Denson v. Trump Featured Case

Jessica Denson, a woman who worked on President Trump's 2016 campaign, has filed a lawsuit in federal court asking the court to void a non-disclosure agreement she allegedly signed.

Plaintiff: Jessica M. Denson
Defendant: Donald J. Trump
Case Number: 1:2018cv02690
Filed: March 26, 2018
Court: New York Southern District Court
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Jesse M. Furman
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 4, 2018 28 Featured Case ORDER denying 27 Motion for Reconsideration. On September 28, 2018, Plaintiff filed a "Motion to Vacate Judgment," seeking reconsideration of that Order under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 60b). (Docket No. 27). Plaintiff presents no valid grounds for reconsideration indeed, most, if not all, of the arguments she makes are concededly arguments that she failed to make in opposition to the original motion. See, e.g., Analytical Surveys, Inc. v. Tonga Partners, L.P., 684 F.3d 36, 52 (2d Cir. 2012) ("It is well-settled that [a motion for reconsideration] is not a vehicle for relitigating old issues, presenting the case under new theories, securing a rehearing on the merits, or otherwise taking a second bite at the apple. Rather, the standard for granting a...motion for reconsideration is strict, and reconsideration will generally be denied unless the moving party can point to controlling decisions or data that the court overlooked." (internal quotation marks, citations, ellipsis, and alterations omitted)). Accordingly, the motion is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Docket No. 27. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 10/4/2018) (ne)
September 28, 2018 27 MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT; re: for Reconsideration re; 24 Clerk's Judgment. Document filed by Jessica M. Denson.(sc)
September 27, 2018 Mailed a copy of 26 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File, to Jessica M. Denson 3925 Big Oak Drive #4 Studio City, CA 91604. (aea)
September 27, 2018 26 Featured Case ORDER granting 25 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File to file Notice of Appeal. Plaintiff is granted a 30-day extension of the deadline to file a notice of appeal. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) Copies of Notice of Electronic Filing To Be Mailed By Clerks Office. (Furman, Jesse) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
September 26, 2018 25 MOTION for Extension of Time to File to file Notice of Appeal. Document filed by Jessica M. Denson. (tp)
August 31, 2018 Mailed a copy of 24 Clerk's Judgment, to Jessica M. Denson 3925 Big Oak Drive #4 Studio City, CA 91604. (aea)
August 31, 2018 24 CLERK'S JUDGMENT re: 23 Memorandum & Opinion in favor of Donald J. Trump against Jessica M. Denson. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Memorandum Opinion and Order dated August 30, 2018, the Campaign's motion to compel arbitration must be and is GRANTED. Had the Campaign requested it, the Court would have been prepared to stay the case pending arbitration rather than dismiss. See, e.g., Katz v. Cellco P'ship, 794 F.3d 341, 345 (2d Cir. 2015) ("We join those Circuits that consider a stay of proceedings necessary after all claims have been referred to arbitration and a stay requested." (emphasis added)). But the Campaign explicitly requests dismissal (see Docket No. 20, at 2), and Denson does not oppose that request for relief. Accordingly, the case is dismissed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 8/31/2018) (Attachments: # 1 Right to Appeal)(km) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
August 30, 2018 Mailed a copy of 23 Memorandum & Opinion, to Jessica M. Denson 3925 Big Oak Drive #4 Studio City, CA 91604. (aea)
August 30, 2018 23 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re: 8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration. MOTION to Dismiss. filed by Donald J. Trump. For the foregoing reasons, the Campaign's motion to compel arbitration must be and is GRANTED. Had the Campaign requested it, the Court would have been prepared to stay the case pending arbitration rather than dismiss. See, e.g., Katz v. Cellco P'ship, 794 F.3d 341, 345 (2d Cir. 2015) ("We join those Circuits that consider a stay of proceedings necessary after all claims have been referred to arbitration and a stay requested." (emphasis added)). But the Campaign explicitly requests dismissal (see Docket No. 20, at 2), and Denson does not oppose that request for relief. Accordingly, the case is dismissed. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Docket No. 8, to close the case, and to mail a copy of this Memorandum Opinion and Order to Denson. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 8/30/2018) (ne) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing.
