In re: Farxiga (Dapagliflozin) Products Liability Litigation
Plaintiff: Denzil Martin, Racheal Blois, June Thompson, Joseph W. Parmeter, Sayed Asif, Jennifer Correa, Cherie Perez, Betty Barker, Kimberly Fowler, Marie Furman, Jose Armando Acosta, Arquimedes Ponce, David Wayne Phillips, Timothy Montgomery, Yvonne Burkett, Raymond Miller, Byron Liskow, Jason Popwell, Undrea Rias-Williams, Tyeward Teasley, Michael Turner, Christina Perdue, David Fowler, Rose Moore, Lorraine Doty, Donna Betters, Joy Beasley, Dennis Doty, Becky Moore, Darla McKinney, Steve Link, Melissa Link, David Gray, Cynthia A Smith, Nate Blonde, Victoria Grogan, Steve Collins, Bobbie Pittman, Beverly Bailey, Helelaine Evans-Osborn, Dalton Burkett, Bruce Shayne, Chaim Z. Aron, David Waite, Barbara Hellebrand, Lea Warner, Melva Grayson, Lennora Kozinko, Sandra B. Polk, Michael Smith, Garret Scott, Jonathan Davis, Christina Marino, Louella Davis, Jerry Roman, Rod Hudson, Jamie Michelle Foran, Judd Moore, Lapascha Teasley, Virginia Mary Assavedo, Kamilah Young, Jeannette Clowes, Robin Wells, Sally Seay, Charlene Robertson, Bonnie Liskow, Joey Lee Lessel, Christina Adams-Kinnison, Michael Cormier, Susan L Clements, Tammy Peace Mize, Scott Barker, Everette Wright, Rodney Perez, Kimara Lyons, Veronica Moore, John Grogan, Joseph Blois, Mary Kay Bledsoe, Brenda Lafanette, Elizabeth Prosser, Daniel Hazen Frank, Beverly Hudson and Tracy Boulais
Defendant: Farxiga (Dapagliflozin) Products Liability Litigation, Astrazeneca AB, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Astrazeneca LP and Astrazeneca P.L.C.
Case Number: 1:2017md02776
Filed: April 12, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332pi
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 345 ORDER NO 53: ORDERED that, by September 17, 2019, the parties shall file executed forms consenting to Judge Parkers jurisdiction for all purposes in Boulais v. AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP, et al., No. 19 Civ. 7230, and Margadonna v. AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP, et al., No. 19 Civ. 6470. It is further ORDERED that, as discussed at the conference, counsel in Robertson v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., 17 Civ. 8591, shall obtain the lien certification, required in the parties' settlement agreement, as soon as possible. An order closing Robertson, with the option for parties to reopen the case within 30 days, will follow separately. The parties may request to extend the time to reopen Robertson if needed. The order administratively closing the MDL and remanding the non-settled case(s) will follow after the parties have consented to Judge Parker's jurisdiction in Boulais and Margadonna. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/10/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(ama)
September 10, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lorna G. Schofield: Telephone Conference held on 9/10/2019. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(jcs)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 344 ORDER NO. 52: It is hereby ORDERED that, in addition to lead counsel, counsel for parties in Robertson v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., 17 Civ. 859, shall attend. The Robertson parties have violated successive extensions for filing their stipulation of dismissal, as Orders Nos. 45, 47, 48 and 49 require. Most recently, counsel missed the August 29, 2019, deadline in Order No. 49 (Dkt. No. 340). (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/9/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(cf)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 343 ORDER NO. 51: WHEREAS, the parties jointly requested, by e-mail to the Chambers inbox on July 22, 2019, a telephone conference to discuss two recently filed cases in the MDL. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a telephone conference on September 10, 2019, at 10:30 a.m. ET, to discuss these issues. The parties shall jointly call the Courtroom from a landline at 212-805-0288 and ensure that they have a good connection. (Telephone Conference set for 9/10/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 8/23/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(cf)
August 1, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lorna G. Schofield: Telephone Conference held on 8/1/2019. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(jcs)
August 1, 2019 Filing 342 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mhe)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 341 ORDER NO. 50: WHEREAS, the parties filed a joint letter (Dkt. No. 339) on July 29, 2019, setting out their respective positions on the appropriate time to administratively close this MDL. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a telephone conference on August 1, 2019, at 12:00 p.m. ET, to discuss this issue. The parties shall jointly call the Court from a landline at 212-805-0288. ( Telephone Conference set for 8/1/2019 at 12:00 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 7/30/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al, as per Chambers spread to all cases.(mro)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 340 ORDER granting (338) Letter Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:17-md-02776-LGS; granting (71) Letter Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:17-cv-08591-LGS: ORDERED that the Robertson Plaintiff's request is GRANTED. The Robertson parties shall file their stipulation of dismissal and proposed order as soon as possible and no later than August 29, 2019. Plaintiff is warned that no further extensions will be granted absent extraordinary circumstances and that the Court will entertain an application for dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute if the required documents are not timely filed. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close Dkt. No. 71 in Robertson v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., 17 Civ. 8591. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 7/29/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al. (jwh)
July 29, 2019 Filing 339 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Stephen D. Raber dated July 29, 2019 re: Joint Letter Concerning Proposed Order Administratively Closing MDL. Document filed by Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Plaintiffs' Proposed Order Administratively Closing MDL)(Heins, Matthew)
July 29, 2019 Filing 338 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Stipulation for Dismissal addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Levi Plesset dated 7/29/2019. Document filed by Charlene Robertson.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS, 1:17-cv-08591-LGS(Plesset, Levi)
July 26, 2019 Filing 337 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Stephen D. Raber dated July 26, 2019 re: Letter from Stephen D. Raber to Judge Schofield Re: Order No. 48. Document filed by Astrazeneca AB, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca P.L.C., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co..(Heins, Matthew)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 336 ORDER NO. 48: It is hereby ORDERED that the Robertson parties shall by July 26, 2019, (1) file their stipulation and proposed order or (2) seek an extension from the Court and explain the basis. Continuing failure to comply with Court orders may result in sanctions. This Order does not affect any other deadlines. The proposed order to administratively close this multi-district litigation is due on July 29, 2019. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 7/25/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(jca)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 335 ORDER NO. 47: It is hereby ORDERED that the Robertson parties shall file their stipulation and proposed order as soon as possible and no later than July 24, 2019. This Order does not affect any other deadlines. The proposed order to administratively close this multi-district litigation is due on July 29, 2019. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 7/19/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(kv)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 334 ORDER ON STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: Before the Court is a Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), entered into by Plaintiff Bruce Shayne and Defendants Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca PLC, and AstraZeneca AB. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Bruce Shaynes case is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that each party shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 7/18/2019) (cf)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ORDER APPROVING DISBURSEMENT OF COMMON BENEFITS FUNDS in case 1:16-cv-08187-LGS; granting (331) Motion for Disbursement of Funds in case 1:17-md-02776-LGS. An unredacted version of this Order is to be filed under seal due to the confidential nature of subject, as further set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 7/16/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al. (tro) Transmission to Finance Unit (Cashiers) for processing.
July 3, 2019 Filing 332 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mhe)
July 3, 2019 Filing 331 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds (Common Benefit). Document filed by Virginia Mary Assavedo. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Relkin, Ellen)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 330 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the proposed redactions are accepted. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file under seal unredacted version of the motion to authorize distribution of common benefit funds and the accompanying proposed order. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 6/27/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(cf)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 329 ORDER ON STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' case is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that each party shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. (Astrazeneca LP and Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP terminated.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 6/21/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS, 1:18-cv-05130-LGS(anc)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 328 ORDER ON STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Timothy Montgomery's case is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that each party shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. (Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., Astrazeneca LP and Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP terminated.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 6/21/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS, 1:17-cv-10230-LGS(anc)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 327 ORDER NO. 45. It is hereby ORDERED that the due date to submit the proposed order to administratively close the MDL is extended to July 29, 2019. The parties shall finalize their settlement materials and file the stipulations of dismissal in the four remaining settled cases by July 18, 2019. It is further ORDERED that the PSC's request to file under seal the motion to authorize distribution of common benefit funds and the accompanying proposed order is GRANTED in part. Plaintiffs shall e-mail to the Chambers inbox proposed redacted versions of these papers by June 25, 2019, with the proposed redactions highlighted in yellow. The papers shall be deemed filed as of June 12, 2019, the date of the initial e-mail. It is further ORDERED that the June 25, 2019, 4:00 p.m. status conference is CANCELED. The parties may request a later status conference if necessary or useful. The following hearing(s) was terminated: Status Conference. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 6/19/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al. as per Chambers. (rjm)
June 18, 2019 Filing 326 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Stephen D. Raber dated June 18, 2019 re: Joint Status Letter and Agenda for June 25, 2019 Conference. Document filed by Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co..(Heins, Matthew)
June 14, 2019 Filing 325 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Stephen D. Raber dated June 14, 2019 re: Adjournment for Proposed Order to Administratively Close MDL. Document filed by Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co..(Heins, Matthew)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 324 ORDER ON STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE Before the Court is a Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), entered into by Plaintiff Jeannette Clowes and Defendants Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., AstraZeneca LP, and AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Jeannette Clowes's case is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that each party shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 6/10/2019) (cf)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 323 ORDER ON STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: Before the Court is a Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), entered into by Plaintiff Sally Seay and Defendants Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca PLC, and AstraZeneca PC. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Sally Seay's case is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that each party shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 5/16/2019) (cf)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 322 ORDER NO. 44: It is hereby ORDERED that the May 21, 2019, conference is adjourned to June 25, 2019, at 4:00 p.m. The parties shall file a joint letter with a proposed conference agenda at least a week before the conference. It is further ORDERED that the parties are reminded that the proposed order to administratively close the multi-district litigation ("MDL") is due June 14, 2019. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Status Conference set for 6/25/2019 at 04:00 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 5/15/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(cf) Modified on 5/15/2019 (cf).
May 14, 2019 Filing 321 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Stephen D. Raber dated May 14, 2019 re: Joint Status Letter and Agenda for May 21, 2019 Conference. Document filed by Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co..(Heins, Matthew)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 320 ORDER ON STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: Before the Court is a Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), entered into by Plaintiffs Melissa Link (now known as Melissa Conner) and Steven Link and Defendants Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca PLC, and AstraZeneca AB. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' case is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that each party shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 5/1/2019) (cf)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 319 ORDER NO. 43: WHEREAS, the parties jointly requested by letter, sent to the Chambers inbox, not to file the settlement agreements in the underlying cases due to confidentiality. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties' request is GRANTED. The parties shall continue filing stipulations of settlement and accompanying proposed orders to close the underlying cases. The parties are reminded that, per Individual Rule C.4, the Court does not retain jurisdiction to enforce confidential settlement agreements. If the parties wish for any portion of the settlements agreements to be enforced, they shall file those portions on the docket. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/29/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(cf) Modified on 4/29/2019 (cf).
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 318 ORDER ON STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: Before the Court is a Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), entered into by Plaintiff Jason Popwell and Defendants Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., AstraZeneca LP, and AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca AB, and AstraZeneca PLC. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Jason Popwell's case is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that each party shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. (Jason Popwell terminated.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/25/2019) (jwh)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ORDER ON STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Jennifer Correa's case is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that each party shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees., Astrazeneca L.P., Astrazeneca PLC, AstraZeneca AB and AstraZeneca PHarmaceuticals L.P. terminated. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/24/2019) (rj)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 316 ORDER NO. 42: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file their settlement agreements and a proposed order to administratively close the MDL by June 14, 2019. Should the parties require more time, they shall file a joint letter, not to exceed two pages, with a proposed later deadline and the basis for the extension, by April 26, 2019. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/18/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(cf)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 315 ORDER NO. 41 (Status Conference): It is hereby ORDERED that the status conference scheduled for April 23, 2019, is hereby adjourned to May 21, 2019, at 4:00 p.m. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Status Conference set for 5/21/2019 at 04:00 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/18/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(cf) Modified on 4/18/2019 (cf).
April 16, 2019 Filing 314 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Stephen D. Raber dated April 16, 2019 re: Joint Status Letter and Agenda for April 23, 2019 Conference. Document filed by Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co..(Heins, Matthew)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ORDER ON STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: Before the Court is a Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), entered into by Plaintiff Jamie Michelle Foran and Defendants Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., AstraZeneca LP, and AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Jamie Michelle Foran's case is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that each party shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/22/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS, 1:17-cv-02661-LGS(ks)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 312 ORDER NO. 39 (Status Conference): ORDERED that the status conference scheduled for March 26, 2019, is hereby adjourned to April 23, 2019, at 4:00 p.m. As provided in Order No. 1, parties with similar interests may agree as to any conference, unless otherwise ordered, to have an attending attorney represent their interests instead of attending through their own attorney or, if pro se, in person. By April 16, 2019, at 5:00 p.m., the parties shall file a joint status letter and proposed conference agenda not to exceed seven pages., ( Status Conference set for 4/23/2019 at 04:00 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/20/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(ama)
March 19, 2019 Filing 311 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Stephen D. Raber dated March 19, 2019 re: Joint Status Letter and Agenda for March 26, 2019, Conference. Document filed by Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co..(Heins, Matthew)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 310 ORDER ON STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: Before the Court is a Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), entered into by Plaintiffs John Grogan and Victoria Grogan and Defendants Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca PLC, and AstraZeneca AB. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs John Grogan and Victoria Grogan's case is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that each party shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/18/2019) (cf)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 309 ORDER ON STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's case is hereby dismissed with prejudice. It is further ORDERED that each party shall bear their own fees and costs. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 2/28/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS, 1:18-cv-06357-LGS(ne)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 308 ORDER ON STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' case is hereby dismissed with prejudice. It is further ORDERED that each party shall bear their own fees and costs. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 2/26/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS, 1:18-cv-06357-LGS (ks)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 307 ORDER ON STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs case is hereby dismissed with prejudice. It is further ORDERED that each party shall bear their own fees and costs. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 2/26/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS, 1:18-cv-06356-LGS(ks)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 306 ORDER ON STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Lorraine and Dennis Doty's case is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that each party shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 2/26/2019) Lorraine Doty, Lorraine Doty, Dennis Doty and Dennis Doty terminated.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS, 1:16-cv-08951-LGS(ks)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 305 ORDER NO.39 (Status Conference): It is hereby ORDERED that the status conference scheduled for March 1, 2019, is hereby adjourned to March 26, 2019, at 4:00 p.m. As provided in Order No. 1, parties with similar interests may agree as to any conference, unless otherwise ordered, to have an attending attorney represent their interests instead of attending through their own attorney or, if pro se, in person. By March 19, 2019, at 5:00 p.m., the parties shall file a joint status letter and proposed conference agenda not to exceed seven pages. (Status Conference set for 3/26/2019 at 04:00 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 2/25/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(jca)
February 22, 2019 Filing 304 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Stephen D. Raber dated February 22, 2019 re: Joint Status Letter and Agenda for February 28, 2019, Conference. Document filed by Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co..(Heins, Matthew)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 303 ORDER ON STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: Before the Court is a Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), entered into by Plaintiff Kimara Lyons and Defendants Bristol- Myers Squibb Co., AstraZeneca LP, and AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Kimara Lyonss case is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that each party shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 2/12/2019) (ks)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 302 ORDER ON STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: Before the Court is a Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), entered into by Plaintiff Kimara Lyons and Defendants AstraZeneca AB and AstraZeneca PLC. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Kimara Lyonss case is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that each party shall bear their own costs and attorneys fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 2/7/2019) (kv)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 301 ORDER ON STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: Before the Court is a Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), entered into by Plaintiff Bobbie Pittman and Defendants AstraZeneca AB and AstraZeneca PLC. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Bobbie Pittman's case is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that each party shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. Bobbie Pittman, Bobbie Pittman and Bobbie Pittman terminated. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 2/7/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS, 1:17-cv-04212-LGS(ne)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER ON STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: Before the Court is a Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), entered into by Plaintiff Helelaine Evans-Osborn and Defendants AstraZeneca AB and AstraZeneca PLC. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Helelaine Evans-Osborn's case is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that each party shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 2/7/2019) (jca)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ORDER ON STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: Before the Court is a Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), entered into by Plaintiff Robin Wells and Defendants AstraZeneca AB and AstraZeneca PLC. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Robin Wellss case is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that each party shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 2/7/2019) (cf)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 298 ORDER ON STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: Before the Court is a Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), entered into by Plaintiff Donna Betters and Defendants Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., AstraZeneca LP, and AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Donna Betters's case is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that each party shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 2/5/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS, 1:17-cv-03636-LGS(jwh)
