City of Riviera Beach General Employees Retirement System v. Macquarie Infrastructure Corporation et al
Plaintiff: City of Riviera Beach General Employees Retirement System
Defendant: James Hooke, Jay Davis, Macquarie Infrastructure Corporation, Richard D. Courtney, Liam Stewart, George W. Carmany III, Henry E. Lentz, Martin Stanley, Barclays Capital Inc., Norman H. Brown, Jr., Macquarie Infrastructure Management (USA) Inc., Barclay Capital Inc., Robert Choi, William H. Webb and Ouma Sananikone
Petitioner: Bernard Selz Revocable Trust, James Goetz, Selz Capital LLC, Thomas J. Stone Trust, Bernard T. Selz 2008 15-Year Charitable Lead Annuity Trust, Selz Family 2011 Trust, Municipal Employees' Retirement System of Michigan, Bernard T. Selz 2008 20-Year Charitable Lead Annuity Trust, Paul Arthur Reimer, Lisa Pagliaro Selz Revocable Trust and Karnak Partners, L.P.
Lead Plaintiff: Moab Partners, L.P.
Case Number: 1:2018cv03608
Filed: April 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER denying #116 Letter Motion for Oral Argument. APPLICATION DENIED. SO ORDERED. If, after reviewing the parties' briefs, I determine that oral argument is necessary, I will so notify the parties. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 7/23/2019) (rro)
July 22, 2019 Filing 116 LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument on the defendants' motions to dismiss the consolidated class action complaint. addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from John E. Schreiber dated July 22, 2019. Document filed by Robert Choi, Norman H. Brown, Jr., George W. Carmany III, Richard D. Courtney, Jay Davis, James Hooke, Henry E. Lentz, Macquarie Infrastructure Corporation, Ouma Sananikone, Martin Stanley, Liam Stewart, William H. Webb.(Schreiber, John)
July 22, 2019 Filing 115 DECLARATION of John E. Schreiber in Support re: #100 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Robert Choi, Norman H. Brown, Jr., George W. Carmany III, Richard D. Courtney, Jay Davis, James Hooke, Henry E. Lentz, Macquarie Infrastructure Corporation, Ouma Sananikone, Martin Stanley, Liam Stewart, William H. Webb. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Transcript, #2 Exhibit B - Transcript, #3 Exhibit C - Transcript, #4 Exhibit D - Form 10-K (Excerpt), #5 Exhibit E - Form 4, #6 Exhibit F - Form 4, #7 Exhibit G - Form 4, #8 Exhibit H - Form 8-K, #9 Exhibit I - Chart)(Schreiber, John)
July 22, 2019 Filing 114 JOINDER to join re: #113 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, . Document filed by Barclays Capital Inc..(Buergel, Susanna)
July 22, 2019 Filing 113 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #100 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Robert Choi, Norman H. Brown, Jr., George W. Carmany III, Richard D. Courtney, Jay Davis, James Hooke, Henry E. Lentz, Macquarie Infrastructure Corporation, Ouma Sananikone, Martin Stanley, Liam Stewart, William H. Webb. (Schreiber, John)
July 22, 2019 Filing 112 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #102 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Macquarie Infrastructure Management (USA) Inc.. (Paparella, Christopher)
June 21, 2019 Filing 111 DECLARATION of Jesse L. Jensen in Opposition re: #102 MOTION to Dismiss ., #100 MOTION to Dismiss ., #105 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Moab Partners, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Jensen, Jesse)
June 21, 2019 Filing 110 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #102 MOTION to Dismiss ., #100 MOTION to Dismiss ., #105 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Moab Partners, L.P.. (Graziano, Salvatore)
