Kennedy v. Basil et al
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Kennedy
Defendant: Robert Basil, The Basil Law Group P.C., Artifect LLC, WFT Realty LLC and WFT Fashion LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv02501
Filed: March 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew L. Carter
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's letter requesting an extension of time to file opposition papers to Defendants' motions for summary judgment. The Parties are hereby GRANTED leave to file summary judgment papers in accordance with the following revised briefing schedule: Opposition Briefs: August 7, 2020; Reply Briefs: August 21, 2020. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 7/22/2020) ( Responses due by 8/7/2020, Replies due by 8/21/2020.) (ks)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the Joint Status Report filed on April 21, 2020. ECF No. 199. Plaintiff and Defendants are hereby GRANTED leave to file summary judgment motions that address all claims, counterclaims, and defenses. These motions should include any arguments regarding the ownership of the disputed Trademarks and jurisdictional arguments regarding whether the Court should retain jurisdiction if Plaintiffs Trademark claims are dismissed. Third-Party Defendant is also GRANTED leave to file a motion to dismiss Defendants' third-party complaint. The Parties should proceed in accordance with the following briefing schedule for their cross-motions for summary judgment and motion to dismiss: Moving Briefs July 3, 2020, Opposition Briefs July 24, 2020, Reply Briefs August 7, 2020. SO ORDERED. (Motions due by 7/3/2020., Responses due by 7/24/2020, Replies due by 8/7/2020.) (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 6/9/2020) (jca)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 198 OPINION & ORDER re: 169 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Third-Party Complaint. filed by Caputo James, 150 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Affirmative Claims. filed by Elizabeth Kennedy, 155 MOTION for Su mmary Judgment Dismissing Defendants' Counterclaims. filed by Elizabeth Kennedy, 137 MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissal. filed by WFT Realty LLC, Robert Basil, Artifect LLC, The Basil Law Group P.C. For the reason s set forth above, the Court DENIES without prejudice Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment on her affirmative claims; Defendants' motion for summary judgment on Plaintiff's affirmative claims; Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment on Defendants' counterclaims; and Caputo's motion to dismiss Defendants' third party complaint. Plaintiff's affirmative claims, Defendants' counterclaims, and Defendants' third party claims are hereby STAYED u ntil the resolution of WFT Fashion LLC's bankruptcy proceeding. The Parties are hereby ORDERED to submit a Joint Status Report indicating how they would like to proceed in this matter within fourteen days of the resolution of the bankruptcy proceedings. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 3/30/2020) (rj)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER: The Parties are hereby ORDERED to submit a Joint Status Report updating the Court on the status of the WFT Fashion, LLC bankruptcy proceedings on or before March 3, 2020. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 2/27/2020) (cf)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 193 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 147 Motion. For the foregoing reasons, the Court declines to issue a certification of facts to the assigned district judge when none is warranted. Thia memorandum and order resolved the plaintiff's motion for contempt, Docket Entry No. 147. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox on 11/13/2019) (rro)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiffs letter requesting an extension of time to file her reply papers to her summary judgment motions. Plaintiff is hereby GRANTED leave to file her reply papers in accordance with the following revised briefing schedule: Plaintiff's Replies to Defendants' Oppositions: November 25, 2019. SO ORDERED. (Replies due by 11/25/2019.) (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 11/12/2019) (mml)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 120 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 85 Motion for Leave to File Document; denying 89 Motion to Strike. For the foregoing reasons; (i) the movants' motion for leave to serve and file the third-party complaint, Docket Entry No. 85, is granted; and (ii) the plaintiffs motion to strike the third-party complaint, Docket Entry No. 89, is denied. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox on 6/3/2019) (anc)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 101 OPINION & ORDER re: 33 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by WFT Realty LLC, Robert Basil, Artifect LLC, The Basil Law Group P.C., WFT Fashion LLC. Although Plaintiff's claim presents a mixed ques tion of contract and trademark, Plaintiff has satisfied her burden by alleging claims and seeking remedies arising under the Lanham Act in a manner sufficient to confer subject matter jurisdiction over this case under 28 U.S.C. § 1338. For the foregoing reasons, Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is hereby DENIED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 3/1/2019) (mro)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 45 Motion to Quash; striking 61 Motion to Amend/Correct. For the foregoing reasons, the motion to quash the subpoena, Docket Entry No. 45, is denied. The Clerk of Court is directed to strike entirely from the docket sheet the amended notice of motion to quash subpoena or for a protective order, Docket Entry No. 61. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox on 9/20/2018) (anc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kennedy v. Basil et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Kennedy
Represented By: Michael Feldberg
Represented By: Andrew R. Goldenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Basil
Represented By: Neil D. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Basil Law Group P.C.
Represented By: Neil D. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Artifect LLC
Represented By: Neil D. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WFT Realty LLC
Represented By: Neil D. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WFT Fashion LLC
Represented By: Neil D. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?