KT Corporation et al v. ABS Holdings, Ltd. et al

Petitioner: KT Corporation and KTSAT Corporation
Respondent: ABS Holdings, Ltd. and ABS Global, Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2017cv07859
Filed: October 12, 2017
Court: New York Southern District Court
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Lorna G. Schofield
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:0010 Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 12, 2018 81 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, ABS's Petition to confirm the Final Award is GRANTED. KT's Cross-Petition to vacate the Final Award is DENIED. For reasons stated in the Opinion and Order, dated April 10, 2018, ABS's motio n for attorneys' fees and costs is GRANTED. The parties shall make their best efforts to agree on the amount of fees and costs and shall report to the Court within 30 days of this order whether they have done so. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the motion at Docket No. 71. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 7/12/2018) (ama)
July 10, 2018 80 Opinion or Order of the Court CORRECTED OPINION AND ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, KT's Petition to vacate the Award is DENIED. ABS's cross-petition to confirm the Award is GRANTED, and ABS's motion for attorneys' fees and costs is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the motions at Docket Nos. 6 and 41, and strike Docket No. 56. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 7/10/2018) (kgo)
April 10, 2018 56 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER re: 41 LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Paul Werner and Imad Matini dated November 10, 2017. filed by KTSAT Corporation, KT Corporation, 6 MOTION to Vacate Arbit ration . filed by KTSAT Corporation, KT Corporation. For the foregoing reasons, KT's Petition to vacate the Award is DENIED. ABS's cross-petition to confirm the Award is GRANTED, and ABS's motion for attorneys' fees and costs is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the motions at Docket Nos. 6 and 41, and close the case. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/10/2018) (kgo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KT Corporation et al v. ABS Holdings, Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: KT Corporation
Represented By: Daniel L. Brown
Represented By: Imad Matini
Represented By: Paul A Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: KTSAT Corporation
Represented By: Daniel L. Brown
Represented By: Imad Matini
Represented By: Paul A Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ABS Holdings, Ltd.
Represented By: Kamel Aitelaj
Represented By: Brett Philip Lowe
Represented By: Michael D. Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ABS Global, Ltd.
Represented By: Kamel Aitelaj
Represented By: Brett Philip Lowe
Represented By: Michael D. Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?