Richardson et al v. City of New York
Plaintiff: Annette Richardson, Deborah Bowman, Liza Horsley, Debra Poe, Dino Riojas, Arlene Simmons and Stephanie Thomas
Defendant: City of New York
Case Number: 1:2017cv09447
Filed: December 1, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: J. Paul Oetken
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 120 FINAL JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 54(B): Based on the Stipulation for Entry of Final Judgment Pursuant to Rule 54(b) and the entire record in this case, the Court hereby enters final judgment in this case with respect to the claims of seven of th e eight named Plaintiffs Annette Richardson, Deborah Bowman, Debra Poe, Dino Riojas, Stephanie Thomas, Jon Watson, and Erica Richardson against Defendant City of New York. The final judgment is being entered pursuant to the terms of a settlement negotiated between the seven Plaintiffs and the City. No judgment shall be entered with respect to the claims of Plaintiff Brenda McKiver, whom the parties represent is deceased. For the reasons set forth in the Stipulation, the Court determines that there is no just reason for delay in entering final judgment as to the seven settling Plaintiffs identified above. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 12/21/2021) (va)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER terminating 102 Motion re: 102 MOTION for Clarification of the Court's May 12, 2021 Opinion and Order on Class Certification re: 101 Memorandum & Opinion,,, . The Court hereby clarifies that its May 12, 20 21 opinion and order dismissed Annette Richardson's, Debra Poe's, and Stephanie Thomas's claims for injunctive relief only, preserving their claims for money damages. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motion at Docket Number 102. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 5/26/2021) (js)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 101 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION re: 79 MOTION to Certify Class . filed by Debra Poe, Brenda McKiver, Dino Riojas, Erica Richardson, Deborah Bowman, Liza Horsley, Annette Richardson, 75 MOTION for Summary Judgment Partially a s to Plaintiffs Annette Richardson, Erica Richardson, Debra Poe, Dino Riojas, and Stephanie Thomas. MOTION to Strike Document No. 55 Amended Complaint's Disparate Impact Class Allegations. filed by City of New York. For the foregoing reasons, the City's motion for summary judgment is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, and the City's motion to strike is DENIED. Plaintiffs' motion for class certification is also DENIED. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motions at Docket Number 75 and 79.So Ordered. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 5/12/2021) (js)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 OPINION AND ORDER: re: 33 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Michael Lieder dated November 13, 2018. filed by Debra Poe, Arlene Simmons, Dino Riojas, Deborah Bowman, Liza Horsley, Stephanie Thomas, Annette Richardson. For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiffs' motion for leave to amend is GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall file their amended complaint on or before April 22, 2019. The City is directed to answer or otherwise respond to the amended complaint within three weeks after it is filed. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motion at Docket Number 33. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 4/8/2019) (js)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 OPINION AND ORDER re: 11 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint MOTION to Stay re: 4 Complaint Stay Discovery filed by City of New York. For the foregoing reasons, the City's motion to stay discovery is DENIED as m oot, Plaintiffs' claims are DISMISSED as moot to the extent they allege discrimination against EMS employees, and the City's motion to dismiss is GRANTED as to Plaintiffs' Section 1981 and NYCHRL claims insofar as they allege pay di scrimination and as to all federal claims accruing prior to December 1, 2014. The Citys motion to dismiss, however, is DENIED as to (1) Plaintiffs' Section 1981 claims accruing after December 1, 2014, insofar as they allege a pattern or pract ice of intentional discrimination in hiring and job placement; (2) Plaintiffs' NYCHRL claims insofar as they allege a pattern or practice of intentional discrimination in hiring and job placement; (3) and Plaintiffs' NYCHRL claims insofa r as they allege that the Citys hiring and job-placement practices have a disparate impact on African Americans. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motion at Docket Number 11. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 9/28/2018) (anc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richardson et al v. City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette Richardson
Represented By: Sara Wyn Kane
Represented By: Michael Lieder
Represented By: Robert John Valli, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Bowman
Represented By: Sara Wyn Kane
Represented By: Michael Lieder
Represented By: Robert John Valli, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liza Horsley
Represented By: Sara Wyn Kane
Represented By: Michael Lieder
Represented By: Robert John Valli, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Poe
Represented By: Sara Wyn Kane
Represented By: Michael Lieder
Represented By: Robert John Valli, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dino Riojas
Represented By: Sara Wyn Kane
Represented By: Michael Lieder
Represented By: Robert John Valli, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arlene Simmons
Represented By: Sara Wyn Kane
Represented By: Michael Lieder
Represented By: Robert John Valli, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Thomas
Represented By: Sara Wyn Kane
Represented By: Michael Lieder
Represented By: Robert John Valli, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?