Bloomfield Investment Resources Corp v. Daniloff
Plaintiff: Bloomfield Investment Resources Corp
Defendant: Elliot Daniloff
Case Number: 1:2017cv04181
Filed: June 5, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Victor Marrero
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332fr Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 DECISION AND ORDER: Accordingly, for the reasons stated above, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion so deemed by the Court as filed by defendant Elliott Daniloff ("Daniloff") for reconsideration or leave to amend (Dkt. No. 55) is DENIED. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 6/7/2021) (js)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER FOR WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL, PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that, upon my annexed declaration, and subject to the approval of the Court, Kristen Hindley hereby withdraws as counsel for plaintiff Bloomfield Investment Resources Corp., ("Bloomfield") and shall be removed from the Case Management/Electronic Case Files (CM/ECF) notification list in the above-captioned matter. I am a partner at Reed Smith, LLP and will continue to represent Bloomfield in this proceeding. SO ORDERED. ( Attorney Kristen Giannone Hindley terminated.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 5/12/21) (yv)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 DECISION AND ORDER: Accordingly, for the reasons stated above, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion so deemed by the Court as filed by plaintiff Bloomfield Investment Resources Corp. to dismiss the counterclaims of defendant Elliott Daniloff pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Dkt. No. 53-1) is GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Elliot Daniloff and Elliot Daniloff terminated. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 4/26/2021) (mml)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER REQUEST FOR STATUS UPDATE: On July 1, 2020, the Court issued an order directing the parties to file a status update in this matter by August 15, 2020. The public file contains no record of a status update, and no other communication with th e Court has been received. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties inform the Court within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order concerning the status of this litigation. So Ordered.SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 11/12/2020) (js)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER: In reviewing the Docket Sheet for this matter, the Court noted that there has been no recorded action or correspondence known to the Court regarding the status of the matter since October 3, 2019. At that time plaintiff reported that the p arties had reached an agreement and the Court directed the parties to submit a status report by January 22, 2020. Plaintiff is directed to inform the Court by February 28, 2020 of the status of the matter and indicate whether any cause remains for co ntinuing to retain this action on the Court ' s active or suspense docket. In the event the Court receives no response to this Order by the date indicated the case shall be dismissed.SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 1/18/2020) (ks)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bloomfield Investment Resources Corp v. Daniloff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bloomfield Investment Resources Corp
Represented By: Steven Cooper
Represented By: Christopher Neil Gray
Represented By: Kristen Giannone Hindley
Represented By: Ian Marcus Turetsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliot Daniloff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?