Garcia Santana et al v. Rego Furniture Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Emeterio Garcia Santana
Defendant: Rego Furniture Inc., Fortune Distributor of Third Avenue, Inc., Z & G Distributors, Inc., Sami Zeitoune, Eli Yahu Grego and Sami Zee
Case Number: 1:2018cv02799
Filed: March 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J. Nathan
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER denying 70 MOTION to Strike Document No. 31 Defendants' answer filed by Emeterio Garcia Santana from the record. Plaintiff filed a motion to strike Defendant's answer on January 25, 2021. Dkt. No. 70. That mot ion is administratively denied in light of the Court's January 27, 2021 Order, Dkt. No. 72, and the Defendants' February 15, 2021 Letter, Dkt. No. 73. This resolves Dkt. No. 70. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 9/8/2021) (vfr)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting 75 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File case management plan addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Peter Hans Cooper dated February 17, 2021. Document filed by Rego Furniture Inc., Eli Yahu Grego. So ordered. If parties are unable to agree on a settlement, the parties must submit a proposed case management plan by April 15, 2021. (The following deadline(s) was terminated: Response Deadline). (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 2/17/2021) (rjm)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER with respect to 70 Motion to Strike document from the record.. The Court has received Plaintiff's January 25, 2021 letter. Dkt. No. 70. Defendants have until March 1, 2021 to respond. Defendants are warned that failure to timely respond could result in sanctions, including judgement being entered in favor of Plaintiff. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 1/27/2021) (tro)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 OPINION & ORDER: Per the Court's January 12, 2021 Order, Dkt. No. 69, the parties' proposed Case Management Plan was due on January 15, 2021. The parties still have not proposed a new case management plan. The parties are instructed to submit a proposed case management plan by February 1, 2021. If Plaintiff is unable to contact Defendants, Plaintiff may submit a proposed case management individually. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 1/25/2021) (jwh)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER: On November 25, 2020, the Court reopened the case. The parties are hereby ordered to submit a new proposed Case Management Plan, in accordance with the instructions in Dkt. No. 16, no later than January 8, 2021. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 12/15/2020) (nb)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 CLERK'S JUDGMENT re: 62 Memorandum & Opinion in favor of Emeterio Garcia Santana against Fortune Distributor of Third Avenue, Inc., Rego Furniture Inc., Z & G Distributors, Inc., Eli Yahu Grego, Sami Zee, Sami Zeitoune in the amount of & #036;30,000.00. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Opinion and Order dated August 16, 2020, the settlement is approved in the amount of $30,000. Plaintiffs' counsel is to receive &# 036;6,055.20 of the settlement amount, with $5,020 allocated to attorneys' fees and $1,035.20 to costs, and the balance to go to Plaintiff; accordingly, this case is closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 8/17/2020) (Attachments: # 1 Right to Appeal) (km)
August 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 OPINION AND ORDER. For the reasons explained above, the Court approves the settlement. Plaintiffs' counsel is to receive $6055.20 of the settlement amount, with $5020 allocated to attorneys' fees and $1,035.20 to costs, and the balance to go to Plaintiff. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to enter judgment and close this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 8/16/2020) (rjm) Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing.
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia Santana et al v. Rego Furniture Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emeterio Garcia Santana
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Sara Jacqueline Isaacson
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Sara Jacqueline Isaacson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rego Furniture Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fortune Distributor of Third Avenue, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Z & G Distributors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sami Zeitoune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eli Yahu Grego
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sami Zee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?