)(1). The Court also finds that the Plaintiff has shown good cause for an extension of time because the Plaintiff did not receive a co py of the Courts judgment until May 27, 2020, and faced delays in mailing her notice of appeal due to the COVID-19 pandemic. Dkt. No. 114. Regrettably, the delay in the Plaintiff's receipt of the Court's judgment is consistent with the delays the Court has observed in its mailings to pro se litigants during the COVID-19 pandemic in other cases. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to inform the Court of Appeals of this Order. The Clerk of Court is also respectfully direc ted to mail a copy of this Order to the Plaintiff and to note the mailing on the public docket. This resolves Docket Number 111. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 6/4/2021) (vfr) Transmission to Appeals Clerk. Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER. The Court therefore ORDERS that the Defendants shall respond to the Plaintiff's letter in support of her motion by June 4, 2021. Otherwise, the Court will deem the Plaintiff's motion unopposed. The Plaintiff may file a reply with in two weeks of the Defendants' response. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mail a copy of this Order to the Plaintiff and to note the mailing on the public docket. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 5/25/21) (yv) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER: The Plaintiff shall file a brief letter in support of the motion by May 7, 2021. The Defendant shall file a response by May 21, 2021. The Plaintiff may file a reply by June 4, 2021. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mail a copy of this Order to the Plaintiff and to note the mailing on the public docket. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED., ( Motions due by 5/7/2021., Responses due by 5/21/2021, Replies due by 6/4/2021.) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 4/20/2021) (ama) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 108 CLERK'S JUDGMENT re: 107 Memorandum & Opinion. in favor of New York City Department of Education, Teri Stinson against Wanda Williams. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Opinion an d Order dated April 29, 2020, Defendants' motion for summary judgment is granted; The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal; accordingly, this case is closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 04/20/2020) (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Right to Appeal) (dt) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. For the foregoing reasons, Defendants' motion for summary judgment is GRANTED.The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to enter judgment and close this case. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good f aith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). The Clerk of Court is also respectfully directed to mail a copy of this Memorandum Opinion and Order to Plaintiff. This resolves Dkt. No. 77. re: 77 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by New York City Department of Education, Teri Stinson. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 4/29/2020) (rjm) Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing.
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER: Pursuant to the Court's Order of November 20, 2019, Dkt. No. 93, Plaintiff's opposition to Defendants' motion for summary judgment was due on November 25, 2019. As of the date of this Order, the Court is in receipt of Pl aintiff's response to two of Defendants' declarations, in addition to a filing titled "Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Notice Pursuant to Local Rule 56.2." The Court is not in receipt of Plaintiff's memo randum of law in opposition to the summary judgment motion, Plaintiff's response to Defendants' statement of undisputed facts pursuant to Local Civil Rule 56.1, or Plaintiff's own statement of undisputed facts pursuant to Loc al Civil Rule 56.1. The Court hereby extends Plaintiff's deadline to file these materials to February 3, 2020. Plaintiff may not submit these materials after this date. Defendants' deadline to file their reply is extended to February 18 , 2020. There will be no further extensions of this briefing schedule absent good cause. Chambers will mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff and note its mailing on the docket. ( Responses due by 2/3/2020, Replies due by 2/18/2020.) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 1/3/2020) (mro)
September 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re: 41 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint. filed by New York City Department of Education, Teri Stinson. For the foregoing reasons, Defendants' motion to dismiss is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The motion to dismiss is granted with respect to (a) all of Plaintiffs race discrimination claims under Title VII, the NYSHRL, and the NYCHRL; (b) Plaintiffs ADEA claims against Ms. Stinson; (c) Plaintiffs NYSHRL and NYCHRL claims against t he DOE; (d) all of Plaintiffs retaliation claims under Title VII, the NYSHRL, and the NYCHRL; and (e) any of Plaintiffs claims accruing prior to March 7, 2014 or predicated on allegations regarding her pay, performance evaluation, or harassment. Acc ordingly, all such claims are hereby DISMISSED. Because Plaintiff was previously afforded the opportunity to amend her complaint, these claims are dismissed with prejudice. However, the motion to dismiss is denied with respect to Plaintiffs remaining claims: that the DOE demoted or terminated her from employment at PS 30M for the 2014-2015 school year because of her age in violation of the ADEA, and that Ms. Stinson demoted or terminated her from employment because of her age in violation of the NYCHRL and NYSHRL. The parties are reminded that this matter remains referred to Magistrate Judge Debra Freeman for general pretrial. See Dkt. No. 7. By separate order, Judge Freeman may schedule a case management conference. As a final matter, the Court wishes to inform Plaintiff that a legal clinic operates in this District to assist people who are parties in civil cases and do not have lawyers. The Clinic is run by a private organization called the New York Legal Assistance Group; it is not part of, or run by, the Court (and, among other things, therefore cannot accept filings on behalf of the Court, which must still be made by any unrepresented party through the Pro Se Intake Unit). The Clinic is located in the Thurgood Marshall Unite d States Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, New York, in Room LL22, which is just inside the Pearl Street entrance to that Courthouse. The Clinic is open on weekdays from 10 a.m. to 4 p.m., except on days when the Court is closed. An unrepresent ed party can make an appointment in person or by calling 212-659-6190. Chambers will mail a copy of this order to the pro se Plaintiff and note its mailing on the public docket. This resolves Dkt. No. 41. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 9/29/2018) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (rro)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. New York City Department of Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Department of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teri Stinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?