AMBAC Assurance Corporation et al v. US Bank National Association
Plaintiff: AMBAC Assurance Corporation and Segregated Account of Ambac Assurance Corporation
Defendant: US Bank National Association
Case Number: 1:2017cv02614
Filed: April 11, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: William H. Pauley
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER: The Court has scheduled a telephonic conference today to discuss the parties' proposed summary judgment motions. Dkt. 214. Due to a conflict, the conference will begin at 2:30 p.m., rather than 2:00 p.m. SO ORDERED. ( Pre-Motion Conference set for 9/15/2021 at 02:30 PM before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 9/15/2021) (va)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER: The above-captioned case has been reassigned to this Court. All existing deadlines, including as recently set by Judge Parker, remain in effect. To assure that this Court is up to speed on the history and trajectory of the case, within one week of the date of this order, counsel should file a joint letter addressing the following subjects, each in separate paragraphs: And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 7/29/2021) (ama)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER STAYING ISSUES RELATED TO WATERFALL INTERPRETATION granting 192 Letter Motion to Stay re: 192 JOINT LETTER MOTION to Stay Ambacs Fifth and Sixth Causes of Action addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Henry J. Rica rdo and Michael T. Marcucci dated February 9, 2021. NOW, THEREFORE, the Court ORDERS as follows: 1. Ambac's Fifth and Sixth Causes of Action are stayed while the 2005-10 Action is pending before the Second Circuit Court of Appeals. 2. Neither pa rty shall serve expert reports or otherwise engage in expert discovery related to Ambac's Fifth and Sixth Causes of Action, whether such expert discovery would fall under Phase 1 or Phase 2, as defined in the July 18, 2018 Scheduling Order (Dkt. 76) and the current Revised Scheduling Order (Dkt. 194), while the 2005-10 Action is pending before the Second Circuit Court of Appeals. 3. Neither party shall move for summary judgment on Ambac's Fifth or Sixth Causes of Action while the 2005- 10 Action is pending before the Second Circuit Court of Appeals. 4. Within ten days of the Second Circuit Court of Appeal's issuance of a mandate in the appeal of the 2005-10 Action, the Parties will submit a joint letter informing the Court of the Parties' positions with respect to whether expert discovery and summary judgment briefing related to Ambac's Fifth and Sixth Causes of Action is required in this action in light of the Second Circuit Court of Appeals' decision in the 2005-10 Action, and if so proposing a schedule for such discovery and briefing. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 2/25/2021) (kv) Modified on 2/25/2021 (kv).
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER with respect to 192 Motion to Stay. The Parties shall appear for a telephonic conference to discuss the Parties' joint request on February 23, 2021 at 3:30 p.m. The dial-in number is (888) 363-4749. The access code is 3070580. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 2/17/2021) (kv)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 191 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on 189 JOINT LETTER terminating as moot 154 Letter Motion to Compel. ENDORSEMENT: In light of the parties' status letter and representations, Plaintiff's motion to compel at ECF No. 154 is moot. The Clerk of Court is kindly directed to terminate the gavel at ECF No. 154. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 1/29/2021) (mro)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER: Non-party Bank of America shall submit a letter to this Court no later than November 19, 2020, explaining the need for the requested redactions described in Plaintiff Ambac Assurance Corporation's letter motion to seal. (ECF No. 155.) Defendant U.S. Bank National Association shall serve Bank of America with a copy of this Order forthwith and note service on the docket. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 11/16/2020) (kv)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER: Non-party Bank of New York Melon Corporation shall submit a letter to this Court no later than November 16, 2020, explaining the need for the requested redactions described in Ambac's letter motion to seal. (ECF No. 155.) (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 11/12/2020) (nb)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER granting 133 Motion to Compel. For all the reasons set forth above, U.S. Bank's motion to compel Nationstar to respond to its subpoena is GRANTED. Nationstar shall comply and produce responsive documents by no later than February 28, 2020 or face sanctions. The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to terminate the motion at ECF No. 133. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 2/3/2020) (ks)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 131 MEMORANDUM & ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, U.S. Bank's motion to amend its Answer is granted. The parties shall submit a proposed revised scheduling order by January 17, 2020. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 1/3/2020) (jwh)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 OPINION & ORDER re: 37 MOTION to Stay or Dismiss filed by US Bank National Association: For the foregoing reasons, U.S. Bank's motion for a stay is denied. Its motion to dismiss Ambac's breach of fiduciary duty claims, breach of contract claims that accrued before April 11, 2011, and Streit Act claims is granted in part and denied in part. The breach of fiduciary duty claims are dismissed to the extent that they are premised on U.S. Bank's duty to act prudentl y and in good faith. The breach of contract claims are dismissed to the extent that they are premised on U.S. Bank's obligation to certify that mortgage documents were properly delivered to the Trusts. Finally, the Streit Act claims are dismissed. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at ECF No. 37. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 6/29/2018) (jwh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AMBAC Assurance Corporation et al v. US Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMBAC Assurance Corporation
Represented By: William Robert Fair
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Teplin
Represented By: Peter W. Tomlinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Segregated Account of Ambac Assurance Corporation
Represented By: William Robert Fair
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Teplin
Represented By: Peter W. Tomlinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bank National Association
Represented By: David F. Adler
Represented By: Louis A. Chaiten
Represented By: Andrew Steven Kleinfeld
Represented By: Michael T. Marcucci
Represented By: Albert J. Rota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?