January 28, 2019 Filing 297 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (98 in 1:17-cv-02264-LGS) Letter, filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. The dismissal at Docket Number 97 is vacated, Docket Numbers 94, 95, and 97 are stricken, and the Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to reopen this case. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/28/2019) (cf)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 296 ORDER ON STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE Before the Court is a Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), entered into by Plaintiff Beverly Bailey and Defendants Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., AstraZeneca LP, and AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Beverly Bailey's case is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that each party shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/28/2019) (cf)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 295 ORDER ON STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: Before the Court is a Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), entered into by Plaintiffs Rod Hudson and Beverly Hudson and Defendants AstraZeneca AB and AstraZeneca PLC. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Rod Hudson and Beverly Hudson's case is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that each party shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/28/2019) (cf)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ORDER ON STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Melissa Link and Steve Link's case is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that each party shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/25/2019) (cf)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER ON STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff David Gray's case is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that each party shall bear their own costs anattorneys' fees. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/25/2019) (cf)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER ON STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Joseph Parmeter's case is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that each party shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/25/2019) (cf)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 291 ORDER ON STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Sandra Polks case is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that each party shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/23/2019) (cf)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER ON STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE... IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Jerry Roman's case is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that each party shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees., (Jerry Roman terminated.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/23/19) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS, 1:17-cv-04528-LGS(yv)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER ON STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Marie Furmans case is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that each party shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/23/2019) (cf)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER ON STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE... IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Lennora Kozinko's case is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that each party shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees., (Lennora Kozinko terminated.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/23/19) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS, 1:17-cv-09426-LGS(yv)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 287 ORDER ON STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE... IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Veronica Moore's case is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that each party shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/23/19) (yv)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER ON STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Christina Adams-Kinnison's case is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that each party shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/23/2019) (jca)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDER ON STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Becky Moore's case is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that each party shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/23/2019) (jca)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER ON STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Michael Smith's case is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that each party shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/23/2019) (jca)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ORDER ON STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Michael Cormiers case is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that each party shall bear their own costs and attorneys fees. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/23/2019) (jca)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER ON STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Raymond Miller's case is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that each party shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/23/2019) (cf)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 281 ORDER ON STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Mary Kay Bledsoe's case is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that each party shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/17/2019) (cf)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER ON STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Betty Barker and Scott Barkers case is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that each party shall bear their own costs and attorneys fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/17/2019) (jca)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER ON STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Joseph Blois and Racheal Bloiss case is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that each party shall bear their own costs and attorneys fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/17/2019) (jca)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORDER ON STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: Before the Court is a Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), entered into by Plaintiff David Waite and Defendants Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., AstraZeneca LP, and AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff David Waite's case is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that each party shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/17/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS, 1:17-cv-09504-LGS(rro)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER ON STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Virginia Assavedo's case is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that each party shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/17/2019) (cf)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER ON STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Yvonne Burkett and Dalton Burketts case is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that each party shall bear their own costs and attorneys fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/17/2019) (jca)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 275 ORDER ON STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Kamilah Young's case is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that each party shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/17/2019) (cf)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER ON STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: Before the Court is a Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), entered into by Plaintiffs Rod Hudson and Beverly Hudson and Defendants Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., AstraZeneca LP, and AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Rod Hudson and Beverly Hudsons case is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that each party shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. So Ordered., (Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP (a Delaware Corporation), Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., Bristol-Myers Squibb Co. (a Delaware Corporation), Astrazeneca LP and Astrazeneca LP (a Delaware Corporation) terminated.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/17/19) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS, 1:16-cv-08888-LGS(yv)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER ON STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Cherie Perez and Rodney Perezs case is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that each party shall bear their own costs and attorneys fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/17/2019) (jca)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER ON STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Kimberly Fowler and David Fowler's case is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that each party shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/17/2019) (cf)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ORDER ON STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Arquimedes Ponces case is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that each party shall bear their own costs and attorneys fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/17/2019) (jca)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER ON STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Elizabeth Prosser's case is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that each party shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/17/2019) (cf)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER ON STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Barbara Hellebrand's case is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that each party shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/17/2019) (cf)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER: Completion of bellwether fact discovery: May 3, 2019. Deadline for expert discovery on general causation and general liability: July 7, 2019. It is further ORDERED that discovery unique to Plaintiff Susan Clements in Clements v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., et al., No. 17 Civ. 6538 is stayed. ORDERED that the parties shall attend a status conference on March 1, 2019, at 10:30 a.m. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Expert Discovery due by 7/7/2019., Fact Discovery due by 5/3/2019., Status Conference set for 3/1/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/16/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(cf)
January 15, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lorna G. Schofield: Telephone Conference held on 1/15/2019. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(jcs)
January 14, 2019 Filing 267 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Danielle M. Gold dated January 14, 2019 re: Call-In Information for January 15, 2019 Status Conference. Document filed by Virginia Mary Assavedo.(Gold, Danielle)
January 11, 2019 ***STRICKEN DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 265 from the case record. The document was stricken from this case pursuant to #266 Memo Endorsement. Per instructions from chambers, the PDF and docket entry have both been removed from this case ONLY. The order that was attached to dkt. 265 remains in the member cases. (cf)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 266 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (264 in 1:17-md-02776-LGS) Letter filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. ENDORSEMENT: Whereas the Court's Order at docket number 265 references the incorrect telephone conference date, the Clerk of the Court is directed to STRIKE docket number 265 from the record. The parties shall appear for a telephone conference on January 15, 2019 at 3:30 pm. Any party wishing to participate shall participate via landline, following the instructions in the letter that will be filed by lead counsel on January 14, 2019. This Order shall be filed in all related cases. (Telephone Conference set for 1/15/2019 at 03:30 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/11/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(cf)
January 8, 2019 Filing 264 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Stephen D. Raber dated January 8, 2019 re: Status Letter and Conference Agenda. Document filed by Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co..(Heins, Matthew)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER ON STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Chaim Z. Aron's case is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that each party shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. Chaim Z. Aron and Chaim Z. Aron terminated. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 12/11/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS, 1:16-cv-10003-LGS(ne)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER ON STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Lapascha Teasley and Tyeward Teasley's case is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that each party shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. Tyeward Teasley, Tyeward Teasley, Lapascha Teasley and Lapascha Teasley terminated. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 12/11/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS, 1:17-cv-09192-LGS(ne)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER ON STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Christina Perdue's case is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that each party shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. Christina Perdue and Christina Perdue terminated. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 12/11/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS, 1:17-cv-09196-LGS(ne)
December 6, 2018 Filing 260 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from John Arthur Eaves, Jr. dated December 6, 2018 re: Voluntary Dismissals. Document filed by Joey Lee Lessel, Undrea Rias-Williams, Michael Turner, Everette Wright, Daniel Hazen Frank, Tammy Peace Mize.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS, 1:18-cv-06356-LGS, 1:18-cv-06357-LGS(Eaves, John)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER, It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs in Frank, et al. v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., et al., No. 18 Civ. 6356 and Lessel, et al. v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., et al., No. 18 Civ. 6357, shall serve Defendants with process no later than November 21, 2018. By December 7, 2018, counsel for the Frank and Lessel Plaintiffs shall file a letter stating the cases they intend to voluntarily dismiss. It is further ORDERED that all discovery deadlines are extended by 60-days, as detailed below. Completion of all general fact discovery 1/4/2019. Expert Discovery due by 5/22/2019., Bellwether Fact Discovery due by 3/19/2019. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall attend a status conference on January 15, 2019, at 3:30 p.m. As provided in Order No. 1, parties with similar interests may agree as to any conference, unless otherwise ordered, to have an attending attorney represent their interests instead of attending through their own attorney or, if pro se, in person. By January 8, 2019, at 5:00 p.m., the parties shall file a joint status letter and proposed conference agenda not to exceed seven pages., (Status Conference set for 1/15/2019 at 03:30 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 11/7/18) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al. (yv)
November 5, 2018 Filing 258 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Matthew E. Munson dated November 5, 2018 re: Plaintiff's Request for Pre-motion Conference. Document filed by Susan L Clements.(Munson, Matthew)
November 5, 2018 Filing 257 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Danielle M. Gold dated November 5, 2018 re: Call-In Information for November 6, 2018 Status Conference. Document filed by Virginia Mary Assavedo.(Gold, Danielle)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER ON STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: Before the Court is a Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), entered into by Plaintiffs Judd and Rose Moore and Defendants Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., AstraZeneca LP, and AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Judd and Rose Moore's case is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that each party shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 10/30/2018) (ne)
October 30, 2018 Filing 255 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Stephen D. Raber dated October 30, 2018 re: Status Letter and Conference Agenda. Document filed by Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co..(Heins, Matthew)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ORDER NO. 36 (Status Conference): ORDERED that the status conference scheduled for October 9, 2018, is hereby adjourned to November 6, 2018, at 3:30 p.m. (As further set forth in this Order.) By October 30, 2018, at 5:00 p.m., the parties shall file a joint status letter and proposed conference agenda not to exceed seven pages. ( Status Conference set for 11/6/2018 at 03:30 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 10/3/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(cf)
October 2, 2018 Filing 253 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Stephen D. Raber dated October 2, 2018 re: Status Letter and Conference Agenda. Document filed by Astrazeneca AB, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca P.L.C., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co..(Heins, Matthew)
September 17, 2018 Filing 252 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting (251) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. Ms. Haas is removed as counsel of record. Attorney Lyndsey M Haas terminated. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/17/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al, as per Chambers. (mro)
September 14, 2018 Filing 251 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Lyndsey M. Haas to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Astrazeneca AB, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca P.L.C., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support)(Haas, Lyndsey) Modified on 9/26/2018 (ldi).
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER NO. 35 (Status Conference): ORDERED that the status conference scheduled for September 18, 2018, is hereby adjourned to October 9, 2018, at 3:30 p.m. (As further set forth in this Order.) By October 2, 2018, at 5:00 p.m., the parties shall file a joint status letter and proposed conference agenda not to exceed seven pages. (Status Conference set for 10/9/2018 at 03:30 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/10/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(cf)
September 7, 2018 Filing 249 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Ellen Relkin dated September 7, 2018 re: Rescheduling of September 18, 2018 court conference. Document filed by Mary Kay Bledsoe.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS, 1:16-cv-08915-LGS(Relkin, Ellen)
September 4, 2018 Filing 248 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Jessica A. Perez dated September 4, 2018 re: Mediation on behalf of Farxiga MDL Plaintiffs scheduled for Mediations on September 6-7, 2018. Document filed by Marie Furman, Joseph W. Parmeter, Jerry Roman, Veronica Moore, Lennora Kozinko, Michael Smith, Raymond Miller, David Gray, Sandra B. Polk, Michael Cormier, Christina Adams-Kinnison, Becky Moore.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(Perez, Jessica)
August 20, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker: Telephone Conference held on 8/20/2018. (ca)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER NO. 34: It is hereby ORDERED that the status conference scheduled for August 14, 2018, is cancelled. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall attend a status conference on September 18, 2018, at 3:30 p.m. As provided in Order No. 1, parties with similar interests may agree as to any conference, unless otherwise ordered, to have an attending attorney represent their interests instead of attending through their own attorney or, if pro se, in person. By September 11, 2018, at 5:00 p.m., the parties shall file a joint status letter and proposed conference agenda not to exceed seven pages. Status Conference set for 9/18/2018 at 03:30 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 8/8/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(kgo)
August 7, 2018 Filing 246 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Stephen D. Raber dated August 7, 2018 re: Status Letter and Conference Agenda. Document filed by Astrazeneca AB, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca P.L.C., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co..(Haas, Lyndsey)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER NO. 33: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall attend a status conference on August 14, 2018, at 4:00 p.m. As provided in Order No. 1, parties with similar interests may agree as to any conference, unless otherwise ordered, to have an attending attorney represent their interests instead of attending through their own attorney or, if pro se, in person. By August 7, 2018, at 5:00 p.m., the parties shall file a joint status letter and proposed conference agenda not to exceed seven pages. Status Conference set for 8/14/2018 at 04:00 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 7/18/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(kgo)
July 17, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lorna G. Schofield: Status Conference held on 7/17/2018. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(jcs)
July 16, 2018 Filing 244 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Danielle M. Gold dated July 16, 2018 re: Call-In Information for July 17, 2018 Status Conference. Document filed by Virginia Mary Assavedo.(Gold, Danielle)
July 12, 2018 Filing 243 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER IN ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL (CTO-10) transferring this action from the United States District Court - that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, the actions listed on the attached schedule A and pending in the District of Mississippi, and the same hereby are, transferred to the Southern District of New York, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Lorna G. Schofield, for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings with the actions pending in that district and listed on Schedule A. (Signed by MDL Panel on 7/10/2018) (sjo)
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 242 MEMO ENDORSEMENT (ORDER NO. 57) on re: (54 in 1:17-cv-07744-LGS) MOTION for Jensen & Steffey to Withdraw as Attorney. Document filed by Melva Grayson. ENDORSEMENT: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Brandon H. Steffey and Jensen & Steffey, and Richard M. Zgoda, Jr. and Gacovino, Lake & Associates, P.C., are withdrawn as Plaintiff's attorneys of record. DONE AND SIGNED. Attorney Brandon H. Steffey and Richard Marian Zgoda, Jr terminated. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 7/11/2018) (rj)
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 241 MEMO ENDORSEMENT (ORDER NO. 32) on re: (240 in 1:17-md-02776-LGS) Letter, filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca P.L.C., Astrazeneca AB, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. ENDORSEMENT: Application DENIED. The parties shall appear for the July 17, 2018, conference at 3:30 p.m. to discuss the status of the mediation and next steps in the event that the lead counsel and committee structure is affected by the settlement of some but not all cases. As the conference is expected to be brief, all counsel may (but need not) participate telephonically by jointly calling 212-805-0288 at the appointed time, with each speaking party participating from a landline. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 7/11/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(kgo) Modified on 7/11/2018 (kgo).
