Nieves v. Joseph et al
Plaintiff: Julio Nieves
Defendant: B. Joseph, M. Walker, Correction Officers John Doe ##1-2 and Correction Officer Jane Doe
Case Number: 1:2018cv02906
Filed: April 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: Dutchess
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER: It has been reported to the Court that this action has settled. Accordingly, it is hereby: ORDERED that the above-captioned action is discontinued without costs to any party and without prejudice to restoring the action to this Court's docket if the application to restore the action is made within thirty (30) days. (As further set forth in this Order.) The conference scheduled for July 29, 2021 and the trial scheduled for the following week are hereby adjourned sine die. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close this case. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 7/16/2021) (cf)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting 93 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application granted. The telephone conference is adjourned to July 9, 2021 at 3:00 p.m. SO ORDERED. Telephone Conference set for 7/9/2021 at 03:00 PM before Judge Ronnie Abrams.. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 6/30/2021) (nb)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER: The Court would like to hold a brief conference to discuss the upcoming trial, which is set to begin the week of August 2, 2021. A telephone conference is hereby scheduled for Friday, July 2, at 11:30 a.m., on the following conference line : Call-in Number: (888) 363-4749; Access Code: 1015508. This conference line is open to the public. If the parties are unavailable at that time, they are directed to confer and propose alternative dates and times. ( Telephone Conference set for 7/2/2021 at 11:30 AM before Judge Ronnie Abrams.) (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 6/28/2021) (cf)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER: The Court will hold a brief telephone conference on September 1, 2020 at 11:45 a.m. to discuss scheduling in this case. The parties shall use the dial-in information provided below to call in to the conference: Call-in Number: (888) 363-474 9 Access Code: 1015508 This conference line is open to the public. If it is not feasible for the parties to appear telephonically at that time, they should jointly notify the Court by letter filed on ECF and include proposed alternative dates for this conference., Telephone Conference set for 9/1/2020 at 11:45 AM before Judge Ronnie Abrams. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 8/28/2020) (rj)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER: Pursuant to the Southern District of New York's Standing Order of April 20, 2020 regarding the suspension of jury trials, see 20 Misc. 197, the trial in this action--currently scheduled to begin on June 1, 2020--is hereby adjourned. No later than May 11, 2020, the parties shall jointly file a letter proposing alternative trial dates. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 4/27/2020) (ama)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER: The final pre-trial conference scheduled for May 27, 2020 is hereby adjourned to May 29, 2020 at 3:00 p.m. (Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/29/2020 at 03:00 PM before Judge Ronnie Abrams.) (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 1/31/2020) (jwh)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting 77 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 12/30/2019) (va)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER: The parties shall jointly file a letter, no later than December 13, 2019, informing the Court whether they have confirmed that their witnesses are available for trial the week of January 27, 2020, and if they are not, then proposing a revis ed trial schedule. Additionally, no later than December 20, 2019, the parties shall file responses to the motions in limine, and no later than January 6, 2020, the parties shall file a joint letter informing the Court of their positions as to any exhibits not already covered in a motion in limine. SO ORDERED. ( Responses due by 12/20/2019) (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 12/6/2019) (va)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the parties' joint pretrial materials, filed on December 2, 2019. The Court will hold a conference call with the parties on Tuesday, December 3, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. The parties shall jointly call (212) 805-0162 at that time. ( Telephone Conference set for 12/3/2019 at 02:00 PM before Judge Ronnie Abrams.) (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 12/3/2019) (mro)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nieves v. Joseph et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julio Nieves
Represented By: Amy Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correction Officers John Doe ##1-2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correction Officer Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?