Escobar Montiel et al v. Shamrock Saloon II LLC et al
Plaintiff: Hermelindo Escobar Montiel
Defendant: Shamrock Saloon II LLC and John Sullivan
Case Number: 1:2017cv05550
Filed: July 20, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Paul A. Engelmayer
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER: The Court adjourns sine die the conference in this case scheduled for Monday, November 16, 2020, at 10:30 a.m. The Court will first resolve plaintiffs' pending motions to strike defendant's answer and for entry of a default judgm ent, Dkt. 99, and will thereafter determine whether there is a need for a conference. SO ORDERED. ***Hearings Terminated*** The following hearing(s) was terminated: Case Management Conference. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 11/12/2020) (jca)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER: Plaintiffs have filed a third motion to strike defendants' answer and to enter default judgment against defendants. Dkt. 99. As the time to complete the depositions of the corporate defendants has now passed, the Court sets the follo wing schedule for the motion to strike: Defendants' opposition is due October 28, 2020; Plaintiffs' reply is due November 4, 2020. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 10/14/2020) ( Responses due by 10/28/2020, Replies due by 11/4/2020.) (ks)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER: In light of the extension of time to complete the deposition of John Sullivan, Dkt. 97, the case management conference presently scheduled for October 26, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. is rescheduled to November 16, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. (Case Management Conference set for 11/16/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 10/2/2020) (jwh)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER: In light of the Yom Kippur holiday, the Court will extend the deadline for depositions until Friday, October 2, 2020, but will not extend the deadline further, and as further set forth in this order. Counsel for each side is to serve this notice forthwith on each deponent and is to file a declaration of service on the docket of this case by 3 p.m. tomorrow, September 25, 2020. (Deposition due by 10/2/2020.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 9/24/2020) (jwh)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting 89 Letter Motion to Compel: Granted. Defendants are ordered to appear for depositions on September 22 and September 23. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 9/18/2020) (jwh)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting 86 Letter Motion to Compel: The Court accordingly grants an extension of two weeks to complete depositions. All depositions must be completed by September 28, 2020. No further extensions will be granted, The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to te1minate the letter motion pending at docket 86. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 9/10/2020) (jwh)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER: The Court is prepared to reopen the case and vacate the Agreement. If the plaintiffs wish to reopen the case and vacate the Agreement, they should submit a letter to that effect by August 21, 2020. In any letter so requesting, plaintiffs s hould propose an expedited schedule for the completion of pretrial proceedings. Defendants' response, if any, to the proposed schedule is due August 25, 2020. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 8/18/2020) (cf) Modified on 8/18/2020 (cf).
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER: The Court has received plaintiffs' motion to reopen this case. Dkt. 81. Defendants' opposition is due August 7, 2020, and plaintiffs' reply, if any, is due August 14, 2020. (Responses due by 8/7/2020, Replies due by 8/14/2020.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 7/24/2020) (cf)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Escobar Montiel et al v. Shamrock Saloon II LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hermelindo Escobar Montiel
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Sara Jacqueline Isaacson
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Sara Jacqueline Isaacson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shamrock Saloon II LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?