July 10, 2018 Filing 240 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Stephen D. Raber dated July 10, 2018 re: Status Letter and Conference Agenda. Document filed by Astrazeneca AB, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca P.L.C., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co..(Haas, Lyndsey)
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER NO. 31: It is hereby ORDERED that the status conference scheduled for June 26, 2018, is cancelled. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall attend a status conference on July 17, 2018, at 3:30 p.m. As provided in Order No. 1, parties with similar interests may agree as to any conference, unless otherwise ordered, to have an attending attorney represent their interests instead of attending through their own attorney or, if pro se, in person. By July 10, 2018, at 5:00 p.m., the parties shall file a joint status letter and proposed conference agenda not to exceed seven pages. Status Conference set for 7/17/2018 at 03:30 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 6/20/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(kgo)
June 19, 2018 Filing 238 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: denying (51 in case 17cv7744) MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW. ENDORSEMENT: Application DENIED. Counsel has not presented satisfactory reasons for withdrawal. If counsel wishes to renew this motion, counsel shall provide more detail as to why counsel cannot represent Plaintiff, and explain the status of Gacovina, Lake & Associates, P.C. in this matter. If needed, counsel may follow the Court's Individual Rule I.B.C.3 regarding sealing. (Docketed in 17cv7744, 17md2776, 17mc2776) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 6/19/2018) (ap)
June 19, 2018 Filing 237 STIPULATION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE: The parties respectfully request that all claims in Plaintiff's Complaint be dismissed with prejudice. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 6/19/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS, 1:17-cv-08908-LGS(kgo)
June 19, 2018 Filing 236 STIPULATION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE: The parties respectfully request that all claims in Plaintiff's Complaint be dismissed with prejudice. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 6/19/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS, 1:18-cv-02230-LGS(kgo)
June 19, 2018 Filing 235 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Stephen D. Raber dated June 19, 2018 re: Status Letter and Conference Agenda. Document filed by Astrazeneca AB, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca P.L.C., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co..(Rome, Jacqueline)
June 19, 2018 Filing 234 STIPULATION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE: The parties respectfully request that all claims in Plaintiff's Complaint be dismissed with prejudice. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 6/19/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS, 1:18-cv-03325-LGS(kgo)
June 18, 2018 Filing 233 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) All Defendants and without costs to either party pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Astrazeneca P.L.C., Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., Astrazeneca PLC, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Astrazeneca LP, AstraZeneca AB.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS, 1:18-cv-03325-LGS(Rome, Jacqueline)
June 18, 2018 Filing 232 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) All Defendants and without costs to either party pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Astrazeneca P.L.C., Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Astrazeneca LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS, 1:18-cv-02230-LGS(Rome, Jacqueline)
June 18, 2018 Filing 231 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) All Defendants and without costs to either party pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Astrazeneca P.L.C., Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Astrazeneca LP.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS, 1:17-cv-08908-LGS(Rome, Jacqueline)
June 12, 2018 Filing 230 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Robert T. Dassow dated 06/12/2018 re: Farxiga/Grogan. Document filed by John Grogan, Victoria Grogan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Dassow, Robert)
June 12, 2018 Filing 229 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Christopher A. Seeger dated June 12, 2018 re: Mediation Letter. Document filed by Judd Moore, Rose Moore, Bruce Shayne.(Seeger, Christopher)
June 12, 2018 Filing 228 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Laura L Pittner dated 06/12/2018 re: Mediation Order. Document filed by Helelaine Evans-Osborn, Kimara Lyons, Bobbie Pittman, Robin Wells.(Pittner, Laura)
June 12, 2018 Filing 227 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Jessica A. Perez dated June 12, 2018 re: Mediation Order. Document filed by Christina Adams-Kinnison, Michael Cormier, Marie Furman, David Gray, Lennora Kozinko, Raymond Miller, Becky Moore, Veronica Moore, Joseph W. Parmeter, Sandra B. Polk, Jerry Roman, Michael Smith.(Perez, Jessica)
June 12, 2018 Filing 226 COMPLAINT against Astrazeneca AB, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca P.L.C., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. Document filed by Victoria Grogan, John Grogan.(Dassow, Robert)
June 12, 2018 Filing 225 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Steven D. Davis dated 06/12/2018 re: Settlement Conference. Document filed by Timothy Montgomery, Bonnie Liskow, Byron Liskow.(Davis, Steven)
June 12, 2018 Filing 224 FIRST LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Matthew E. Munson dated 06/12/2018 re: Settlement Conference. Document filed by Susan L Clements, Jeannette Clowes, Christina Marino.(Munson, Matthew)
June 12, 2018 Filing 223 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Frank M. Petosa, Esquire dated June12, 2018 re: 09/17/18 Settlement Conference. Document filed by Dennis Doty, Lorraine Doty.(Petosa, Frank)
June 8, 2018 Filing 222 FIRST LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Brandon H. Steffey dated 08/08/2018 re: Settlement Conference. Document filed by Beverly Bailey.(Steffey, Brandon)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER, By June 12, 2018, each of the firms representing Plaintiffs in this action shall file a letter (1) referencing the names of the individual Plaintiff(s) represented by their firm and the civil docket number associated with each Plaintiff's case; (2) confirming that each individual Plaintiff will attend the settlement conference, as set forth in the schedule below; and (3) addressing any additional matters specific to their Plaintiff's/Plaintiffs' cases discussed during their firm's pre-settlement telephone conference on June 5, 2018. This Court's Individual Practices in Civil Cases require parties to attend settlement conferences in person. In the event in-person attendance poses a hardship for a particular Plaintiff e.g., for a specific medical reason requiring reasonable accommodation such Plaintiff's counsel must include in its June 12, 2018 letter an application for the individual Plaintiff to participate in the settlement conference by Facetime or telephone (the former being the Court's preference). To the extent the parties discussed the exchange of certain discovery needed in advance of their settlement conference during their June 5, 2018 telephone conference, such discovery shall be exchanged by no later than June 29, 2018 and as further set forth in this Order. SO ORDERED. (Settlement Conference set for 9/11/2018 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker., Settlement Conference set for 9/14/2018 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker., Settlement Conference set for 9/17/2018 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker., Settlement Conference set for 9/17/2018 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker., Settlement Conference set for 9/19/2018 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker., Settlement Conference set for 9/19/2018 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker., Settlement Conference set for 9/21/2018 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker., Settlement Conference set for 9/21/2018 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 6/5/18) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al. (yv)
June 5, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker: Telephone Conference held on 6/5/2018 at3;30 p.m. with Defendants and counsel from Milstein Jackson Fairchild & Wade, LLP (ca)
June 5, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker: Telephone Conference held on 6/5/2018 at 3:15 p.m. with Counsel for the Defendants and Counsel from Robins Kaplan, LLP (ca)
June 5, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker: Telephone Conference held on 6/5/2018 at 12;45 p.m. Defendants and Counsel from the Orlando and Wettermark firms. (ca)
June 5, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker: Telephone Conference held on 6/5/2018 at 12:30 P.m. Defendants and Counsel from Hovde Dassow & Deets LLC and TorHoerman Law LLC (ca)
June 5, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker: Telephone Conference held on 6/5/2018 at 12;15 p.m. Counsel for the Defendants and Counsel from Morgan & Morgan and Peterson & Associates, P.C. (ca)
June 5, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker: Telephone Conference held on 6/5/2018 at 12:00 p.m. with Counsel for the Defendants and Counsel from Seeger Weiss. (ca)
June 5, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker: Telephone Conference held on 6/5/2018 at 11:45 a.m. with Defendants and Counsel from Jensen & Steffey. (ca)
June 5, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker: Telephone Conference held on 6/5/2018 at 11:30 a.m.with Defendants and Counsel from Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles, P.C. (ca)
June 5, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker: Telephone Conference held on 6/5/2018 at 11:15 a.m. with Defendants and Counsel from GoldenbergLaw (ca)
June 5, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker: Telephone Conference held on 6/5/2018 at 11:00 a.m. with Defendants and counsel from Pendley, Baudib & Coffin, LLP. (ca)
May 30, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker: Settlement Conference held on 5/30/2018. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(ca)
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER NO. 30 (Status Conference): WHEREAS, the Court is in receipt of the parties' joint status letter and proposed conference agenda for the May 30, 2018, status conference (Dkt. No. 217); it is hereby ORDERED that the status conference scheduled for May 30, 2018, is cancelled. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall attend a status conference on June 26, 2018, at 3:30 p.m. As provided in Order No. 1, parties with similar interests may agree as to any conference, unless otherwise ordered, to have an attending attorney represent their interests instead of attending through their own attorney or, if pro se, in person. By June 19, 2018, at 5:00 p.m., the parties shall file a joint status letter and proposed conference agenda not to exceed seven pages. (Status Conference set for 6/26/2018 at 03:30 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 5/30/2018) As Per Chambers, Filed In All Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al. (ras) Modified on 5/30/2018 (ras).
May 29, 2018 Filing 218 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Danielle M. Gold dated May 29, 2018 re: Call-In Information for May 30, 2018 Status Conference. Document filed by Virginia Mary Assavedo.(Gold, Danielle)
May 23, 2018 Filing 217 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Stephen D. Raber dated May 23, 2018 re: Status Letter and Conference Agenda. Document filed by Astrazeneca AB, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca P.L.C., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co..(Haas, Lyndsey)
May 11, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker: Settlement Conference held on 5/11/2018. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(ca)
May 10, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker: Settlement Conference held on 5/10/2018. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(ca)
May 8, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker: Telephone Conference held on 5/8/2018. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(ca)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER. The Court has scheduled a preliminary settlement conference on May 10 and 11. Because of its preliminary nature, only Co-Lead Plaintiffs' counsel shall attend and parties are excused from attendance. The Court will schedule follow-up conferences as appropriate where individual parties with their respective counsel may attend. Defense counsel and Co-Lead Plaintiffs' counsel should report to Courtroom 17D at 1:00 p.m. on May 10, 2018 for the start of the conference. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(Parker, Katharine)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 213 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (212 in 1:17-md-02776-LGS) Letter, filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca P.L.C., Astrazeneca AB, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. ENDORSEMENT: ORDER NO. 29 (Discovery Schedule). The discovery schedule proposed by the parties is accepted by the Court. (Expert Discovery due by 3/22/2019. Fact Discovery due by 1/18/2019.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 5/1/2018) As per chambers, spread to all cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al. (ras)
May 1, 2018 Filing 212 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Stephen D. Raber dated 05/01/2018 re: Proposed Discovery Schedule. Document filed by Astrazeneca AB, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca P.L.C., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co..(Rome, Jacqueline)
April 30, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker: Telephone Conference held on 4/30/2018. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(ca)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER NO. 28 (Plaintiff Certification; Status Conference): The parties shall attend a status conference on May 30, 2018, at 3:00 p.m. As provided in Order No. 1, parties with similar interests may agree as to any conference, unless otherwise ordered, to have an attending attorney represent their interests instead of attending through their own attorney or, if pro se, in person. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Status Conference set for 5/30/2018 at 03:00 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/26/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(cf)
April 25, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lorna G. Schofield: Status Conference held on 4/25/2018. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(jcs)
April 24, 2018 Filing 209 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Danielle M. Gold dated April 24, 2018 re: Call-In Information for April 25, 2018 Status Conference. Document filed by Virginia Mary Assavedo.(Gold, Danielle)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting Peyton P. Murphy admission Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 4/23/2018) (kgo)
April 18, 2018 Filing 207 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Stephen D. Raber dated April 18, 2018 re: Status Letter and Conference Agenda. Document filed by Astrazeneca AB, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca P.L.C., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co..(Haas, Lyndsey)
April 10, 2018 Filing 206 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
April 2, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker: Settlement Structure Conference held on 4/2/2018. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(ca)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER. The Court is in receipt of the parties' letters concerning Monday's conference. Parties are not required to appear. The purpose of Monday's conference is to discuss cases, if any, that are ripe for settlement discussions. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(Parker, Katharine)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 203 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: (202 in 1:17-md-02776-LGS) Letter filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca P.L.C., Astrazeneca AB, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. ENDORSEMENT: The status conference scheduled for March 27, 2018, at 11:00 a.m. is adjourned until April 25, 2018, at 3:00 p.m. By April 18, 2018, at 5:00 p.m., the parties shall file a joint status letter and proposed conference agenda not to exceed seven pages. SO ORDERED., ( Status Conference set for 4/25/2018 at 03:00 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/26/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(ama)
March 26, 2018 Filing 202 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Lyndsey M. Haas dated March 26, 2018 re: Agreement re: Scope of Discovery and April Status Conference. Document filed by Astrazeneca AB, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca P.L.C., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co..(Haas, Lyndsey)
March 22, 2018 Filing 201 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 1/25/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
March 22, 2018 Filing 200 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 1/25/2018 before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jerry Harrison, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/12/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/23/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/20/2018.(McGuirk, Kelly)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 199 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (198 in 1:17-md-02776-LGS) Letter, filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca P.L.C., Astrazeneca AB, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. ENDORSEMENT: If the parties resolve their differences regarding the scope of Plaintiffs' requests for additional discovery, they shall inform the Court on or before March 26, 2018, at noon, and the status conference will be adjourned until April. The discovery schedule and other issues addressed in Order No. 27 will be discussed at the April status conference, when all lead counsel are present. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/22/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al, as per Chambers. (mro)
March 20, 2018 Filing 198 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Lyndsey M. Haas dated March 20, 2018 re: Status Letter and Conference Agenda. Document filed by Astrazeneca AB, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca P.L.C., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co..(Haas, Lyndsey)
March 20, 2018 Filing 197 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Christopher Adam Seeger on behalf of Virginia Mary Assavedo. New Address: Seeger Weiss LLP, 55 Challenger Road, 6th FL, Ridgefield Park, New Jersey, 07660, 212-584-0700. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(Seeger, Christopher)
March 20, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Stewart Hill Ackerly to RE-FILE Document #192 MOTION for Stewart Hill Ackerly to Withdraw as Attorney . ERROR(S): Supporting Documents are filed separately, each receiving their own document #'s. (db)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER NO. 27: It is hereby ORDERED that lead counsel for the parties shall appear at the conference in person and shall be prepared to discuss, in the context of the proposed schedule, the status of the case, factual development to date, the principal disputed issues, how the bellwether cases were selected and how they are expected to assist in the progress of the case, whether any critical disputed issues can be brought before the Court more quickly or efficiently, suggestions about the efficient progress of the litigation, what needs to be achieved before the parties can meaningfully value the cases, and other such matters. No court reporter will be present. All counsel in all actions are invited to attend in person or by phone. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/15/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(kgo)
March 15, 2018 Filing 195 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a conference proceeding held on 11/14/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
March 15, 2018 Filing 194 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: conference held on 11/14/2017 before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Alena Lynch, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/5/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/16/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/13/2018.(McGuirk, Kelly)
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER granting #187 Motion for Matthew David Heins to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lorna G. Schofield)(Text Only Order) (Schofield, Lorna)
March 14, 2018 Filing 192 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Stewart Hill Ackerly to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Astrazeneca AB, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca P.L.C., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Ackerly, Stewart) Modified on 3/20/2018 (db).
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 191 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on MOTION TO WITHDRAW. Comes Now, B. Kristian W. Rasmussen of the firm Cory Watson, P.C. and requests the Court's permission to withdraw as attorney of record for Plaintiff, Jamie Michelle Foran. Plaintiff will remain represented by Richard A. Wright. ENDORSEMENT: This application does not comply with the SDNY Local Rules regarding withdrawal of an attorney. If counsel wishes to withdraw as counsel of record, she must refile her motion, together with an affidavit, as required by Local Civil Rule 1.4. So ordered. Denying (113) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 1:17-cv-02661-LGS. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/14/2018). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS, 1:17-cv-02661-LGS. (rjm)
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER NO. 26 [DISCOVERY]: ORDERED that Plaintiffs may obtain discovery from the six additional custodians that Plaintiffs identified in their letter to the Court dated March 1, 2018. The parties shall meet and confer regarding the scope of this additional discovery. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint proposed amended discovery schedule, including bellwether discovery, on or before March 20, 2018, at 5:00 p.m. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/13/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al. and 17mc2776 (ap) Modified on 3/13/2018 (ap).
March 13, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lorna G. Schofield: Telephone Conference held on 3/13/2018. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(jcs)
March 13, 2018 Filing 189 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a confernece proceeding held on 2/22/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
March 13, 2018 Filing 188 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: conference held on 2/22/2018 before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Paula Speer, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/3/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/13/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/11/2018.(McGuirk, Kelly)
March 12, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #187 CONSENT MOTION for Matthew David Heins to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14799333. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
March 12, 2018 Filing 187 CONSENT MOTION for Matthew David Heins to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14799333. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Astrazeneca AB, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca P.L.C., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Haas, Lyndsey)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 186 OPINION AND ORDER re: (53 in 1:17-md-02776-LGS) MOTION to Dismiss Texas cases for failure to state a claim filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca P.L.C., Astrazeneca AB, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, (74 in 1:17-md-02776-LGS) MOTION to Dismiss Texas Plaintiffs' Amended Complaints filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. Defendants' motion to dismiss the Complaints is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motions at No. 17 MD 2776, Dkt. Nos. 53 and 74. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/9/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS, 1:16-cv-08959-LGS, 1:16-cv-08961-LGS, 1:16-cv-10003-LGS(mro)
March 8, 2018 Filing 185 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Lyndsey M. Haas dated March 8, 2018 re: Plaintiffs' Requests for Additional Discovery. Document filed by Astrazeneca AB, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca P.L.C., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co..(Haas, Lyndsey)
March 8, 2018 Filing 184 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Lyndsey M. Haas dated March 8, 2018 re: Bellwether Discovery Schedule. Document filed by Astrazeneca AB, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca P.L.C., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co..(Haas, Lyndsey)
March 8, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 3/13/2018 at 11:15 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (ap)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER NO. 25 [SCHEDULING]: It is hereby ORDERED that the conferences scheduled for March 13, 2018, at 11:15 a.m. in Miller v. Bristol-Myers Squibb et al., No. 17 Civ. 9444, and Clowes v. Bristol-Myers Squibb et al., No. 17 Civ. 5709, are CANCELED. The parties shall comply with the briefing schedule in the Order dated February 22, 2018. It is further ORDERED that the telephone conference scheduled for March 13, 2018, at 11:15 a.m. in In re Farxiga Products Liability Litigation, No. 17 MD 2776, will proceed as scheduled. The parties shall jointly call Chambers at (212) 805-0288 at the appointed date and time. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/8/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al. and 17mc2776. (ap)
March 1, 2018 Filing 182 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Holly H. Dolejsi dated March 1, 2018 re: additional custodians. Document filed by Chaim Z. Aron.(Dolejsi, Holly)
February 22, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 3/27/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 1106, Thurgood Marshal Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(jcs)
February 22, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lorna G. Schofield: Status Conference held on 2/22/2018. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(jcs)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER NO. 24 (MOTIONS TO DISMISS;DISCOVERY): Plaintiffs in Miller v. Bristol-Myers Squibb et al., No. 17 Civ. 9444, and Clowes v. Bristol-Myers Squibb et al., No. 17 Civ. 5709, shall file amended complaints on or before March 7, 2018. In each case, Defendants shall file their motion to dismiss on or before March 21, 2018. Each Plaintiff shall file his or her opposition on or before April 4, 2018. Defendants shall file their reply on or before April 10, 2018. Defendants' substitute bellwether selection is accepted. The parties shall meet and confer regarding the schedule to extend bellwether discovery. The parties shall file a joint letter with the proposed revised discovery schedule on or before March 8, 2018. If the parties cannot reach agreement, they shall explain issues on which they disagree and their respective proposals. Defendants' application to preclude Plaintiffs from contacting their treating physicians except with respect to specific issues is DENIED. Plaintiffs shall file a letter, not to exceed three, single-spaced pages, on or before March 1, 2018, stating what additional discovery they seek from Defendants and the reason for the requests. Defendants shall file a letter response, not to exceed three, single-spaced pages, on or before March 8, 2018. A telephone conference will be held on March 13, 2018, at 11:15 a.m. The parties shall jointly call Chambers at (212) 805-0288 at the appointed date and time. Defendants shall inform Plaintiffs about the logistics of the depositions of the Swedish deponents and the former employee on or before March 16, 2018. The parties shall attend a status conference on March 27, 2018, at 11:00 a.m. As provided in Order No. 1, parties with similar interests may agree as to any conference, unless otherwise ordered, to have an attending attorney represent their interests instead of attending through their own attorney or, if pro se, in person. By March 20, 2018, at 5:00 p.m., the parties shall file a joint status letter and proposed conference agenda not to exceed seven pages. Each underlined submission listed in this table shall be filed in both 17-md-2776 and 17-mc-2776. Any submissions that are not undermined shall be filed in the individual Plaintiff's cases, and as further set forth in this order. (In cases 17cv5709 and 17cv94447 Amended pleading due by 3/7/2018. Motion due by 3/21/2018. Response due by 4/4/2018. Reply due by 4/10/2018. Telephone conference set for 3/13/2018, at 11:15 A.M. The parties shall jointly call Chambers at (212) 805-0288 at the appointed date and time. Status conference set for 3/27/2018, at 11:00 A.M. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 2/22/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al. and 17mc2776. (ap)
February 21, 2018 Filing 180 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Danielle M. Gold dated February 21, 2018 re: Call-In Information for February 22, 2018 Status Conference. Document filed by Virginia Mary Assavedo.(Gold, Danielle)
February 21, 2018 Filing 179 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER IN ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL (CTO-9)transferring this action from the United States District Court - that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, the actions listed on the attached schedule A and pending in the District of Indiana, and the same hereby are, transferred to the Southern District of New York, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Lorna G. Schofield, for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings with the actions pending in that district and listed on Schedule A. (Signed by MDL Panel on 2/21/2018) (sjo)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER NO. 23 (ORDER RESCHEDULING CONFERENCE): It is hereby ORDERED that the conference in this matter previously scheduled for February 22, 2018 at 11:00 a.m., is rescheduled for February 22, 2018 at 11:15 a.m., due to a scheduling conflict. Status Conference set for 2/22/2018 at 11:15 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 2/20/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(kgo)
February 16, 2018 Filing 177 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: (21 in 1:17-cv-09444-LGS) Letter filed by Raymond Miller. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. Any party wishing to appearby telephone may do so by jointly calling Chambers at (212) 805-0288 at the appointed date and time. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 2/16/2018) (ama)
February 15, 2018 Filing 176 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Lyndsey M. Haas dated February 15, 2018 re: Status Letter and Conference Agenda. Document filed by Astrazeneca AB, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca P.L.C., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co..(Haas, Lyndsey)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER granting #172 Motion for Laura Lynn Pittner to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lorna G. Schofield)(Text Only Order) (Schofield, Lorna)
February 12, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #172 MOTION for Laura Lynn Pittner to Appear Pro Hac Vice Corrected. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jc)
February 12, 2018 Filing 172 MOTION for Laura Lynn Pittner to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee of $200.00 paid, receipt no. 0208-14689753Corrected. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Robin Wells. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Pittner, Laura) Modified on 2/12/2018 (jc).
