Eastern Profit Corporation Limited v. Strategic Vision US LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv02185
Filed: November 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332bc Diversity-Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 296 ORDER: The Court finds that there is good cause for adjourning the trial and adjourns it to January 11, 2021. Although Fed. R. Civ. P. 43(a) permits remote testimony, the language of that rule makes it clear that it is less preferred tha n in-person testimony. In the two prior cases that the Court heard remotely, the parties consented to the remote trial. Defense counsel here does not consent and for reasons that, on their face, appear to be reasonable, at least at the cu rrent time. The Court has the power to keep the current trial date, requiring counsel either to quarantine for 14 days or for Strategic to obtain new counsel. But, the circumstances do not appear to warrant it, and the short delay Strategic proposes will not prejudice Eastern in a case where the only relief sought is monetary. The Court will schedule trial for January 11, 2021. Trial will be held in open court, in Courtroom 15C, assuming that the courthouse remains open. If Strategic's counsel is unable to travel to New York, Strategic will have to obtain new counsel to try this case. Counsel should make sure to secure the presence of their witnesses as soon as possible. The Court will entertain Fed. R. Civ. P. 43(a) applications for remote testimony on a case-by-case basis should circumstances require. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 10/13/2020) (va)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 291 ORDER. For the reasons stated on the record at the October 5, 2020 conference, the motions for summary judgment at Dkt. Nos. 260, 265, 271 are DENIED. As discussed at the conference, Plaintiff is directed to file a letter on ECF by October 7, 2020 at 5:00 p.m. in support of its oral motion that the Court bifurcate the issues for trial pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(b) and addressing the Court's authority and whether it should exercise it to proceed to trial as currently scheduled on Novembe r 9, 2020, includingover the objection of the Defendantby proceeding remotely. Defendant shall submit its response by October 9, 2020 at 5:00 p.m. A bench trial is scheduled to begin in this action on November 9, 2020. The parties shall submit the jo int pretrial order by October 16, 2020. That order shall reflect that both Plaintiff and Defendant waived the right to a jury trial at the October 5, 2020 conference. SO ORDERED. Denying 260 Motion for Summary Judgment; Denying 265 Motion for Summary Judgment; Denying 271 Motion for Summary Judgment. The following hearing(s) was terminated: Jury Trial. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 10/6/2020) (rjm)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 287 ORDER: The Court has secured a civil jury for this case for the week of November 2, 2020. Accordingly, the parties are directed to appear in Courtroom 15C at 9:30 a.m. on November 2, 2020 prepared to begin trial. SO ORDERED., Jury Trial set for 11/2/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 15C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 9/4/2020) (rj)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER, It is hereby ORDERED as follows: 1. This Court finds that the scope of the questioning of Bannon sought by Defendant is overbroad and that the topics sought to be explored by Defendant with this witness are largely irrelevant to the claims or defenses asserted in this case. Therefore, so as to avoid undue burden to the witness, modification of the subpoena under Rule 45(d)(3)(A)(iv) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure is warranted. As discussed preliminarily with counsel, and as furth er informed by the parties' written communications to this Court thereafter, the subpoena shall be modified to allow written questions (the answers to which shall be sworn or answered under penalty of perjury by Bannon in lieu of his providing s worn in-person testimony), limited to the following, in words or substance: as further set forth herein. If Bannon answers any of these questions in the affirmative, then this Court will allow a brief deposition so that a full narrative response may be provided on the record. Any such deposition shall be scheduled at the witness's convenience, but not later than January 31, 2020. The written questions contemplated by this Order shall be served on counsel for Bannon no later than January 14 , 2020, and, absent an extension by this Court for good cause shown, written responses (sworn or expressly made under penalty of perjury) shall be provided no later January 17, 2020. SO ORDERED. (Deposition due by 1/31/2020.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman on 1/13/2020) Copies to All counsel (via ECF). (kv)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER: A pre-motion conference is scheduled for Tuesday, December 3, 2019, at 3:00pm. SO ORDERED. (Pre-Motion Conference set for 12/3/2019 at 03:00 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl.) (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 11/21/2019) (jca)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eastern Profit Corporation Limited v. Strategic Vision US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?