August 20, 2018 22 LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Jessica Denson, dated 8/20/18 re: Plaintiff submits this letter with attached 8/7/18 order denying the defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration in the related New York Supreme Court case, 101616-17; and the plaintiff cites this as additional authority in opposition to the defendant's Motion to Complel Arbitration in the S.D.N.Y. case, 18-cv2690. Document filed by Jessica M. Denson.(sc)
July 3, 2018 21 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration served on Jessica Denson on 7/3/2018. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Donald J. Trump. (Rosen, Lawrence)
July 3, 2018 20 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration . MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Donald J. Trump. (Rosen, Lawrence)
June 18, 2018 19 MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION THE DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; re: 8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration . MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Jessica M. Denson. (sc)
June 6, 2018 Mailed a copy of 18 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Jessica M. Denson 3925 Big Oak Drive #4 Studio City, CA 91604. (mhe)
June 5, 2018 Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted re: 18 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to the Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing. (jwh)
June 5, 2018 18 Featured Case ORDER granting 16 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply: Application GRANTED. In light of the holiday, Defendant is granted two weeks to file any reply. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Docket No. 16 and to mail a copy of this endorsed letter to Plaintiff. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 6/5/2018) (jwh)
June 5, 2018 17 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Letter Motion dated 6-5-18 served on Jessica Denson on 6-5-18. Service was made by FEDEX. Document filed by Donald J. Trump. (Rosen, Lawrence)
June 5, 2018 16 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration . MOTION to Dismiss ., 15 Scheduling Order, addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Lawrence S. Rosen dated June 5, 2018. Document filed by Donald J. Trump.(Rosen, Lawrence)
June 5, 2018 Mailed a copy of 15 Scheduling Order to Jessica M. Denson 3925 Big Oak Drive #4 Studio City, CA 91604. (mhe)
June 4, 2018 Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted re: 15 Scheduling Order, to the Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing. (mro)
June 4, 2018 15 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER: On June 4, 2018, Defendant filed a motion to compel arbitration and dismiss this action. (Docket No. 8). In light of Plaintiff's pro se status, any opposition to Defendant's motion shall be filed within 30 days of this Order; any reply shall be filed within one week of any opposition. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 6/4/2018) (mro)
June 4, 2018 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patrick Thomas McPartland on behalf of Donald J. Trump. (McPartland, Patrick)
June 4, 2018 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Motion, Declaration of Lawrence S. Rosen (with exhibits); Affidavit of Michael S. Glassner (with exhibit), Memorandum of Law in Support, and Rule 12.1 Notice served on Jessica Denson on 06/04/2018. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Donald J. Trump. (Rosen, Lawrence)
June 4, 2018 12 NOTICE of to Pro Se Litigant Pursuant to Local Rule 12.1 re: 8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration . MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Donald J. Trump. (Rosen, Lawrence)
June 4, 2018 11 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration . MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Donald J. Trump. (Rosen, Lawrence)
June 4, 2018 10 AFFIDAVIT of Michael S. Glassner in Support re: 8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration . MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Rosen, Lawrence)
June 4, 2018 9 DECLARATION of Lawrence S. Rosen in Support re: 8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration . MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Rosen, Lawrence)
June 4, 2018 8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration ., MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Donald J. Trump.(Rosen, Lawrence)
May 22, 2018 7 MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Donald J. Trump served on 5/15/2018, answer due 6/5/2018. Service was accepted by Matthew Maron. Document filed by Jessica M. Denson. (mhe)
April 9, 2018 6 FRCP 4 SERVICE PACKAGE MAILED to Jessica M. Denson, at 3925 Big Oak Drive #4, Studio City, CA 91604, on 04/09/2018 Re: 5 Order of Service, via REGULAR MAIL. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a flyer about the free legal assistance clinic located in the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse (only in non prisoner cases), a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge, a form for you to complete if you consent to receive filings electronically (only in nonprisoner cases). (sbr)
April 9, 2018 FRCP 4 SERVICE PACKAGE HAND DELIVERED TO U.S.M.: on 04/09/2018 Re: Judge Jesse M. Furman 5 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: Summons, IFP, Order of Service, Completed U.S.M. form(s) for defendant(s)Donald J. Trump. (sbr)
April 9, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Donald J. Trump. (sbr)
April 3, 2018 5 Featured Case ORDER OF SERVICE: The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, together with an information package. The Clerk of Court is also instructed to fill out a USM-285 form for Defendant Donald J. Trump For President, Inc., at: Donald J. Trump for President, Inc., 725 Fifth Avenue, New York, New York, 10022. The Clerk of Court is further instructed to issue a summons and deliver to the Marshals Service all of the paperwork necessary for the Marshals Service to effect service upon Defendant. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 4/3/2018) (ras)
April 2, 2018 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (tro)
April 2, 2018 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (tro)
April 2, 2018 Mailed a copy of 3 Order Granting IFP Application to Jessica M. Denson, 3925 Big Oak Drive, #4, Studio City, CA 91604. (rro)
March 29, 2018 Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted re: 3 Order Granting IFP Application to the Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing. (jwh)
March 29, 2018 3 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. See 28 U.S.C. § 1915. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 3/29/2018) (jwh)
March 26, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)
March 26, 2018 2 COMPLAINT against Donald J. Trump. Document filed by Jessica M. Denson.(rdz)
March 26, 2018 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Jessica M. Denson.(rdz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Denson v. Trump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica M. Denson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald J. Trump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?