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER with respect to #169 Letter Motion for Conference: Plaintiff shall file a response to Defendants' premotion letter, not to exceed three, single-spaced pages, on or before February 15, 2018. Defendants' anticipated motion will be discussed at the status conference scheduled for February 22, 2018, at 11:00 a.m. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lorna G. Schofield)(Text Only Order) (Schofield, Lorna)
February 9, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 2/15/2018 (kgo)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER granting #168 Letter Motion for Conference. Application GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file a response to Defendants' premotion letter, not to exceed three, single-spaced pages, on or before February 15, 2018. Defendants' anticipated motion will be discussed at the status conference scheduled for February 22, 2018, at 11:00 a.m. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 2/9/2018) (kgo)
February 9, 2018 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #173 ORDER. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (kgo)
February 9, 2018 Filing 171 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (170 in 1:17-md-02776-LGS) Letter, filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca P.L.C., Astrazeneca AB, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. ENDORSEMENT: The parties' letters will be discussed at the status conference scheduled for February 22, 2018, at 11:00 a.m. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 2/9/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(kgo)
February 9, 2018 Filing 170 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Stephen D. Raber dated 2/9/2018 re: Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Letter objecting to Defendants' Bellwether Selection. Document filed by Astrazeneca AB, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca P.L.C., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co..(Rome, Jacqueline)
February 8, 2018 Filing 169 LETTER MOTION for Conference Regarding Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Stephen D. Raber dated 2/8/2018. Document filed by Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co.. Return Date set for 2/22/2018 at 11:00 AM.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS, 1:17-cv-05709-LGS(Rome, Jacqueline)
February 8, 2018 Filing 168 LETTER MOTION for Conference Regarding Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Stephen D. Raber dated 2/8/2018. Document filed by Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP, Bristol Myers Squibb Co., Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co.. Return Date set for 2/22/2018 at 11:00 AM.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS, 1:17-cv-09444-LGS(Rome, Jacqueline)
February 8, 2018 Filing 167 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Holly H. Dolejsi dated February 8, 2018 re: Plaintiffs' objection to Defendant's bellwether selection. Document filed by Christina Perdue.(Dolejsi, Holly)
February 1, 2018 Filing 166 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Stephen D. Raber dated February 1, 2018 re: Replacement Bellwether Selection. Document filed by Astrazeneca AB, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca P.L.C., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co..(Haas, Lyndsey)
January 29, 2018 Filing 165 STIPULATION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), the parties respectfully request that all claims in Plaintiff's Complaints be dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to close only 17-cv-3122. (As further set forth herein.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/29/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS, 1:17-cv-03122-LGS(kgo)
January 26, 2018 Filing 164 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) All Defendants and without costs to either party pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Astrazeneca P.L.C., Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS, 1:17-cv-03122-LGS(Haas, Lyndsey)
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER NO. 22 : WHEREAS, a conference was held on January 25, 2018. It is hereby ORDERED that: Defendants shall file a letter, on or before February 1, 2018, identifying its selection of a replacement bellwether case. If Plaintiffs object to Defendants selection, Plaintiffs shall file a letter, on or before February 8, 2018, explaining the basis for their objection. The parties shall attend a status conference on February 22, 2018, at 11:00 a.m. As provided in Order No. 1, parties with similar interests may agree as to any conference, unless otherwise ordered, to have an attending attorney represent their interests instead of attending through their own attorney or, if pro se, in person.By February 15, 2018, at 5:00 p.m., the parties shall file a joint status letter and proposed conference agenda not to exceed seven pages.For ease of reference, the deadlines in this Order are listed in the table herein. Status Conference set for 2/22/2018 at 11:00 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/25/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(kgo) Modified on 3/13/2018 (kgo).
January 25, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lorna G. Schofield: Status Conference held on 1/25/2018. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(jcs)
January 24, 2018 Filing 162 STIPULATION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE: The parties respectfully request that all claims in Plaintiff's Complaint be dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to close only 17-cv-7048. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/24/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS, 1:17-cv-07048-LGS(kgo)
January 24, 2018 Filing 161 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Danielle M. Gold dated January 24, 2018 re: Call-In Information for January 25, 2018 Status Conference. Document filed by Virginia Mary Assavedo.(Gold, Danielle)
January 23, 2018 Filing 160 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) All Defendants and without costs to either party pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Astrazeneca P.L.C., Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS, 1:17-cv-07048-LGS(Haas, Lyndsey)
January 22, 2018 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO E-MAIL PDF. Note to Attorney Haas, Lyndsey for noncompliance with Section 18.3 of the S.D.N.Y. Electronic Case Filing Rules & Instructions. E-MAIL the PDF for Document #158 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal, #159 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal to: judgments@nysd.uscourts.gov. Please indicate MDL case number in the caption. (nd)
January 19, 2018 Filing 159 FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING OF NON-ECF DOCUMENT - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) All Defendants and without costs to either party pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Astrazeneca P.L.C., Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS, 1:17-cv-06750-LGS(Haas, Lyndsey) Modified on 1/22/2018 (nd).
January 19, 2018 Filing 158 FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING OF NON-ECF DOCUMENT - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Jonathan Davis, Louella Davis and without costs to either party pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Astrazeneca P.L.C., Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP.(Haas, Lyndsey) Modified on 1/22/2018 (nd).
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER: WHEREAS, the Order dated January 11, 2018, required Plaintiff to file a letter response to Defendants' premotion letter on or before January 18, 2018; WHEREAS, Plaintiff failed to file the letter. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file the letter as soon as possible and no later than January 23, 2018. The Clerk of Court is directed to docket this Order in 17-md-2776 and 17-cv-7048. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/19/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS, 1:17-cv-07048-LGS(mro)
January 19, 2018 Filing 156 STIPULATION TO DISMISS TO PREJUDICE: WHEREAS, on September 26, 2017, Plaintiff June Thompson filed a Complaint against Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., AstraZeneca LP, and AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-07286-LGS. WHEREAS, the parties agree to the herein Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) with each party bearing its own attorneys' fees, costs and expenses. NOW THEREFORE, the parties respectfully request that all claims in Plaintiff's Complaint be dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to close only 17-cv-7286. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/19/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS, 1:17-cv-07286-LGS(mro)
January 19, 2018 Filing 155 STIPULATION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE: WHEREAS, on September 25, 2017, Plaintiff Darla McKinney filed a Complaint against Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., AstraZeneca LP, and AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-07282-LGS. WHEREAS, the parties agree to the herein Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) with each party bearing its own attorneys' fees, costs and expenses. NOW THEREFORE, the parties respectfully request that all claims in Plaintiff's Complaint be dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to close on 17-cv-7282. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/19/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS, 1:17-cv-07282-LGS(mro)
January 18, 2018 Filing 154 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Danielle M. Gold dated January 18, 2018 re: Status Letter and Proposed Conference Agenda for the January 25, 2018 Status Conference. Document filed by Virginia Mary Assavedo.(Gold, Danielle)
January 18, 2018 Filing 153 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) All Defendants and without costs to either party pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Astrazeneca LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaecuticals LP, Astrazeneca LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS, 1:17-cv-07282-LGS(Rome, Jacqueline)
January 18, 2018 Filing 152 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) All Defendants and without costs to either party pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Astrazeneca LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Astrazeneca LP.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS, 1:17-cv-07286-LGS(Rome, Jacqueline)
January 11, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 1/18/2018. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS, 1:17-cv-07048-LGS(ap)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER: granting (148) Letter Motion for Conference in case 1:17-md-02776-LGS; granting (29) Letter Motion for Conference in case 1:17-cv-07048-LGS. Application GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file a letter response to Defendants' letter, not to exceed three, single-spaced pages, on or before January 18, 2018. Defendants' anticipated motion will be discussed at the status conference scheduled for January 25, 2018. Response due by 1/18/2018. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/11/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS, 1:17-cv-07048-LGS (ap)
January 11, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 1/18/2018. (ap)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER: granting (147) Letter Motion for Conference in case 1:17-md-02776-LGS; granting (33) Letter Motion for Conference in case 1:17-cv-07286-LGS. Application GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file a letter response to Defendants' letter, not to exceed three, single-spaced pages, on or before January 18, 2018. Defendants' anticipated motion will be discussed at the status conference scheduled for January 25, 2018. Response due by 1/18/2018. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/11/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS, 1:17-cv-07286-LGS (ap)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER granting (146) Letter Motion for Conference in case 1:17-md-02776-LGS; granting (27) Letter Motion for Conference in case 1:17-cv-07282-LGS. Application GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file a letter response to Defendants' letter, not to exceed three, single-spaced pages, on or before January 18, 2018. Defendants' anticipated motion will be discussed at the status conference scheduled for January 25, 2018. Response due by 1/18/2018. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/11/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS, 1:17-cv-07282-LGS (ap)
January 10, 2018 Filing 148 LETTER MOTION for Conference Regarding Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Stephen D. Raber dated 1/10/2018. Document filed by Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co.. Return Date set for 1/25/2018 at 11:00 AM.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS, 1:17-cv-07048-LGS(Rome, Jacqueline)
January 10, 2018 Filing 147 LETTER MOTION for Conference Regarding Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Stephen D. Raber dated 1/10/2018. Document filed by Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. Return Date set for 1/25/2018 at 11:00 AM.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS, 1:17-cv-07286-LGS(Rome, Jacqueline)
January 10, 2018 Filing 146 LETTER MOTION for Conference Regarding Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Stephen D. Raber dated 1/10/2018. Document filed by Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., AstraZeneca Pharmaecuticals LP, Astrazeneca LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. Return Date set for 1/25/2018 at 11:00 AM.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS, 1:17-cv-07282-LGS(Rome, Jacqueline)
January 10, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 4/2/2018 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(tn)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER: A settlement structure conference has been scheduled in this matter for April 2, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. As stated in Doc. No. 144, only lead and liaison counsel are required to attend in-person, but other counsel may participate in the conference telephonically. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 1/10/2018) ***As per chambers, Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(tn)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT STRUCTURE CONFERENCE: These cases have been referred to me for settlement purposes (Doc. No. 123). A conference will be held on Monday, April 2, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York in order for the parties to discuss the possibility of a mutually agreeable framework for proceeding with settlement negotiations. Co-lead counsel and liaison counsel for Plaintiffs shall attend the conference. Individual Plaintiffs' counsel may participate by phone by following the dial-in instructions contained in a separate order to be filed today. Counsel for Defendants shall attend in person. Parties are not required to attend. Counsel should come prepared to update the Court concerning the status of discovery as well as any motion practice in the litigation. The Court will additionally set aside May 10-11, 2018 as potential mediation days. The parties shall advise the Court on April 2, 2018 as to the identity of the individual cases, if any, that will be mediated on May 10-11. ( Settlement Conference set for 4/2/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 1/9/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(js)
January 8, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker: Pre-Settlement Conference held on 1/8/2018. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(ca)
January 5, 2018 Filing 143 STIPULATION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE: WHEREAS, the parties agree to the herein Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) with each party bearing its own attorneys' fees, costs and expenses. NOW THEREFORE, the parties respectfully request that all claims in Plaintiffs' Complaint be dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to close only 17-cv-8238. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/5/2018) (kgo)
January 5, 2018 Filing 142 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) All Defendants and without costs to either party pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Astrazeneca P.L.C., Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca AB, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Astrazeneca LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., Astrazeneca PLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS, 1:17-cv-08238-LGS(Rome, Jacqueline)
January 3, 2018 NOTICE: The PRE-SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE scheduled for Monday, January 8, 2018 at 4:30 p.m. will now be held in Courtroom 9-A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York re: Order on Motion for Conference. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(ca)
December 20, 2017 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 140 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (mt)
December 20, 2017 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 139 TRANSCRIPT. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (mt)
December 20, 2017 Filing 141 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Holly H. Dolejsi dated December 20, 2017 re: clarification of Doc. No. 138. Document filed by Chaim Z. Aron, Cherie Perez, Rodney Perez, Arquimedes Ponce.(Dolejsi, Holly)
December 19, 2017 Filing 138 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Danielle M. Gold dated December 19, 2017 re: Supplemental Briefing on Negligent Design Defect Claim. Document filed by Chaim Z. Aron, Cherie Perez, Rodney Perez, Arquimedes Ponce.(Gold, Danielle)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER in case 1:16-cv-08187-LGS; granting (136 in 17-md-2776) Letter Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:17-md-02776-LGS. Application Granted. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 12/19/17) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al. (yv) Modified on 12/19/2017 (yv).
