Nurlybayev v. ZTO Express (Cayman) Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Rustem Nurlybayev
Defendant: ZTO Express (Cayman) Inc., Meisong Lai, Jianfa Lai, Jilei Wang, Xiangliang Hu, Baixi Lan, Zing Liu, Frank Zhen Wei, Jianmin (James) Guo, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., China Renaissance Securities (Hong Kong) Limited, Goldman Sachs (ASIA) L.L.C. and Morgan Stanley & Co. International PLC
Case Number: 1:2017cv06130
Filed: August 14, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Kevin Nathaniel Fox
Presiding Judge: Laura Taylor Swain
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 101 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: re: 89 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Wong Family Trusts. For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiffs' motion for leave to amend is denied in its entirety and the case is dismi ssed. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to enter judgment and close the case. This Memorandum Opinion and Order resolves docket entry no. 89. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/31/2021) (ama) Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing.
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 86 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re: 60 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss The Amended Class Action Complaint. filed by J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Goldman Sachs (ASIA) L.L.C., ZTO Express (Cayman) Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, C itigroup Global Markets Inc., China Renaissance Securities (Hong Kong) Limited, Morgan Stanley & Co. International PLC., For the foregoing reasons, Defendants' motion is granted and the Amended Class Action Complaint is dismissed in its en tirety. Plaintiffs may move for leave to amend by August 7, 2019. Any such motion must comply with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Local Rules of this Court, and the individual rules of practice of the undersigned, and must be accompanie d by a proposed amended complaint and a blacklined version of that proposed complaint showing all changes from the AC. If Plaintiffs do not file a timely motion for leave to amend, the dismissal of the AC against Defendants will be with prejudice a nd judgment dismissing the AC will be entered without further advance notice. This Memorandum Opinion and Order resolves docket entry no. 60. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Motions due by 8/7/2019.) (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/17/2019) (cf)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 OPINION & ORDER: re: 36 MOTION to Appoint Wong Family Trusts to serve as lead plaintiff(s) and approve the selection of Lead Counsel, filed by Wong Family Trusts, 30 MOTION to Appoint Rustem Nurlybayev to serve as lead plaintif f(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel - Lead Counsel, filed by Rustem Nurlybayev, 33 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Movants Stanislav Yakhno, Hector Galvan, Dongna Fang, and Spruceland Mall Ltd Partnership, by and through Benjamin Yeung its duly authorized agent to serve as lead plaintiff(s), filed by ZTO Investor Group. The Wong Family Trusts' motion for appointment as lead plaintiff and to approve Movants' selection of Hagens Berm an as lead counsel is GRANTED. The correlating motions filed by Nurlybaev and the ZTO Investor Group are DENIED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate the motions at ECF Nos. 30, 33, and 36. Unless otherwise ordered by the Court, the Wong Family Trusts shall file an amended consolidated class action complaint 45 days from the date of this Order & Opinion. Defendants shall answer or otherwise move against the amended consolidated class action complaint 45 days from its filing, and as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 11/13/2017) (ap)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nurlybayev v. ZTO Express (Cayman) Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZTO Express (Cayman) Inc.
Represented By: Scott D. Musoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meisong Lai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jianfa Lai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jilei Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xiangliang Hu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baixi Lan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zing Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Zhen Wei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jianmin (James) Guo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Securities LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Global Markets Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: China Renaissance Securities (Hong Kong) Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman Sachs (ASIA) L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley & Co. International PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rustem Nurlybayev
Represented By: Frederick Taylor Isquith, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?