Restoration Hardware, Inc. et al v. Lighting Design Wholesalers, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Restoration Hardware, Inc. and RH US, LLC
Defendant: Lighting Design Wholesalers, Inc. and Alan Mizrahi
Case Number: 1:2017cv05553
Filed: July 20, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Katherine B. Forrest
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER denying without prejudice to renewal 127 Motion to Vacate; denying without prejudice to renewal 165 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document; denying without prejudice to renewal 166 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. It is her eby ORDERED that, as discussed at the March 12, 2020, conference, Defendants Lighting Design Wholesalers, Inc's and Alan Mizrahi's motion to vacate (Dkt. No. 127) and Plaintiff's letter request for leave to file a sur-reply with resp ect to the motion (Dkt. Nos. 165, 166) are DENIED, without prejudice to renewal after a settlement conference before Judge Gorenstein to attempt to resolve these issues. A settlement referral will follow separately. It is further ORDERED that, unt il further Order, enforcement of the Amended Default Judgment (Dkt. No. 117) as to Defendants Lighting Design Wholesalers, Inc. and Alan Mizrahi only is stayed. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close Dkt. Nos. 127, 165 and 166. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/14/2020) (cf)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the March 12, 2020, 10:30 a.m. conference is adjourned to March 12, 2020, at 3:30 p.m. The conference will be telephonic. The time of the conference is approximate, but the parties shall be ready to proceed by tha t time. The Court will call the parties once the conference is ready to begin. It is further ORDERED that, by March 11, 2020, the parties shall file a joint letter, providing the court with one telephone call-in number for a conference call, and if necessary, a passcode. The parties shall ensure they are all dialed into the conference call by the appointed conference time. If the parties are not able to arrange a conference call, they shall contact the Courtroom Deputy, Mr. James Street, at 2 12-805-4553, as soon as possible and no later than March 11, 2020, at noon, to make other arrangements. (Telephone Conference set for 3/12/2020 at 03:30 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/9/2020) (rro)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff and Defendants Lighting Design Wholesalers, Inc. and Alan Mizrahi shall appear at a conference on March 12, 2020, at 10:30 a.m., to discuss the pending motions. The conference will take place in Courtroo m 1106, at the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Status Conference set for 3/12/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 1106, Thurgood Marshal Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/2/2020) (cf)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Restoration Hardware, Inc. et al v. Lighting Design Wholesalers, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Restoration Hardware, Inc.
Represented By: Aaron David Johnson
Represented By: Michael James McCue
Represented By: Shane Eric Olafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RH US, LLC
Represented By: Aaron David Johnson
Represented By: Michael James McCue
Represented By: Shane Eric Olafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lighting Design Wholesalers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Mizrahi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?