December 18, 2017 Filing 136 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time for Mediation Statements addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Stephen D. Raber dated 12/18/2017. Document filed by Astrazeneca AB, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca P.L.C., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co..(Rome, Jacqueline)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER NO. 21 [DISCOVERY REQUESTS, AMENDED DISCOVERY SCHEDULE AND MOTIONS TO DISMISS THE TEXAS CASES]: Defendants requested that the Court order Plaintiffs to: (1) use "blanket authorizations" allowing Defendants to access Plaintiffs' medical records from newly "discovered" providers and facilities, as needed; (2) authorize Defendants to receive Plaintiffs' employment records; (3) authorize Defendants to receive Plaintiffs' mental health records; (4) grant Defendants access to Plaintiffs' social media and email accounts; and (5) provide a certification stating that Plaintiffs have made a good faith effort to locate all documents requested under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 34. Defendants' requests are denied, except as follows: Plaintiffs' Counsel shall contact each of their clients to describe each of Defendants' twenty-four requests for production and ensure that he or she understands the nature of each specific request and has conducted a thorough search. Plaintiffs' Counsel further shall ask each of their clients to identify all medical facilities where he or she received medical services or treatment, and all medical providers who provided medical services or treatment, for the ten-year period preceding his or her first ingesting Farxiga. Plaintiffs' Counsel further shall produce authorizations as to each of the facilities and providers that their clients identify, and shall respond to additional requests from Defendants on an as needed basis. Completion of all general fact discovery, including depositions of generic fact witnesses -- April 30, 2018. Completion of all fact discovery for bellwether cases June 30, 2018. Deadline for expert discovery on general causation and general liability -- August 30, 2018. Each underlined submission listed in this table shall be filed in both 17-md-2776 and 17-mc-2776, and as further set forth in this order. Responses due by 12/19/2017 Replies due by 12/22/2017. Deposition due by 4/30/2018. Fact Discovery due by 6/30/2018. Expert Discovery due by 8/30/2018. Pre-Motion Conference set for 9/25/2018 at 11:00 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Status Conference set for 1/25/2018 at 11:00 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 12/14/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al. and 17mc2776. (ap)
December 12, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lorna G. Schofield: Status Conference held on 12/12/2017. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(jcs)
December 11, 2017 Filing 134 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Danielle M. Gold dated December 11, 2017 re: Call-In Information for December 12, 2017 Status Conference. Document filed by Mary Kay Bledsoe.(Gold, Danielle)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 133 SCHEDULING ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the proceeding in this matter, previously scheduled for December 12, 2017, at 4:00 p.m., shall be rescheduled for December 12, 2017, at 5:15 p.m., due to a scheduling conflict. (Status Conference set for 12/12/2017 at 05:15 PM in Courtroom 1106, Thurgood Marshal Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 12/08/2017) (jcs)
December 6, 2017 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 1/8/2018 at 04:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(tn)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER: A pre-settlement conference has been scheduled in this matter for January 8, 2018 at 4:30 p.m. As stated in Doc. No. 127, only lead and liaison counsel are required to attend in-person, but other counsel may email Chambers to request to participate in the conference telephonically, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 12/6/2017) ***As per chambers, Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(tn)
December 6, 2017 Filing 131 WAIVER re: Personal Jurisdiction. Document filed by Chaim Z. Aron, Sayed Asif, Virginia Mary Assavedo, Beverly Bailey, Betty Barker, Scott Barker, Mary Kay Bledsoe, Joseph Blois, Racheal Blois, Nate Blonde, Dalton Burkett, Yvonne Burkett, Jeannette Clowes, Michael Cormier, Jennifer Correa, Jonathan Davis, Louella Davis, Dennis Doty, Lorraine Doty, Helelaine Evans-Osborn, Jamie Michelle Foran, David Fowler, Kimberly Fowler, Melva Grayson, Beverly Hudson, Rod Hudson, Brenda Lafanette, Melissa Link, Kimara Lyons, Christina Marino, Denzil Martin, Darla McKinney, Becky Moore, Judd Moore, Rose Moore, Veronica Moore, Christina Perdue, Cherie Perez, Rodney Perez, Bobbie Pittman, Arquimedes Ponce, Jason Popwell, Elizabeth Prosser, Charlene Robertson, Jerry Roman, Garret Scott(individually), Garret Scott(On Behalf of Linda Alexis White, Deceased), Sally Seay, Bruce Shayne, Michael Smith, Lapascha Teasley, Tyeward Teasley, June Thompson, Kamilah Young.(Gold, Danielle)
December 5, 2017 Filing 130 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Stephen D. Raber dated 12/5/2017 re: Status Letter and Conference Agenda. Document filed by Astrazeneca AB, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca P.L.C., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co..(Rome, Jacqueline)
November 29, 2017 Filing 129 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Stephen D. Raber dated November 29, 2017 re: Case Management Plan. Document filed by Astrazeneca AB, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca P.L.C., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Haas, Lyndsey)
November 29, 2017 Filing 128 WAIVER re: objections to personal jurisdiction, waived by non-resident Defendants for the purposes of pretrial proceedings. Document filed by Astrazeneca AB, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca P.L.C., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co..(Haas, Lyndsey)
November 29, 2017 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #127 Order. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (yv)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER in case 1:16-cv-08187-LGS; granting (126 in 17-md-2776) Letter Motion for Conference. APPLICATION GRANTED. Conference rescheduled to January 8, 2018 at 4:30 p.m. Only lead and liaison counsel are required to attend in-person. Requests by other counsel to participate by phone may be made by email to Parker_NYSD_Chambers@nysd.uscourts.gov. By no later than January 2, lead counsel shall email to my chambers ex parte submissions as proposed. So Ordered. (Settlement Conference set for 1/8/2018 at 04:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker.) in case 1:17-md-02776-LGS. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 11/29/17) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al. (yv)
November 28, 2017 Filing 126 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Conference Scheduled Pursuant to November 20, 2017 Order addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Ellen Relkin dated November 28, 2017. Document filed by Beverly Hudson, Rod Hudson.(Relkin, Ellen)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER SCHEDULING PRE-SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE, These cases have been referred to me for settlement purposes (Doc. No. 123). A conference will be held on Monday, December 18, 2017 at 3:30 p.m. in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York, in advance of a settlement conference. The purpose of the conference is to discuss the structure and timing for proceeding with settlement discussions in these cases. Counsel for all parties shall attend the conference; however, the parties are not required to attend. In advance of the conference, the parties in each case shall submit a letter to the Court outlining (1) a summary of the claims and defenses, and (2) any significant facts and issues relevant to each individual case. This letter, which shall not exceed ten (10) pages, shall be filed on ECF by no later than December 11, 2017. This submission does not need to include all of the information required under Section V(c) of Judge Parker's Individual Rules of Practice. SO ORDERED. (Settlement Conference set for 12/18/2017 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 11/20/17) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(yv)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Referred to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 11/15/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al. and 17mc2776. (ap)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER NO. 20: On or before November 29, 2017, the parties shall file a joint letter including a proposed amended case management plan. To the extent that the parties disagree as to the proposed schedule, the parties shall note with specificity the basis for their disagreement and, if appropriate, provide separate proposals. On or before November 29, 2017, the parties shall each file a waiver on behalf of their respective out-of-state clients, waiving those clients' personal jurisdiction and submitting to the Court's jurisdiction. The deadline for Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel to email Chambers the report required by Order No. 9 is adjourned pending a superseding order regarding the filing of such submissions. The parties shall attend a status conference on December 12, 2017, at 4 p.m. As provided in Order No. 1, parties with similar interests may agree as to any conference, unless otherwise ordered, to have an attending attorney represent their interests instead of attending through their own attorney or, if pro se, in person. By December 5, 2017, at 5:00 p.m., the parties shall file a joint status letter and proposed conference agenda not to exceed seven pages. Each underlined submission listed in this table shall be filed in both 17-MD-2776 and 17-MC-2776, and as further set forth in this order. (Status Conference set for 12/12/2017 at 4:00 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 11/15/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al. and 17mc2776.(ap)
November 14, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lorna G. Schofield: Telephone Conference held on 11/14/2017. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(jcs)
November 14, 2017 Filing 122 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Danielle Megan Gold on behalf of Sally Seay. (Gold, Danielle)
November 14, 2017 Filing 121 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Danielle Megan Gold on behalf of Kamilah Young. (Gold, Danielle)
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 120 SCHEDULING ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the proceeding in this matter, previously scheduled for November 14, 2017 at 4:30 p.m., shall be rescheduled for November 14, 2017 at 4:00 p.m., due to a scheduling conflict. (Telephone Conference set for 11/14/2017 at 04:00 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 11/14/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(jcs)
November 13, 2017 Filing 119 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Danielle M. Gold dated November 13, 2017 re: Call-In Information for November 14, 2017 Status Conference. Document filed by Betty Barker, Scott Barker.(Gold, Danielle)
November 13, 2017 Filing 118 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Stephen D. Raber dated November 13, 2017 re: Proposed Bellwether Cases. Document filed by Astrazeneca AB, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca P.L.C., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co..(Haas, Lyndsey)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER NO. 19: It is hereby ORDERED that a status conference will be held by telephone on November 14, 2017, at 4:30 p.m. Counsel for Plaintiffs shall initiate a conference call and shall provide the Court with a telephone number to join the conference at the appointed date and time. Telephone Conference set for 11/14/2017 at 4:30 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 11/9/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al and 17mc2776. (ap)
November 8, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judges Lorna G. Schofield and Katharine H. Parker: Science Day held on 11/8/2017. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(jcs)
November 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 116 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned parties, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), that Defendants AstraZeneca PLC and AstraZeneca AB be dismissed without prejudice in the above-captioned case, each party to bear its own fees and costs. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 11/3/2017) (rjm)
November 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER NO. 18 (ADJOURNING CONFERENCE): It is hereby ORDERED that the case management conference scheduled for November 8, 2017, commencing immediately after Science Day, is adjourned sine die. The parties shall confer and be prepared to suggest dates for rescheduling the conference, which will be discussed at Science Day on November 8, 2017. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 11/2/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al. and 17mc2776. (ap) Modified on 11/2/2017 (ap).
November 2, 2017 Filing 112 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Lyndsey M. Haas dated November 2, 2017 re: Discovery Status. Document filed by Astrazeneca AB, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca P.L.C., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co..(Haas, Lyndsey)
November 1, 2017 Filing 115 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned parties, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), that the above-captioned case be dismissed without prejudice, each party to bear its own fees and costs. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 11/1/2017) (jwh)
November 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: WHEREAS, Plaintiff and Defendants AstraZeneca PLC and AstraZeneca AB have agreed to dismissal without prejudice of Defendants AstraZeneca PLC and AstraZeneca AB; it is ORDERED that Plaintiff's claims against AstraZeneca PLC and AstraZeneca AB are hereby dismissed without prejudice. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 11/1/2017) (jwh)
November 1, 2017 Filing 111 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Holly H. Dolejsi dated November 1, 2017 re: Plaintiffs' status letter. Document filed by Chaim Z. Aron.(Dolejsi, Holly)
November 1, 2017 Filing 110 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Lyndsey M. Haas dated November 1, 2017 re: Status Letter. Document filed by Astrazeneca AB, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca P.L.C., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co..(Haas, Lyndsey)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER granting #95 Motion for Stewart Hill Ackerly to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lorna G. Schofield)(Text Only Order) (Schofield, Lorna)
October 31, 2017 Filing 108 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co. and without costs to either party pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Steve Collins.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS, 1:16-cv-09722-LGS(Fiebiger, Rolf)
October 30, 2017 Filing 107 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Lyndsey M. Haas dated October 30, 2017 re: Personal Electronic Devices and General Purpose Computing Devices. Document filed by Astrazeneca AB, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca P.L.C., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Haas, Lyndsey)
October 30, 2017 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so redesignated. (ma)
October 27, 2017 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 11/8/2017 at 02:30 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(mro)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER NO. 17: It is hereby ORDERED that "Science Day" is adjourned from November 8, 2017, at 10:30 a.m., until November 8, 2017, at 2:30 p.m. The parties are reminded to coordinate with the Clerk of Court and James Street to video record the proceedings. The video recording shall be submitted to the Court and shall be for use by the Court only. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 10/27/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al., as per Chambers.(mro) (Main Document 106 replaced on 11/1/2017) (jcs).
October 26, 2017 Filing 105 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a conference proceeding held on 10/4/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
October 26, 2017 Filing 104 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: conference held on 10/4/2017 before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jerry Harrison, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/16/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/27/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/24/2018.(McGuirk, Kelly)
October 25, 2017 Filing 103 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (56 in 1:17-mc-02776-LGS) Letter filed by Farxiga MDL Plaintiffs, (102 in 1:17-md-02776-LGS) Letter, filed by Mary Kay Bledsoe. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. The parties' deadline to file a joint letter proposing bellwether cases is extended from November 6, 2017, to November 13, 2017. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 10/25/2017) (mro)
October 24, 2017 Filing 102 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Danielle Gold dated October 24, 2017 re: One-Week Extension for Selection of Bellwether Cases. Document filed by Mary Kay Bledsoe.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS, 1:17-cv-02672-LGS(Gold, Danielle)
October 18, 2017 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO E-MAIL PDF. Note to Attorney Timothy O'Brien for noncompliance with Section 18.3 of the S.D.N.Y. Electronic Case Filing Rules & Instructions. E-MAIL the PDF for Document #100 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal to: judgments@nysd.uscourts.gov. (km)
October 17, 2017 Filing 100 FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING OF NON-ECF DOCUMENT - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, WITHOUT prejudice against the defendant(s) Astrazeneca AB, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca P.L.C., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co. and WITHOUT costs to either party pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Joy Beasley.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS, 1:17-cv-04312-LGS(O'Brien, Timothy) Modified on 10/18/2017 (km).
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER NO. 16: It is hereby ORDERED that, on or before October 27, 2017, Liaison Counsel shall email Chambers a second supplemental report, including a detailed breakdown of all time spent and expenses incurred for the common benefit. All future reports shall include such detailed information. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 10/16/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(kgo) Modified on 10/17/2017 (kgo).
October 13, 2017 Filing 99 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #74 MOTION to Dismiss Texas Plaintiffs' Amended Complaints. . Document filed by Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co.. (Rome, Jacqueline)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 98 STIPULATION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendants BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, ASTRAZENECA PLC, ASTRAZENECA LP, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, and ASTRAZENECA AB. Each party is to bear its own costs. So Ordered. Party Astrazeneca L.P., Astrazeneca P.L.C., Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, AstraZeneca PHarmaceuticals L.P. and Astrazeneca AB terminated. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 10/13/17) (yv) Modified on 10/13/2017 (yv).
October 13, 2017 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO E-MAIL PDF. Note to Attorney Timothy O'Brien for noncompliance with Section 18.3 of the S.D.N.Y. Electronic Case Filing Rules & Instructions. E-MAIL the PDF for Document #97 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal with handwritten signatures of the attorneys to: judgments@nysd.uscourts.gov. (km)
October 12, 2017 Filing 97 FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING OF NON-ECF DOCUMENT - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, WITHOUT prejudice against the defendant(s) Astrazeneca AB, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca P.L.C., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co. and without costs to either party pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Joy Beasley.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS, 1:17-cv-04312-LGS(O'Brien, Timothy) Modified on 10/13/2017 (km).
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER: WHEREAS, "Science Day" will be held on November 8, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall coordinate with the Clerk of Court and James Street, the Courtroom Deputy to video record the proceedings on "Science Day." The video recording shall be submitted to the Court and shall be for use by the Court only. The Clerk of Court is directed to file this Order in 17-MD-2776 only. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 10/10/2017) (mro)
October 11, 2017 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #95 MOTION for Stewart Hill Ackerly to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14226614. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
October 10, 2017 Filing 95 MOTION for Stewart Hill Ackerly to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14226614. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Astrazeneca AB, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca P.L.C., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Ackerly, Stewart)
October 6, 2017 Filing 94 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Astrazeneca AB, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca P.L.C., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co..(Rome, Jacqueline)
October 4, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lorna G. Schofield: Status Conference held on 10/4/2017. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(jcs)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER NO. 15: By October 13, 2017 Plaintiffs who have not yet served Defendants with a short form complaint and/or fact sheet shall serve Defendants with the outstanding document(s) or show cause why their respective case should not be dismissed. The relevant cases are shown herein. By October 11, 2017, Plaintiffs shall email to Chambers a letter describing what work each law firm completed to justify the expenditures listed in the letter that they submitted via email on September 28, 2017. Plaintiffs shall submit a similar summary each time they request approval of common benefit payments. The November conference will be held immediately after Science Day on November 8, 2017. The parties shall file a status letter and proposed agenda by November 1, 2017, at 5:00 P.M. (As further set forth herein.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 10/4/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(kgo)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER granting (59) Motion to Amend/Correct in case 1:16-cv-09330-LGS. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for a refund of the duplicate filing fee and designation of Doc. No. 58 as the Amended Complaint by the Clerk's office is hereby GRANTED. A copy of this order has been sent to the Finance Dept. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 10/4/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS, 1:16-cv-09330-LGS (kgo) Modified on 10/4/2017 (kgo).
October 4, 2017 Filing 91 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERNECE proceeding held on 9/6/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
October 4, 2017 Filing 90 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 9/6/2017 before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/25/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/6/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/2/2018.(McGuirk, Kelly)
October 3, 2017 Filing 88 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Danielle M. Gold dated October 3, 2017 re: Call-In Information for October 4, 2017 Status Conference. Document filed by Virginia Mary Assavedo.(Gold, Danielle)
September 29, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/6/2017. (kgo)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Richard A. Wright dated 9/28/2017 re: One week extension for filing the Short Form Amended Complaint. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file her short form complaint by 10/6/17. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to file this order ONLY on the docket in 17 civ. 2661. Amended Pleadings due by 10/6/2017. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/29/2017) (kgo)
September 29, 2017 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 10/4/2017 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 1106, Thurgood Marshal Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(jcs)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the proceeding in this matter, previously scheduled for October 5, 2017 at 11:00 a.m., shall be rescheduled for October 4, 2017 at 11:00 a.m., due to a scheduling conflict. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to file this Order on dockets 17-md-2776 and 17-mc-2776. Status Conference set for 10/4/2017 at 11:00 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/29/2017) (kgo)
September 28, 2017 Filing 86 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Danielle M. Gold dated September 28, 2017 re: Plaintiffs' Position on the Status of Discovery. Document filed by Virginia Mary Assavedo, Betty Barker, Mary Kay Bledsoe, Joseph Blois, Racheal Blois, Dalton Burkett, Yvonne Burkett, David Fowler, Kimberly Fowler, Beverly Hudson, Rod Hudson, Melissa Link, Cherie Perez, Rodney Perez, Arquimedes Ponce, Jason Popwell, Elizabeth Prosser.(Gold, Danielle)
September 28, 2017 Filing 85 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Stephen D. Raber dated September 28, 2017 re: Status Letter and Conference Agenda. Document filed by Astrazeneca AB, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca P.L.C., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co..(Haas, Lyndsey)
September 28, 2017 Filing 84 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lyndsey M Haas on behalf of Astrazeneca AB, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca P.L.C., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co.. (Haas, Lyndsey)
September 27, 2017 Filing 83 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Holly H. Dolejsi dated September 27, 2017 re: request for oral argument. Document filed by Chaim Z. Aron, Cherie Perez, Rodney Perez, Arquimedes Ponce.(Dolejsi, Holly)
September 27, 2017 Filing 82 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #74 MOTION to Dismiss Texas Plaintiffs' Amended Complaints. . Document filed by Chaim Z. Aron, Cherie Perez, Rodney Perez, Arquimedes Ponce. (Dolejsi, Holly)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER NO. 14: In an effort to streamline motion practice and promote efficiency in this MDL, the parties have agreed upon an Amended Master Complaint and streamlined Short Form Complaint process in exchange for Defendants' agreement not to file Rule 12(b)(6) motions to dismiss the claims contained in such Complaint. The Amended Master Complaint and form of Short Form Complaint are filed respectively in 17-MD-2776 as Docket Nos. 79-2 and 79-1, and in 17-MC-2776 at Docket Nos. 43-2 and 43-1. The counts contained in the Amended Master Complaint are (i) Strict Liability-Failure to Warn, (ii) Negligence and, where applicable, (iii) Loss of Consortium, (iv) Wrongful Death, and (v) Survival Action. Texas cases are excluded from the parties' agreement and dispositive motions in those cases will proceed in accordance with the schedule set forth in Order No. 12. Nothing in the agreement between the PSC and Defendants shall prevent individual Plaintiffs from including additional claims in their Short Form Complaint, provided however that any individual Plaintiff considering a claim for Strict Products Liability Design Defect, Breach of Express Warranties, Negligent Misrepresentation-Over-Promotion, Willful and Wanton Conduct or Gross Negligence, or Punitive Damages shall consult with the PSC before including such a claim. Defendants may file a Rule 12(b)(6) motion to dismiss any such additional claims, and the individual Plaintiff asserting the claims shall respond to any such motions on his or her own behalf, without the participation of the PSC. Defendants shall file a pre-motion letter with respect to any proposed motion to dismiss in the form and manner provided in Individual Rule III.A.1, and shall disregard Rule III.A.3. Plaintiffs' agreement to dismiss the allegations of Willful and Wanton Conduct or Gross Negligence, and the claim for Punitive Damages, is without prejudice and Plaintiffs retain the right to move to amend the Amended Master Complaint to include said allegations following discovery. Defendants preserve their right to oppose such a motion, with the understanding that if the motion to amend is granted, such claims shall relate back to the original filing date of the respective complaints. All counts alleged in the Amended Master Complaint are deemed pled, and all parties named therein are deemed named, in any previously filed Complaint and in any Short Form Complaint hereafter filed, nunc pro tunc, to the date each such Complaint was originally filed. If the PSC later identifies additional Defendants or claims it wishes to add to the Amended Master Complaint, it shall seek leave from the Court pursuant to the applicable Federal Rule of Civil Procedure. The parties shall meet and confer regarding Rule 30 depositions and disclosures by September 25, 2017. If the parties are unable to agree on the terms of discovery, the parties shall submit their positions via letter on ECF by September 28, 2017. The parties shall attend a status conference on October 5, 2017, at 11:00 a.m. As provided in Order No. 1, parties with similar interests may agree as to any conference, unless otherwise ordered, to have an attending attorney represent their interests instead of attending through their own attorney or, if pro se, in person. By September 28, 2017, at 5:00 p.m., the parties shall file a joint status letter and proposed conference agenda not to exceed seven pages, and as further set forth in this order. (Status Conference set for 10/5/2017 at 11:00 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/7/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al. (ap) Modified on 9/7/2017 (ap). Modified on 9/8/2017 (ap).
