Doyle et al v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security Featured Case

Plaintiff: Kate Doyle, National Security Archive, Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington and Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Case Number: 1:2017cv02542
Filed: April 10, 2017
Court: New York Southern District Court
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Katherine Polk Failla
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 16, 2017 25 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 7/14/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
August 16, 2017 24 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 7/14/2017 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/6/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/18/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/14/2017.(McGuirk, Kelly)
July 14, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Katherine Polk Failla: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 7/14/2017. (Court Reporter Rose Prater) (Lopez, Jose)
July 14, 2017 23 Featured Case ORDER: On July 14, 2017, the Court held its Initial Pretrial Conference in this case. For the reasons discussed on the record, the Court hereby imposes the parties' proposed schedule for document production and motions practice: The Secret Service will complete its search for and processing of responsive "records of presidential visitors at Mar-a-Lago," and produce any non-exempt responsive records, by September 8, 2017; Defendant will file its motion for summary judgment by September 29, 2017; Plaintiffs will file their opposition (which may include an affidavit or declaration pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 56(d)) and any cross-motion for summary judgment by November 13, 2017; Defendant will file its reply and opposition to any cross-motion by December 13, 2017; and Plaintiffs will file a reply in support of any cross-motion by January 12, 2018. ( Cross Motions due by 11/13/2017., Motions due by 9/29/2017., Responses due by 12/13/2017, Replies due by 1/12/2018.) (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 7/14/2017) (mro)
July 6, 2017 22 LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Sarah S. Normand dated 07/06/2017 re: Information Requested by Court in Advance of Initial Pretrial Conference. Document filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security.(Normand, Sarah)
May 22, 2017 21 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,. Document filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security.(Normand, Sarah)
May 17, 2017 20 Featured Case ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting 19 Motion for Anne L. Weismann to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 5/17/2017) (rjm)
May 16, 2017 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 19 MOTION for Anne L. Weismann to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
May 16, 2017 19 MOTION for Anne L. Weismann to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington, Kate Doyle, Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University, National Security Archive. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Anne L. Weismann, # 2 Exhibit Certificate in Good Standing, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Weismann, Anne)
May 11, 2017 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brad P. Rosenberg on behalf of U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (Rosenberg, Brad)
May 11, 2017 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sarah Sheive Normand on behalf of U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (Normand, Sarah)
May 11, 2017 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elizabeth J Shapiro on behalf of U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (Shapiro, Elizabeth)
May 4, 2017 15 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference and Court's Individual Rules served on U.S. Department of Homeland Security on 4/19/2017. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington, Kate Doyle, Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University, National Security Archive. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Abdo, Alexander)
April 25, 2017 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. 14 MOTION for Anne L. Weismann to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): MISSING CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING FROM THE COURT OF APPEALS FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA.;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (ma)
April 24, 2017 14 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Anne L. Weismann to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington, Kate Doyle, Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University, National Security Archive. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit Certificate in Good Standing, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Weismann, Anne) Modified on 4/25/2017 (ma).
April 24, 2017 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. 13 MOTION for Anne L. Weismann to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13577863. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): MISSING AFFIDAVIT OR DECLARATION PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 1.3 AND CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING FROM THE COURT OF APPEALS FOR DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA.;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (ma)
April 24, 2017 13 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Anne L. Weismann to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13577863. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington, Kate Doyle, Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University, National Security Archive.(Weismann, Anne) Modified on 4/24/2017 (ma).
April 20, 2017 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. U.S. Department of Homeland Security served on 4/18/2017, answer due 5/9/2017. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University; Kate Doyle; Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington; National Security Archive. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipts)(Abdo, Alexander)
April 17, 2017 11 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 7/14/2017 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 618, U.S. Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla, and as further set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 4/17/2017) (rjm)
April 11, 2017 10 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Abdo, Alexander)
April 11, 2017 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (kl)
April 11, 2017 Case Designated ECF. (kl)
April 11, 2017 Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck is so designated. (kl)
April 11, 2017 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (kl)
April 11, 2017 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Alexander Abraham Abdo to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): CIVIL COVER SHEET IS BLANK. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated July 2016. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated July 2016 is located athttp://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet. (kl)
April 10, 2017 8 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Alexander Abraham Abdo on behalf of Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University. New Address: Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University, 535 West 116th Street, 314 Low Library, New York, New York, United States 10027, (212) 854-9600. (Abdo, Alexander)
April 10, 2017 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Department of Homeland Security, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington, Kate Doyle, Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University, National Security Archive. (Abdo, Alexander)
April 10, 2017 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University.(Abdo, Alexander)
April 10, 2017 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington.(Abdo, Alexander)
April 10, 2017 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by National Security Archive.(Abdo, Alexander)
April 10, 2017 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Kate Doyle.(Abdo, Alexander)
April 10, 2017 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET - BLANK CIVIL COVER SHEET - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Abdo, Alexander) Modified on 4/11/2017 (kl).
April 10, 2017 1 COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-13522466)Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University, Kate Doyle, Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington, National Security Archive.(Abdo, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doyle et al v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kate Doyle
Represented By: Alexander Abraham Abdo
Represented By: Anne L Weismann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Security Archive
Represented By: Alexander Abraham Abdo
Represented By: Anne L Weismann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington
Represented By: Alexander Abraham Abdo
Represented By: Anne L Weismann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University
Represented By: Alexander Abraham Abdo
Represented By: Anne L Weismann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?