Ramani v. YouTube LLC
Plaintiff: Valmiki D. Ramani
Defendant: YouTube LLC
Case Number: 1:2017cv05746
Filed: July 28, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Unassigned
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. The Clerk of Court is also directed to remove the restriction on document number 27. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 12/4/2019) (rjm) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Petitioner and note service on the docket. Plaintiff is directed to file a declaration within thirty days of the date of this order showing why the Court should no t abstain from presiding over this state-court matter and why this Court is the proper venue. A declaration form is attached to this order. If Plaintiff timely files a declaration, the Court shall review it, and if proper, shall direct the Cle rk of Court to effect service on Defendant. If Plaintiff fails to comply with this order within the time allowed, and cannot show good cause to excuse such failure, the action will be dismissed. No summons shall be issued at this time. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444 -45 (1962). The Clerk of Court is directed to docket this as a "written opinion" within the meaning of Section 205(a)(5) of the E-Government Act of 2002. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 7/8/2019) (mro) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER. The Court directs the Clerk of Court to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. The Court also directs the Clerk of Court to vacate the order of dismissal and the civil judgment (ECF Nos. 10, 11) and reopen this action. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore IFP status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962 ) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). The Clerk of Court is directed to docket this as a "written opinion" within the meaning of Section 205(a)(5) of the E-Government Act of 2002. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 5/2/2019) (rjm) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramani v. YouTube LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valmiki D. Ramani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YouTube LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?