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER No. 13: On November 8, 2017, beginning at 10:30 a.m., the Court will hold "Science Day" to provide the Court with an overview of certain medical and scientific issues associated with the medicines Farxiga and Xigduo XR and the injuries being alleged by Plaintiffs in an objective format without advocacy. The Parties have agreed to the following ground rules to govern Science Day, as set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/7/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al. (mml)
September 6, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lorna G. Schofield: Status Conference held on 9/6/2017. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(jcs)
September 6, 2017 Filing 79 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Danielle M. Gold dated 09/06/2017 re: Proposed Short Form Complaint, Implementing Order and Master Amended Long Form Complaint. Document filed by Kimberly Fowler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Short Form Complaint, #2 Exhibit Amended Master Long Form Complaint, #3 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(Gold, Danielle)
September 5, 2017 Filing 78 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Danielle M. Gold dated September 5, 2017 re: Dial In Number for September 6, 2017 Status Conference. Document filed by Virginia Mary Assavedo, Betty Barker, Scott Barker, Mary Kay Bledsoe, Joseph Blois, Racheal Blois, Dalton Burkett, Yvonne Burkett, Helelaine Evans-Osborn, David Fowler, Kimberly Fowler, Beverly Hudson, Rod Hudson, Melissa Link, Steve Link, Cherie Perez, Rodney Perez, Bobbie Pittman, Arquimedes Ponce, Jason Popwell, Elizabeth Prosser.(Gold, Danielle)
September 1, 2017 Filing 77 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Stephen D. Raber dated September 1, 2017 re: Status Letter and Conference Agenda. Document filed by Astrazeneca AB, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca P.L.C., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co..(Rome, Jacqueline)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting #72 Motion for Lyndsey M. Haas to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lorna G. Schofield)(Text Only Order) (Schofield, Lorna)
August 30, 2017 Filing 75 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #74 MOTION to Dismiss Texas Plaintiffs' Amended Complaints. . Document filed by Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Rome, Jacqueline)
August 30, 2017 Filing 74 MOTION to Dismiss Texas Plaintiffs' Amended Complaints. Document filed by Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co..(Rome, Jacqueline)
August 25, 2017 Filing 73 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER IN ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL (CTO-8) transferring this action from the United States District Court - that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, the actions listed on the attached schedule A and pending in the District of Alabama, and the same hereby are, transferred to the Southern District of New York, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Lorna G. Schofield, for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings with the actions pending in that district and listed on Schedule A. (Signed by MDL Panel on 8/25/2017) (sjo)
August 24, 2017 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #72 CONSENT MOTION for Lyndsey M. Haas to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14052934. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
August 24, 2017 Filing 72 CONSENT MOTION for Lyndsey M. Haas to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14052934. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Astrazeneca AB, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca P.L.C., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in support., #2 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing: Colorado and Washington, D.C., #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Rome, Jacqueline)
August 18, 2017 Filing 71 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Stephen D. Raber dated 08/18/2017 re: Proposed Master Complaint and Global Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., AstraZeneca PHarmaceuticals L.P., Astrazeneca L.P., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., Astrazeneca LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., Astrazeneca AB, Astrazeneca P.L.C., Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Janssen Ortho L.L.C., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Johnson & Johnson, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., Does 1-100, Bristol-Meyers Squibb Co, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., Astrazeneca AB, Astrazeneca P.L.C., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca PHarmaceuticals L.P., Astrazeneca L.P., Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., AstraZeneca PHarmaceuticals L.P., Astrazeneca AB, Astrazeneca L.P., Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(Rome, Jacqueline)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER No. 12: Defendants shall file a motion to dismiss the Amended Complaint in the Texas cases by August 30, 2017. Plaintiffs shall file an opposition to Defendants' motion to dismiss by September 27, 2017. Defendants shall file a reply in support of their motion by October 13, 2017. These deadlines supersede the deadlines provided in Order No. 11. By August 18, 2017, the parties shall confer and file a joint letter including a joint proposal on how to best move forward with a global motion to dismiss issues common to all complaints and a proposed briefing schedule for the motion. In the event that the parties cannot agree on a joint proposal, they shall file a joint letter setting forth each party's position. This deadline supersedes the August 11, 2017, deadline provided in Order No. 7. By August 16, 2017, Plaintiff's counsel in Betters v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Co. et al., 17 Civ. 3636 (LGS), shall dismiss Bristol-Myers Squibb from Plaintiff's Complaint or the case will be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. The parties shall jointly submit a proposed case management order to govern Science Day procedures by September 1, 2017. For the reasons stated at the conference, Defendants' objections to (1) anchor terms related to Defendants' clinical trials, (2) search terms designed to identify adverse events of diabetic ketoacidosis ("DKA") and kidney injury where no DKA or kidney injury diagnosis is made, (3) the search terms "PV" or "pharmacovigilance" are overruled. For unaddressed objections, the parties shall confer with each other and attempt to resolve the objection, adopting a presumption that the Court would rule for Plaintiffs. In the event that the parties cannot agree on any remaining objections, they shall submit status letters setting forth their respective positions on the remaining objections. The deadline for Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel to email Chambers the report required by Order No. 9 is extended from September 1, 2017, to September 8, 2017. The parties shall attend a status conference on September 6, 2017, at 11:00 a.m. As provided in Order No. 1, parties with similar interests may agree as to any conference, unless otherwise ordered, to have an attending attorney represent their interests instead of attending through their own attorney or, if pro se, in person. By September 1, 2017, at 5:00 p.m., the parties shall file a joint status letter and proposed conference agenda not to exceed seven pages. For ease of reference, the deadlines in this Order are listed in the table below: as set forth herein. Each underlined submission listed in this table shall be filed in both 17-MD-2776 and 17-MC-2776. Actions that are not underlined should not be filed in either case file., ( Motions due by 8/30/2017., Responses due by 9/27/2017, Replies due by 10/13/2017., Status Conference set for 9/6/2017 at 11:00 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 8/10/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(ama)
August 10, 2017 Filing 69 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER IN ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL (CTO-7) transferring this action from the United States District Court - that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, the actions listed on the attached schedule A and pending in the District of California, and the same hereby are, transferred to the Southern District of New York, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Lorna G. Schofield, for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings with the actions pending in that district and listed on Schedule A. (Signed by MDL Panel on 8/9/2017) (sjo)
August 9, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lorna G. Schofield: Status Conference held on 8/9/2017. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(jcs)
August 8, 2017 Filing 68 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Danielle M. Gold dated August 8, 2017 re: Dial In Number for August 9, 2017 Status Conference. Document filed by Virginia Mary Assavedo, Mary Kay Bledsoe, Joseph Blois, Racheal Blois, Dalton Burkett, Yvonne Burkett, Steve Collins, Michael Cormier, David Fowler, Kimberly Fowler, Beverly Hudson, Rod Hudson, Melissa Link, Steve Link, Kimara Lyons, Cherie Perez, Rodney Perez, Bobbie Pittman, Arquimedes Ponce, Jason Popwell, Elizabeth Prosser, Michael Smith.(Gold, Danielle)
August 4, 2017 Filing 67 MASTER ALLEGATIONS AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL. Document filed by Christina Adams-Kinnison, Chaim Z. Aron, Virginia Mary Assavedo, Joy Beasley, Donna Betters, Mary Kay Bledsoe, Joseph Blois, Racheal Blois, Dalton Burkett, Yvonne Burkett, Steve Collins, Michael Cormier, Jennifer Correa, Dennis Doty, Lorraine Doty, Jamie Michelle Foran, David Fowler, Kimberly Fowler, Beverly Hudson, Rod Hudson, Melissa Link, Steve Link, Kimara Lyons, Denzil Martin, Becky Moore, Cherie Perez, Rodney Perez, Bobbie Pittman, Arquimedes Ponce, Jason Popwell, Elizabeth Prosser, Jerry Roman, Sally Seay, Bruce Shayne, Michael Smith, Kamilah Young.(Relkin, Ellen)
August 4, 2017 Filing 66 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Stephen D. Raber dated August 4, 2017 re: Status Letter and Conference Agenda. Document filed by Astrazeneca AB, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca P.L.C., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co..(Rome, Jacqueline)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER No. 11: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaints by August 18, 2017. It is further ORDERED that if Defendants file a motion to dismiss the Amended Complaints, Plaintiffs shall respond to Defendants' motion by September 15, 2017. ( Responses due by 9/15/2017) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 8/3/2017) (rj)
July 31, 2017 Filing 64 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Danielle Gold dated July 31, 2017 re: Request to Revise Briefing Schedule for Consolidated Motion to Dismiss Texas Cases. Document filed by Chaim Z. Aron, Cherie Perez, Rodney Perez, Arquimedes Ponce.(Gold, Danielle)
July 27, 2017 Filing 63 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 7/7/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(McGuirk, Kelly)
July 27, 2017 Filing 62 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 7/7/2017 before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rebecca Forman, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/17/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/28/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/25/2017.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(McGuirk, Kelly)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER NO: 10: WHEREAS, pursuant to Order No. 7, the parties were directed to submit a proposed discovery schedule adopting the dates proposed in the parties' June 19, 2017, joint proposed discovery schedule and including dates for discovery in the bellwether cases, it is hereby ORDERED that: A. All general fact discovery, including depositions of generic fact witnesses, shall be completed by February 15, 2018. B. Defendants shall produce documents in response to Plaintiffs' document requests on a rolling basis, and shall aim to complete document production by November 22, 2017. C. All case-specific fact discovery pertaining to bellwether cases shall be completed by March 16, 2018. D. Plaintiffs shall make the general causation and general liability expert disclosures required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) by February 8, 2018. E. Plaintiffs shall make the specific causation expert disclosures required by Fed. R. Civ. 26(a)(2) by March 9, 2018. F. Defendants shall make the general causation and general liability expert disclosures required by Fed. R. Civ. 26(a)(2) by April 6, 2018. G. Defendants shall make the specific causation expert disclosures required by Fed. R. Civ. 26(a)(2) by May 11, 2018. H. All general causation and general liability expert discovery shall be completed no later than May 31, 2018. I. All case-specific expert discovery pertaining to bellwether cases shall be completed no later than May 31, 2018. J. Daubert motions on general causation and general liability experts shall be filed no later than July 13, 2018. K. Daubert motions on case-specific experts shall be filed no later than August 17, 2018. L. Summary judgment motions on general causation shall be filed no later than August 17, 2018. M. Summary judgment motions on specific causation shall be filed no later than September 15, 2018. The Court will rule on the appropriateness of the disputed ESI search terms at the August 9, 2017, conference. The parties shall come prepared to discuss their respective positions. In order to minimize downtime between conferences and ensure that counsel are not waiting an unduly long time before the start of the August 9, 2017, conference, the start time for the conference may be changed slightly. The parties will be notified of any change to the conference time by written order prior to the conference. ( Deposition due by 2/15/2018., Expert Discovery due by 5/31/2018., Fact Discovery due by 3/16/2018., Motions due by 9/15/2018.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 7/26/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al., as per Chambers. (mro)
July 20, 2017 Filing 60 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Holly H. Dolejsi dated July 20, 2017 re: Parties' Joint Proposed Discovery Schedule Incorporating Bellwether Deadlines. Document filed by Chaim Z. Aron.(Dolejsi, Holly)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER NO. 9 ORDER ESTABLISHING COMMON BENEFIT FEE AND EXPENSE FUNDS: This Order provides guidance so that any attorney applying for common benefit fees or expenses will have notice of the standards that will be employed in assessing those applications. Due to the nature of this particular litigation, this Order is entered to provide for the fair and equitable sharing among plaintiffs, and their counsel, of the burden of services performed and expenses incurred by attorneys acting for the common benefit of all plaintiffs in this complex litigation. These guidelines are not meant to be exhaustive, and the Court may issue additional procedures, limitations, and guidelines in the future, if appropriate. Every 60 days beginning on September 1, 2017, Liaison Counsel shall email Chambers a report on the time and expenses incurred for the common benefit. The first such report shall include a copy of the forms approved by the PLC, and shall also include sample time sheets and statements about any problems that the Committee has encountered. (As further set forth herein.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 7/19/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(kgo)
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER NO. 8: It is hereby ORDERED that: The form of Plaintiff Fact Sheet that shall be used in MDL-2776 for all Member Actions is attached as Appendix A. In accordance with the schedule set forth in Section III below, every Plaintiff in each Member Action shall complete the following herein. For all cases assigned to MDL-2776 as of July 18, 2017, each Plaintiff shall complete and serve a PFS not later than September 1, 2017. For all cases assigned to MDL-2776 after July 18, 2017, each Plaintiff shall complete and serve a PFS no later than 45 days after service of the Complaint. If Defendants move to dismiss a case, Plaintiffs shall have 21 days to file a response to the motion to dismiss from the date that the motion is filed. Defendants shall have 7 days from the date of the response to file a reply in support of the motion to dismiss. If, after expiration of the 7 day meet-and-confer period, Defendants have not produced the required information and/or documents, or have not provided a reasonable justification for failure to do so, Plaintiff may then submit to the Court a a pre-motion letter, and Defendants may file a response, in 17-MD-2776 as provided in the Court's Individual Rule II.B.2, III.A.1 and III.C.3. (As further set forth herein.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 7/18/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(kgo)
July 17, 2017 Filing 57 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Stephen D. Raber dated 07/17/2017 re: Defendants' Proposed Search Terms. Document filed by AstraZeneca PHarmaceuticals L.P., Astrazeneca L.P., Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendants' Proposed Search Terms)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(Rome, Jacqueline)
July 17, 2017 Filing 56 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Holly H. Dolejsi dated July 17, 2017 re: Plaintiff's Proposed Search Terms. Document filed by Chaim Z. Aron. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Defendants' Redlines to Plaintiff's Proposed Search Terms)(Dolejsi, Holly)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER NO. 7: Plaintiffs shall file a Consolidated Complaint by August 4, 2017. The parties shall attend a status conference on August 9, 2017, at 11:00 a.m. By August 4, 2017, at 5:00 p.m., the parties shall file a joint status letter and proposed conference agenda not to exceed seven pages. "Science day" shall be held on November 8, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. As provided in Order No. 5, Defendants shall file their motions to dismiss the Texas cases by July 7, 2017. Plaintiffs shall file their responses by August 4, 2017. Defendants shall file their replies by August 15, 2017. (As further set forth herein.) Amended Pleadings due by 8/4/2017. Responses due by 8/4/2017 Replies due by 8/15/2017. Status Conference set for 08/09/2017 at 11:00 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Status Conference set for 11/8/2017 at 10:30 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 7/13/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(kgo) Modified on 7/13/2017 (kgo).
