Wexler v. Internet Brands, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: David Wexler
Defendant: Internet Brands, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2017cv06898
Filed: September 12, 2017
Court: New York Southern District Court
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Naomi Reice Buchwald
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 30, 2017 14 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE TERMINATED- SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a final decision was rendered on 11/30/2017 in a court action filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (ama)
November 30, 2017 13 Featured Case ORDER: It having been reported to this Court that this case has been settled, it is ORDERED that the above-captioned action be, and hereby is, dismissed without costs and without prejudice to restoring the action to this Court's calendar if the application to restore the action is made within 30 days. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 11/30/2017) (ama)
November 30, 2017 12 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Richard Liebowitz dated November 29, 2017 re: Dismissal Letter. Document filed by David Wexler.(Liebowitz, Richard)
October 25, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 10/25/2017. (ade)
October 24, 2017 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Yekaterina Tsyvkin on behalf of David Wexler. (Tsyvkin, Yekaterina)
October 23, 2017 10 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: 9 Order for Initial Pretrial Conference,, on 10/25/2017 addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Neil B. Friedman dated 10/23/2017. Document filed by Internet Brands, Inc..(Friedman, Neil)
October 4, 2017 9 Featured Case NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This action has been assigned to me for all purposes. Counsel are directed to appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court, at the time and place listed below. If any defendant has not appeared by counsel, plaintiff's counsel must forthwith send a copy of this notice to any unrepresented party. Date and place of conference: October 25, 2017 at 3:30 p.m. at the United States Court House, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York, in Courtroom 21A. And as set forth herein. IT IS SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 10/25/2017 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 21A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 10/04/2017) (ama)
October 3, 2017 8 ANSWER to 1 Complaint. Document filed by Internet Brands, Inc..(Friedman, Neil)
October 3, 2017 7 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Micro Holding Corp. for Internet Brands, Inc.. Document filed by Internet Brands, Inc..(Friedman, Neil)
September 13, 2017 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Internet Brands, Inc.. (kl)
September 13, 2017 5 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (kl)
September 13, 2017 Case Designated ECF. (kl)
September 13, 2017 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (kl)
September 13, 2017 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (kl)
September 12, 2017 4 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review.(Liebowitz, Richard)
September 12, 2017 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Liebowitz, Richard)
September 12, 2017 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Internet Brands, Inc., re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by David Wexler. (Liebowitz, Richard)
September 12, 2017 1 COMPLAINT against Internet Brands, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14113755)Document filed by David Wexler. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wexler v. Internet Brands, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Wexler
Represented By: Richard Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internet Brands, Inc.
Represented By: Neil Bryan Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?