Zarfos v. Ruby Tuesday, Inc.
Plaintiff: amanda zarfos
Defendant: Ruby Tuesday, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2017cv06494
Filed: August 25, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(A)(1)(a)(i): Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff Amanda Zarfos and her counsel, hereby give notice that the above captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant Ruby Tuesday, Inc.. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 10/5/2017) (kgo)
October 5, 2017 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY - DOCUMENT REFERRED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL. Note to Attorney Shelly Friedland Document #9 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal was referred to Judge Lorna G. Schofield for approval. (km)
October 4, 2017 Filing 9 DOCUMENT REFERRED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, Without prejudice against the defendant(s) All Defendants. Document filed by All Plaintiffs. (Friedland, Shelly) Modified on 10/5/2017 (km).
September 11, 2017 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ruby Tuesday, Inc.. (rch)
September 8, 2017 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Ruby Tuesday, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Amanda Zarfos. (Friedland, Shelly)
September 8, 2017 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Shelly L Friedland to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): to file an amended summons you must place the word "AMENDED" on the face of the summons in front of "Summons in a Civil Action." Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (rch)
September 7, 2017 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Ruby Tuesday, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Amanda Zarfos. (Friedland, Shelly) Modified on 9/8/2017 (rch).
September 7, 2017 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ruby Tuesday, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Amanda Zarfos. (Friedland, Shelly)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 10/11/2017 at 10:50 AM in Courtroom 1106, Thurgood Marshal Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 8/30/2017) (kgo)
August 28, 2017 Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. All Defendants. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Amanda Zarfos. (Friedland, Shelly)
August 28, 2017 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Friedland, Shelly)
August 28, 2017 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Shelly L Friedland. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (kl)
August 28, 2017 Case Designated ECF. (kl)
August 28, 2017 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (kl)
August 28, 2017 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (kl)
August 28, 2017 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Shelly L Friedland. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: amanda zarfos. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (kl)
August 25, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ruby Tuesday, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14057562)Document filed by amanda zarfos. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Zarfos - Consent to Join)(Friedland, Shelly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zarfos v. Ruby Tuesday, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: amanda zarfos
Represented By: Shelly L Friedland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruby Tuesday, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?