July 7, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lorna G. Schofield: Status Conference held on 7/7/2017. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(jcs)
July 7, 2017 Filing 54 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #53 MOTION to Dismiss Texas cases for failure to state a claim. . Document filed by Astrazeneca AB, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca P.L.C., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rome, Jacqueline)
July 7, 2017 Filing 53 MOTION to Dismiss Texas cases for failure to state a claim. Document filed by Astrazeneca AB, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca P.L.C., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co.. Responses due by 8/4/2017(Rome, Jacqueline)
July 6, 2017 Filing 52 LETTER: addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield, from Stephen D. Raber, dated June 19, 2017, re: Dispositive Motions. (ap) Modified on 7/7/2017 (ap).
July 6, 2017 Filing 51 LETTER: addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield, from Holly H. Dolejsi, dated June 21, 2017. re: Opposition. (ap)
July 6, 2017 Filing 50 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Danielle M. Gold, Esq. dated July 6, 2017 re: Dial in number for July 7, 2017 Status Conference. Document filed by Virginia Mary Assavedo, Mary Kay Bledsoe, Joseph Blois, Racheal Blois, Dalton Burkett, Yvonne Burkett, Steve Collins, Michael Cormier, David Fowler, Kimberly Fowler, Beverly Hudson, Rod Hudson, Melissa Link, Steve Link, Kimara Lyons, Cherie Perez, Rodney Perez, Bobbie Pittman, Arquimedes Ponce, Jason Popwell, Elizabeth Prosser, Michael Smith.(Gold, Danielle)
July 5, 2017 Filing 49 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Stephen D. Raber dated July 5, 2017 re: Agenda for July 7, 2017 Conference. Document filed by Astrazeneca AB, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca P.L.C., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co..(Rome, Jacqueline)
June 27, 2017 Filing 48 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Stephen D. Raber dated June 27, 2017 re: Bellwether Process. Document filed by Astrazeneca AB, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca P.L.C., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co..(Rome, Jacqueline)
June 26, 2017 Filing 47 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Stephen D. Raber dated June 26, 2017 re: Response to Plaintiffs' June 19, 2017 Letter Regarding Longer Discovery. Document filed by Astrazeneca AB, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca P.L.C., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co..(Rome, Jacqueline)
June 22, 2017 Filing 46 STIPULATION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE: WHEREAS, on October 19, 2016, Plaintiff Lea Warner filed a Complaint against Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., AstraZeneca LP, and AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Civil Action No. 1:16-cv-08187-LGS. WHEREAS, the parties agree to the herein Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) with each party bearing its own attorneys' fees, costs and expenses. NOW THEREFORE, the parties respectfully request that all claims in Plaintiffs' Complaint be dismissed with prejudice. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 6/22/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS, 1:16-cv-08187-LGS(mro)
June 21, 2017 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO E-MAIL PDF. Note to Attorney Jacqueline Rome for noncompliance with Section 18.3 of the S.D.N.Y. Electronic Case Filing Rules & Instructions. E-MAIL the PDF for Document #45 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal to: judgments@nysd.uscourts.gov. (km)
June 20, 2017 Filing 45 FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING OF NON-ECF DOCUMENT - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) All Defendants and without costs to either party pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Astrazeneca LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS, 1:16-cv-08187-LGS(Rome, Jacqueline) Modified on 6/21/2017 (km).
June 19, 2017 Filing 44 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Ellen Relkin dated June 19, 2017 re: Plaintiffs' Proposal to Extend the Time Period for Completion of Fact Discovery. Document filed by Virginia Mary Assavedo, Mary Kay Bledsoe, Joseph Blois, Racheal Blois, Dalton Burkett, Yvonne Burkett, Steve Collins, Michael Cormier, David Fowler, Kimberly Fowler, Beverly Hudson, Rod Hudson, Melissa Link, Steve Link, Kimara Lyons, Cherie Perez, Rodney Perez, Bobbie Pittman, Arquimedes Ponce, Jason Popwell, Elizabeth Prosser, Michael Smith.(Relkin, Ellen)
June 19, 2017 Filing 43 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Danielle M. Gold dated June 19, 2017 re: Plaintiffs' Proposed Common Benefit Order Pursuant to Order No. 5. Document filed by Virginia Mary Assavedo, Mary Kay Bledsoe, Joseph Blois, Racheal Blois, Dalton Burkett, Yvonne Burkett, Steve Collins, Michael Cormier, Jennifer Correa, David Fowler, Kimberly Fowler, Beverly Hudson, Rod Hudson, Melissa Link, Steve Link, Kimara Lyons, Cherie Perez, Rodney Perez, Bobbie Pittman, Arquimedes Ponce, Jason Popwell, Elizabeth Prosser, Michael Smith.(Gold, Danielle)
June 19, 2017 Filing 42 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Holly H. Dolejsi dated June 19, 2017 re: The Parties Jointly Proposed Discovery Schedule Pursuant to Order No. 5. Document filed by Chaim Z. Aron.(Dolejsi, Holly)
June 19, 2017 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - SIGNATURE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Jacqueline Rome to RE-FILE Document #40 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal with handwritten signatures of the parties. (km)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER NO. 6: It is hereby ORDERED that per instructions from the Attorney Services division of the Office of the Clerk of Court, Plaintiffs' request is DENIED. Counsel must apply for pro hac vice admission to this Court prior to the direct filing of their cases. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file their May 16, 2017, letter (17-MD-2776, Docket No. 12) in 17-MC-2776 as provided by Order No. 1. The Clerk of Court is directed to file this Order in 17-MC-2776, 17-MD-2776 and in all consolidated cases. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 6/16/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(kgo)
June 16, 2017 Filing 40 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - SIGNATURE ERROR - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) All Defendants and without costs to either party pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Astrazeneca LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS, 1:16-cv-08187-LGS(Rome, Jacqueline) Modified on 6/19/2017 (km).
June 16, 2017 Filing 39 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER IN ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL(CTO-6) this order transfers only plaintiff's claims against Bristol-Myers Squibb Company and four AstraZeneca entities. Transferring this action from the United States District Court - that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, the actions listed on the attached schedule A and pending in the District of Pennsylvania, and the same hereby are, transferred to the Southern District of New York, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Lorna G. Schofield, for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings with the actions pending in that district and listed on Schedule A. (Signed by MDL Panel on 6/16/2017) (sjo)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER NO. 5: Defendants shall file their anticipated motions to dismiss the Texas cases based on the Texas statute, and any Louisiana case based on the statute of limitations, by July 7, 2017. Plaintiffs shall file their responses by August 4, 2017. Defendants shall file their replies by August 15, 2017. The parties shall attend a status conference on July 7, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. As provided in Order No. 1, parties with similar interests may agree as to any conference, unless otherwise ordered, to have an attending attorney represent their interests instead of attending through their own attorney or, if pro se, in person. By July 5, 2017, the parties shall file a joint status letter and proposed conference agenda not to exceed seven pages. Each underlined submission listed in this table shall be filed in both 17-MD-2776 and 17-MC-2776. Actions which are not underlined should not be filed in either case file. (As further set forth herein.) Motions due by 7/7/2017. Responses due by 8/4/2017 Replies due by 8/15/2017. Status Conference set for 7/7/2017 at 10:30 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 6/14/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(kgo)
June 13, 2017 Filing 37 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Richmond T. Moore dated June 13, 2017 re: Proposed Scheduling Order. Document filed by Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., Astrazeneca LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., AstraZeneca PHarmaceuticals L.P., Astrazeneca AB, Astrazeneca L.P., Astrazeneca P.L.C., Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Janssen Ortho L.L.C., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Johnson & Johnson, Bristol-Meyers Squibb Co, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., Astrazeneca AB, Astrazeneca P.L.C., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., AstraZeneca PHarmaceuticals L.P., Astrazeneca L.P., Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., AstraZeneca PHarmaceuticals L.P., Astrazeneca AB, Astrazeneca L.P., Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(Rome, Jacqueline)
June 13, 2017 Filing 36 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER IN ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL (CTO-5) transferring this action from the United States District Court - that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, the actions listed on the attached schedule A and pending in the District of Illinois, and the same hereby are, transferred to the Southern District of New York, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Lorna G. Schofield, for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings with the actions pending in that district and listed on Schedule A. (Signed by MDL Panel on 6/13/2017) (sjo)
June 6, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lorna G. Schofield: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 6/6/2017. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(jcs)
June 6, 2017 Filing 35 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Ellen Relkin dated June 6, 2017 re: Letter per Order No. 4 regarding application for Plaintiffs' Co-Lead Position. Document filed by Virginia Mary Assavedo, Mary Kay Bledsoe, Joseph Blois, Racheal Blois, Dalton Burkett, Yvonne Burkett, Steve Collins, Michael Cormier, Dennis Doty, Lorraine Doty, David Fowler, Kimberly Fowler, Beverly Hudson, Rod Hudson, Melissa Link, Steve Link, Kimara Lyons, Cherie Perez, Rodney Perez, Bobbie Pittman, Arquimedes Ponce, Jason Popwell, Elizabeth Prosser, Michael Smith.(Relkin, Ellen)
June 6, 2017 Filing 34 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Jessica A. Perez Reynolds dated 06/06/2017 re: Application for Plaintiffs' Steering Committee. Document filed by Becky Moore.(Perez-Reynolds, Jessica)
June 6, 2017 Filing 33 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Danielle M. Gold dated June 6, 2017 re: Letter Per Order No. 4 Regarding Application for Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel Position. Document filed by Virginia Mary Assavedo, Mary Kay Bledsoe, Joseph Blois, Racheal Blois, Dalton Burkett, Yvonne Burkett, Steve Collins, Michael Cormier, David Fowler, Kimberly Fowler, Beverly Hudson, Rod Hudson, Melissa Link, Steve Link, Kimara Lyons, Cherie Perez, Rodney Perez, Bobbie Pittman, Arquimedes Ponce, Jason Popwell, Elizabeth Prosser.(Gold, Danielle)
June 6, 2017 Filing 32 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Roger W. Orlando dated June 5, 2017 re: Application for Appointment to Plaintiffs' Steering Committee. Document filed by Christina Adams-Kinnison, Chaim Z. Aron, Virginia Mary Assavedo, Donna Betters, Mary Kay Bledsoe, Joseph Blois, Racheal Blois, Dalton Burkett, Yvonne Burkett, Steve Collins, Michael Cormier, Jennifer Correa, Dennis Doty, Lorraine Doty, Jamie Michelle Foran, David Fowler, Kimberly Fowler, Beverly Hudson, Rod Hudson, Melissa Link, Steve Link, Kimara Lyons, Denzil Martin, Becky Moore, Cherie Perez, Rodney Perez, Bobbie Pittman, Arquimedes Ponce, Jason Popwell, Elizabeth Prosser, Bruce Shayne, Michael Smith, Lea Warner, Kamilah Young.(Ctorides, Christina)
June 6, 2017 Filing 31 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Holly H. Dolejsi dated June 6, 2017 re: MDL 2776; Letter Per Order No. 4 Regarding Application for Plaintiffs' Lead Counsel Position. Document filed by Chaim Z. Aron.(Dolejsi, Holly)
June 5, 2017 Filing 30 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Laura L. Pittner dated June 5, 2017 re: MDL 2776; Letter Per Order No. 4 Regarding Application for Plaintiffs' Steering Committee Position. Document filed by Bobbie Pittman.(Pittner, Laura)
June 5, 2017 Filing 29 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Brian E. Tadtman dated June 5, 2017 re: MDL 2776 - Letter Per Order No. 4 Regarding Application for Plaintiff's Steering Committee. Document filed by Jennifer Correa.(Tadtman, Brian)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER NO. 4: Plaintiffs' leadership structure shall consist of Lead Counsel, Liaison Counsel and a Steering Committee comprising up to six members, including Lead and Liaison Counsel. Descriptions of the duties of Lead Counsel, Liaison Counsel and the Steering Committee are as follows: Lead Counsel Lead Counsel shall have the duties outlined in the Manual for Complex Litigation (Fourth) Section 10.221, which include formulating (in consultation with other counsel) and presenting opinions on substantive and procedural issues during the litigation. Any attorney who has filed an action in this litigation may apply for a Lead Counsel, Liaison Counsel or Steering Committee position. All applicants for any position shall file a letter not to exceed three pages by noon on June 5, 2017 detailing their qualifications and commitment to serve. Applicants wishing to address the Court briefly (five minutes or less) on their candidacy at the June 6, 2017 initial conference shall so indicate in their application. All applications shall be filed only in 17-MD-2776, and not in 17-MC-2776, and need not be "spread" to member cases. Objections to the appointment of a proposed applicant, if there are any, must be made in writing by June 8, 2017. Any objection must be short, yet thorough, and must be supported by necessary documentation. Any objection shall be filed only in 17-MD-2776, and not in 17-MC- 2776, and need not be "spread" to member cases. All appointments will be made as promptly as practicable following the June 6, 2017, initial conference, and as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 6/2/2017) (ap)
June 1, 2017 Filing 27 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Danielle M. Gold dated June 1, 2017 re: Application for Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel. Document filed by Joseph Blois, Racheal Blois, Virginia Mary Assavedo, Mary Kay Bledsoe, Dalton Burkett, Yvonne Burkett, Steve Collins, Michael Cormier, Dennis Doty, Lorraine Doty, David Fowler, Kimberly Fowler, Beverly Hudson, Rod Hudson, Melissa Link, Steve Link, Kimara Lyons, Cherie Perez, Rodney Perez, Arquimedes Ponce, Jason Popwell, Elizabeth Prosser, Michael Smith.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(Gold, Danielle)
June 1, 2017 Filing 26 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Ellen Relkin dated June 1, 2017 re: Application for Plaintiffs' Co-Lead Counsel. Document filed by Joseph Blois, Racheal Blois, Virginia Mary Assavedo, Mary Kay Bledsoe, Dalton Burkett, Yvonne Burkett, Steve Collins, Michael Cormier, Dennis Doty, Lorraine Doty, David Fowler, Kimberly Fowler, Rod Hudson, Melissa Link, Steve Link, Kimara Lyons, Cherie Perez, Rodney Perez, Arquimedes Ponce, Jason Popwell, Elizabeth Prosser.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(Relkin, Ellen)
June 1, 2017 Filing 25 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Holly H. Dolejsi dated June 1, 2017 re: Plaintiffs' proposed Steering Committee Members. Document filed by Chaim Z. Aron.(Dolejsi, Holly)
June 1, 2017 Filing 24 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Stephen D. Raber dated 06/01/2017 re: Initial Conference Agenda. Document filed by Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., Astrazeneca LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., AstraZeneca PHarmaceuticals L.P., Astrazeneca AB, Astrazeneca L.P., Astrazeneca P.L.C., Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Bristol-Meyers Squibb Co, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., Astrazeneca AB, Astrazeneca P.L.C., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., AstraZeneca PHarmaceuticals L.P., Astrazeneca L.P., Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., AstraZeneca PHarmaceuticals L.P., Astrazeneca AB, Astrazeneca L.P., Bristol-Myers Squibb Company.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(Rome, Jacqueline)
June 1, 2017 Filing 23 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Holly H. Dolejsi dated June 1, 2017 re: application for Plaintiffs' Co-Lead Counsel. Document filed by Chaim Z. Aron.(Dolejsi, Holly)
June 1, 2017 Filing 22 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER IN ORDER AND SIMULTANEOUS SEPARATION AND REMAND OF CERTAIN CLAIMS FROM THE MDL PANEL... It appears that the action on this conditional transfer order encompass claims relating to (1) questions of facts that are common to the actions previously transferred to MDL 2776; and (2)claims against three Janssen defendants and Johnson & Johnson which do not involve questions of fact common with the actions in MDL 2776. The claims against the three Janssen defendants and Johnson & Johnson should be separated and remanded to S.D. Mississippi and then those claims should be transferred to MDL NO. 2750 (Invokana). The action from the United States District Court - that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, the actions listed and pending in the Southern District of Mississippi, and the same hereby are, transferred to the Southern District of New York, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Lorna G. Schofield, for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings with the actions pending in that district and listed on Schedule A. (Signed by MDL Panel on 6/1/2017) (sjo)
June 1, 2017 Filing 21 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER IN ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL (CTO-3)transferring this action from the United States District Court - that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, the actions listed on the attached schedule A and pending in the District of Louisiana, and the same hereby are, transferred to the Southern District of New York, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Lorna G. Schofield, for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings with the actions pending in that district and listed on Schedule A. (Signed by MDL Panel on 6/1/2017) (sjo)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER in case 1:16-cv-08187-LGS; granting (19) Letter Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:17-md-02776-LGS. APPLICATION GRANTED. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 5/26/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al. (kgo)
May 25, 2017 Filing 19 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Stephen D. Raber dated 05/25/2017. Document filed by Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., Astrazeneca LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., AstraZeneca PHarmaceuticals L.P., Astrazeneca AB, Astrazeneca L.P., Astrazeneca P.L.C., Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Bristol-Meyers Squibb Co, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., Astrazeneca AB, Astrazeneca P.L.C., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., AstraZeneca PHarmaceuticals L.P., Astrazeneca L.P., Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., AstraZeneca PHarmaceuticals L.P., Astrazeneca AB, Astrazeneca L.P., Bristol-Myers Squibb Company.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(Rome, Jacqueline)
May 23, 2017 Filing 18 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Stephen D. Raber dated 05/23/2017 re: Defendants' Status Letter. Document filed by Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., Astrazeneca LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., AstraZeneca PHarmaceuticals L.P., Astrazeneca AB, Astrazeneca L.P., Astrazeneca P.L.C., Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Bristol-Meyers Squibb Co, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., Astrazeneca AB, Astrazeneca P.L.C., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., AstraZeneca PHarmaceuticals L.P., Astrazeneca L.P., Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., AstraZeneca PHarmaceuticals L.P., Astrazeneca AB, Astrazeneca L.P., Bristol-Myers Squibb Company.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(Rome, Jacqueline)
May 23, 2017 Filing 17 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Holly H. Dolejsi dated 05/23/2017 re: Plaintiffs' Status Letter. Document filed by Christina Adams-Kinnison, Chaim Z. Aron, Virginia Mary Assavedo, Donna Betters, Mary Kay Bledsoe, Joseph Blois, Racheal Blois, Dalton Burkett, Yvonne Burkett, Steve Collins, Michael Cormier, Dennis Doty, Lorraine Doty, Jamie Michelle Foran, David Fowler, Kimberly Fowler, Beverly Hudson, Rod Hudson, Melissa Link, Steve Link, Kimara Lyons, Denzil Martin, Becky Moore, Cherie Perez, Rodney Perez, Arquimedes Ponce, Jason Popwell, Elizabeth Prosser, Bruce Shayne, Michael Smith, Lea Warner, Kamilah Young.(Dolejsi, Holly)
May 18, 2017 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 6/6/2017 at 04:00 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(kgo)
May 18, 2017 Filing 16 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on granting #13 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate Mr. Chasen as counsel for Defendants. Attorney Allan R. Chason terminated. Attorney Allan R. Chason terminated. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 5/18/2017) (ap) Modified on 5/18/2017 (ap).
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER NO. 3: It is hereby ORDERED that the proceeding in this matter, previously scheduled for June 6, 2017 at 11:00 a.m., shall be adjourned to June 6, 2017 at 4:00 p.m., due to a scheduling conflict. Any parties not located within the metropolitan area who wish to participate telephonically may do so by advising the Court, convening all parties on the line and calling Chambers at (212) 805-0288.As provided in Order No. 1, any pro se party (i.e., any party who is not represented by counsel) and any counsel who intends to seek a leadership position must appear at the initial conference in person.The Clerk of Court is directed to file this Order in 17-MC-2776, 17-MD-2776 and in all consolidated cases. Initial Conference set for 6/6/2017 at 04:00 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 5/18/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(kgo)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER NO. 2: It is hereby ORDERED that any plaintiff whose case would be subject to transfer to MDL-2776 may file his or her case directly in MDL-2776 in the Southern District of New York. It is further ORDERED that each case filed directly in MDL-2776 that emanates from a district outside the Southern District of New York will be filed in MDL-2776 for pretrial proceedings only, consistent with the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's April 6, 2017, Transfer Order. ORDERED that upon completion of all pretrial proceedings applicable to a case filed directly in MDL-2776 pursuant to this Order, this Court, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), will transfer that case to a federal district court of proper venue, as defined in 28 U.S.C. 1391, after considering the recommendations of the parties to that case. ORDERED that filing a case directly in MDL-2776 pursuant to this Order shall not affect any future choice of law determinations. The Clerk of Court is directed to file this Order in 17-MC-2776, 17-MD-2776 and in all consolidated cases. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 5/18/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(kgo)
May 17, 2017 Filing 13 MOTION for Allan R. Chason to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Astrazeneca AB, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca P.L.C., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., AstraZeneca PHarmaceuticals L.P., Astrazeneca AB, Astrazeneca L.P., Bristol-Myers Squibb Company.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS, 1:17-cv-02661-LGS(Rome, Jacqueline)
May 16, 2017 Filing 12 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from ELLEN RELKIN dated May 16, 2017 re: Plaintiffs' Counsel's Compliance with Order No. 1 re: lead and liaison counsel. Document filed by David Fowler, Kimberly Fowler, Arquimedes Ponce, Chaim Z. Aron, Michael Smith, Melissa Link, Steve Link, Kamilah Young, Bruce Shayne, Dennis Doty, Lorraine Doty, Cherie Perez, Rodney Perez, Michael Cormier, Steve Collins, Lea Warner, Mary Kay Bledsoe, Joseph Blois, Racheal Blois, Virginia Mary Assavedo, Dalton Burkett, Yvonne Burkett, Jamie Michelle Foran, Beverly Hudson, Rod Hudson, Kimara Lyons, Denzil Martin, Becky Moore, Jason Popwell, Elizabeth Prosser.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(Relkin, Ellen)
May 16, 2017 Filing 11 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Stephen D. Raber dated May 16, 2017 re: Direct Filing of Cases. Document filed by Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., AstraZeneca PHarmaceuticals L.P., Astrazeneca AB, Astrazeneca L.P., Astrazeneca P.L.C., Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Bristol-Meyers Squibb Co, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., Astrazeneca AB, Astrazeneca P.L.C., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., AstraZeneca PHarmaceuticals L.P., Astrazeneca L.P., Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., AstraZeneca PHarmaceuticals L.P., Astrazeneca AB, Astrazeneca L.P., Bristol-Myers Squibb Company.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(Rome, Jacqueline)
May 16, 2017 Filing 10 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE #11 Letter in 17md2776) - MOTION re: (9 in 1:17-md-02776-LGS) Order Letter Regarding Direct Filing of Cases. Document filed by Astrazeneca AB, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca P.L.C., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(Rome, Jacqueline) Modified on 5/22/2017 (db).
May 4, 2017 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 6/6/2017 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 1106, Thurgood Marshal Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (kgo)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER NO. 1: Defense counsel shall confer and advise the Court, no later than May 16, 2017, by joint letter, not to exceed three pages, whether they will stipulate that they will not object, based on improper venue, to the filing directly in the Southern District of New York of related cases. The Clerk of Court is directed to open a master case file to serve as a repository limited to filings of significance in this MDL. Any fees associated with opening the master case file docket are waived. The file shall bear docket number 17-MC-2776 and caption "In re: Farxiga (Dapagliflozin) Products Liability Litigation." For administrative purposes only, in 17-MC-2776, the Clerk of Court shall list Plaintiffs as "Farxiga MDL Plaintiffs," and Defendants as "Farxiga MDL Defendants." The Court will conduct an Initial Conference on June 6, 2017, at 11 a.m., in Courtroom 1106 at the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, New York.The Clerk of Court is directed to copy Docket No. 1 (Transfer Order) from 17-MD-2776 and file it in 17-MC-2776; and to file this Order (Order No. 1) in 17-MC-2776, 17-MD-2776 and in all consolidated cases. (As further set forth herein.) Initial Conference set for 6/6/2017 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 1106, Thurgood Marshal Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 5/4/2017) (kgo)
May 4, 2017 Filing 8 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER IN ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL (CTO-2) transferring this action from the United States District Court - that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, the actions listed on the attached schedule A and pending in the District of Missouri, and the same hereby are, transferred to the Southern District of New York, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Lorna G. Schofield, for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings with the actions pending in that district and listed on Schedule A. (Signed by MDL Panel on 5/2/2017) (sjo)
May 3, 2017 Filing 7 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Stephen D. Raber dated May 3, 2017. Document filed by Astrazeneca AB, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca P.L.C., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(Rome, Jacqueline)
April 27, 2017 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint in Moore v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., et al.. Document filed by Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co.. Responses due by 5/11/2017(Rome, Jacqueline) Modified on 6/5/2017 (ldi).
April 26, 2017 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Danielle Megan Gold on behalf of Joseph Blois, Racheal Blois, Virginia Mary Assavedo, Mary Kay Bledsoe, Dalton Burkett, Yvonne Burkett, Steve Collins, Michael Cormier, David Fowler, Kimberly Fowler, Beverly Hudson, Rod Hudson, Melissa Link, Steve Link, Kimara Lyons, Cherie Perez, Rodney Perez, Arquimedes Ponce, Jason Popwell, Elizabeth Prosser. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(Gold, Danielle)
April 20, 2017 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Henry Alexander Watkins on behalf of Dennis Doty, Lorraine Doty. (Watkins, Henry)
April 20, 2017 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Frank Michael Petosa on behalf of Dennis Doty, Lorraine Doty. (Petosa, Frank)
April 19, 2017 Filing 2 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER IN ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL (CTO-1)transferring this action from the United States District Court - that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, the actions listed on the attached schedule A and pending in the District of West Virginia, and the same hereby are, transferred to the Southern District of New York, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Lorna G. Schofield, for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings with the actions pending in that district and listed on Schedule A. (Signed by MDL Panel on 4/19/2017) (sjo)
April 12, 2017 CASES ORIGINATING FROM THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK: 1:16-cv-08187 (LGS), 1:16-cv-08888 (LGS), 1:16-cv-08915 (LGS), 1:16-cv-08951 (LGS), 1:16-cv-08959 (LGS), 1:16-cv-08960 (LGS), 1:16-cv-08961 (LGS), 1:16-cv-08962 (LGS), 1:16-cv-08985 (LGS), 1:16-cv-09330 (LGS), 1:16-cv-09722 (LGS), 1:16-cv-10003 (LGS) and 1:16-cv-10046 (LGS). (sjo)
April 12, 2017 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
April 12, 2017 Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis is so designated. (sjo)
April 12, 2017 Filing 1 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER IN ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL... transferring this action from the United States District Court - that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, the actions listed on the attached schedule A and pending in the District of Alabama, Illinois, Louisiana, Mississippi and New York, and the same hereby are, transferred to the Southern District of New York, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Lorna G. Schofield, for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings with the actions pending in that district and listed on Schedule A. (Signed by MDL Panel on 4/6/2017) (sjo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Farxiga (Dapagliflozin) Products Liability Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farxiga (Dapagliflozin) Products Liability Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Astrazeneca AB
Represented By: Richmond T. Moore
Represented By: Stephen D. Raber
Represented By: Jacqueline Liat Rome
Represented By: Kate Mauldin Embry
Represented By: Stewart Hill Ackerly
Represented By: J. Cal Mayo, Jr.
Represented By: Lyndsey M Haas
Represented By: Allan R. Chason
Represented By: Ana Cecilia Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bristol-Myers Squibb Co.
Represented By: Richmond T. Moore
Represented By: Stephen D. Raber
Represented By: Jacqueline Liat Rome
Represented By: Kate Mauldin Embry
Represented By: Dane Hal Butswinkas
Represented By: Stewart Hill Ackerly
Represented By: Bart C. Sullivan
Represented By: J. Cal Mayo, Jr.
Represented By: Lyndsey M Haas
Represented By: Allan R. Chason
Represented By: Ana Cecilia Reyes
Represented By: E. Paige Sensenbrenner
Represented By: Diana Cole Surprenant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP
Represented By: Richmond T. Moore
Represented By: Stephen D. Raber
Represented By: Jacqueline Liat Rome
Represented By: Kate Mauldin Embry
Represented By: Dane Hal Butswinkas
Represented By: Stewart Hill Ackerly
Represented By: Bart C. Sullivan
Represented By: J. Cal Mayo, Jr.
Represented By: Lyndsey M Haas
Represented By: Allan R. Chason
Represented By: Ana Cecilia Reyes
Represented By: E. Paige Sensenbrenner
Represented By: Diana Cole Surprenant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Astrazeneca LP
Represented By: Richmond T. Moore
Represented By: Stephen D. Raber
Represented By: Jacqueline Liat Rome
Represented By: Kate Mauldin Embry
Represented By: Dane Hal Butswinkas
Represented By: Stewart Hill Ackerly
Represented By: Bart C. Sullivan
Represented By: J. Cal Mayo, Jr.
Represented By: Lyndsey M Haas
Represented By: Allan R. Chason
Represented By: Ana Cecilia Reyes
Represented By: E. Paige Sensenbrenner
Represented By: Diana Cole Surprenant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Astrazeneca P.L.C.
Represented By: Richmond T. Moore
Represented By: Stephen D. Raber
Represented By: Jacqueline Liat Rome
Represented By: Kate Mauldin Embry
Represented By: Stewart Hill Ackerly
Represented By: J. Cal Mayo, Jr.
Represented By: Lyndsey M Haas
Represented By: Allan R. Chason
Represented By: Ana Cecilia Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denzil Martin
Represented By: Jason C. Webster
Represented By: Sean Patrick McGinley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Racheal Blois
Represented By: Ellen Relkin
Represented By: Danielle Megan Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: June Thompson
Represented By: Jessica Ann Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph W. Parmeter
Represented By: Jessica Ann Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sayed Asif
Represented By: Levi M. Plesset
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Correa
Represented By: Nicholas S Clevenger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cherie Perez
Represented By: Ellen Relkin
Represented By: Danielle Megan Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Barker
Represented By: Melinda Davis Nokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Fowler
Represented By: Ellen Relkin
Represented By: Danielle Megan Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Furman
Represented By: Jessica Ann Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Armando Acosta
Represented By: Levi M. Plesset
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arquimedes Ponce
Represented By: Ellen Relkin
Represented By: Danielle Megan Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Wayne Phillips
Represented By: Levi M. Plesset
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Montgomery
Represented By: Steven Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvonne Burkett
Represented By: Ellen Relkin
Represented By: Danielle Megan Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Miller
Represented By: Jessica Ann Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Byron Liskow
Represented By: Steven Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Popwell
Represented By: Ellen Relkin
Represented By: Danielle Megan Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Undrea Rias-Williams
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyeward Teasley
Represented By: Holly Dolejsi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Turner
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Perdue
Represented By: Holly Dolejsi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Fowler
Represented By: Ellen Relkin
Represented By: Danielle Megan Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Moore
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorraine Doty
Represented By: Marisa Kendra Glassman
Represented By: Frank Michael Petosa
Represented By: Henry Alexander Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Betters
Represented By: Christina Ctorides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joy Beasley
Represented By: Mallory Jordan Mangold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Doty
Represented By: Marisa Kendra Glassman
Represented By: Frank Michael Petosa
Represented By: Henry Alexander Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Becky Moore
Represented By: Jessica Ann Perez
Represented By: Christopher L. Coffin
Represented By: Nicholas Ryan Rockforte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darla McKinney
Represented By: Jessica Ann Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Link
Represented By: Ellen Relkin
Represented By: Danielle Megan Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Link
Represented By: Ellen Relkin
Represented By: Danielle Megan Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Gray
Represented By: Jessica Ann Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia A Smith
Represented By: Daniel J Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nate Blonde
Represented By: Roger William Orlando
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Grogan
Represented By: William Frederick Eckhart
Represented By: Robert T. Dassow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Collins
Represented By: Ellen Relkin
Represented By: Rolf T. Fiebiger
Represented By: Danielle Megan Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobbie Pittman
Represented By: Danielle Megan Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Bailey
Represented By: Richard Marian Zgoda, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helelaine Evans-Osborn
Represented By: Danielle Megan Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dalton Burkett
Represented By: Ellen Relkin
Represented By: Danielle Megan Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Shayne
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chaim Z. Aron
Represented By: Holly Dolejsi
Represented By: Oren Dov Langer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Waite
Represented By: Danielle Megan Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Hellebrand
Represented By: Ellen Relkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lea Warner
Represented By: Randi Alyson Kassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melva Grayson
Represented By: Richard Marian Zgoda, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lennora Kozinko
Represented By: Jessica Ann Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra B. Polk
Represented By: Jessica Ann Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Smith
Represented By: Ellen Relkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garret Scott
Represented By: Levi M. Plesset
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Davis
Represented By: Frank Michael Petosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Marino
Represented By: Andrea B. Bierstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louella Davis
Represented By: Frank Michael Petosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Roman
Represented By: Rolf T. Fiebiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rod Hudson
Represented By: Ellen Relkin
Represented By: Danielle Megan Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Michelle Foran
Represented By: Richard A. Wright
Represented By: Kristian Rasmussen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judd Moore
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lapascha Teasley
Represented By: Holly Dolejsi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Mary Assavedo
Represented By: Ellen Relkin
Represented By: Danielle Megan Gold
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kamilah Young
Represented By: Danielle Megan Gold
Represented By: Timothy Michael O'Brien
Represented By: Mallory Jordan Mangold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeannette Clowes
Represented By: Matthew E. Munson
Represented By: Andrea B. Bierstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Wells
Represented By: Danielle Megan Gold
Represented By: Laura Pittner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sally Seay
Represented By: Danielle Megan Gold
Represented By: Scott David Levensten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlene Robertson
Represented By: Levi M. Plesset
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Liskow
Represented By: Steven Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joey Lee Lessel
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Adams-Kinnison
Represented By: Mark R. Niemeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Cormier
Represented By: Ellen Relkin
Represented By: Danielle Megan Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan L Clements
Represented By: Matthew E. Munson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Peace Mize
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Barker
Represented By: Melinda Davis Nokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Everette Wright
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Perez
Represented By: Ellen Relkin
Represented By: Danielle Megan Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimara Lyons
Represented By: Ellen Relkin
Represented By: Danielle Megan Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Moore
Represented By: Jessica Ann Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Grogan
Represented By: William Frederick Eckhart
Represented By: Robert T. Dassow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Blois
Represented By: Ellen Relkin
Represented By: Danielle Megan Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Kay Bledsoe
Represented By: Ellen Relkin
Represented By: Danielle Megan Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Lafanette
Represented By: Randi Alyson Kassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Prosser
Represented By: Ellen Relkin
Represented By: Danielle Megan Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Hazen Frank
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Hudson
Represented By: Ellen Relkin
Represented By: Danielle Megan Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Boulais
Represented By: Daniel C. Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?