June 21, 2019 Filing 109 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Michael Fee on behalf of Moab Partners, L.P.. (Fee, James)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER with respect to #107 Letter Motion for Oral Argument. Pursuant to my Individual Rule 4.J, I will inform the parties shall oral argument be deemed necessary. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 4/23/2019) (rro)
April 22, 2019 Filing 107 LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument on Barclays Capital Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Susanna M. Buergel dated April 22, 2019. Document filed by Barclays Capital Inc..(Buergel, Susanna)
April 22, 2019 Filing 106 JOINDER to join re: #101 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, . Document filed by Barclays Capital Inc..(Buergel, Susanna)
April 22, 2019 Filing 105 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Barclays Capital Inc..(Buergel, Susanna)
April 22, 2019 Filing 104 DECLARATION of John E. Schreiber in Support re: #100 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Robert Choi, Norman H. Brown, Jr., George W. Carmany III, Richard D. Courtney, Jay Davis, James Hooke, Henry E. Lentz, Macquarie Infrastructure Corporation, Ouma Sananikone, Martin Stanley, Liam Stewart, William H. Webb. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Feb. 27, 2009 MIC 10-K (Excerpt), #2 Exhibit B - May 3, 2012 MIC Earnings Call, #3 Exhibit C - Feb. 18, 2015 MIC 10-K (Excerpt, #4 Exhibit D - Feb. 23, 2016 MIC 8-K (Excerpt), #5 Exhibit E - Feb. 23, 2016 MIC Earnings Call, #6 Exhibit F - Feb. 23, 2016 MIC 10-K (Excerpt), #7 Exhibit G - May 2, 2016 MIC 10-Q (Excerpt), #8 Exhibit H - May 12, 2016 MIC Investor Day, #9 Exhibit I - Aug. 1, 2016 MIC 10-Q (Excerpt), #10 Exhibit J - Aug. 2, 2016 MIC Earnings Call, #11 Exhibit K - Oct. 31, 2016 Blog Post, #12 Exhibit L - Nov. 1, 2016 MIC 10-Q (Excerpt), #13 Exhibit M - Nov. 1, 2016 MIC Earnings Call, #14 Exhibit N - Nov. 3, 2016 MIC Prospectus Suppl. (Excerpt), #15 Exhibit O - 2017 Seatrade Maritime Whitepaper, #16 Exhibit P - Feb. 3, 2017 MIC Press Release, #17 Exhibit Q - Feb. 21, 2017 MIC 10-K (Excerpt), #18 Exhibit R - May 3, 2017 MIC 10-Q (Excerpt), #19 Exhibit S - May 10, 2017 Oppenheimer Conference, #20 Exhibit T - May 18, 2017 TPA Conference, #21 Exhibit U - June 27, 2017 JP Morgan Conference, #22 Exhibit V - Aug. 2, 2017 MIC 10-Q (Excerpt), #23 Exhibit W - Aug. 3, 2017 MIC Earnings Call, #24 Exhibit X - Aug. 31, 2017 TPA Conference, #25 Exhibit Y - Sept. 11, 2017 MIC 8-K, #26 Exhibit Z - Nov. 1, 2017 MIC 10-Q (Excerpt), #27 Exhibit AA - Nov. 2, 2017 MIC Earnings Call, #28 Exhibit BB - Nov. 10, 2017 Email, #29 Exhibit CC - Nov. 16, 2017 TPA Conference, #30 Exhibit DD - Dec. 2017 MIC Presentation, #31 Exhibit EE - Feb. 21, 2018 MIC 10-K (Excerpt), #32 Exhibit FF - Feb. 22, 2018 MIC Earnings Call, #33 Exhibit GG - May 3, 2018 MIC Earnings Call, #34 Exhibit HH - May 3, 2018 MIC Form DEFA14A, #35 Exhibit II - Feb. 20, 2019 MIC 10-K (Excerpt), #36 Exhibit JJ - Chart)(Schreiber, John)
April 22, 2019 Filing 103 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #102 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Macquarie Infrastructure Management (USA) Inc.. (Paparella, Christopher)
April 22, 2019 Filing 102 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Macquarie Infrastructure Management (USA) Inc..(Paparella, Christopher)
April 22, 2019 Filing 101 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #100 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Robert Choi, Norman H. Brown, Jr., George W. Carmany III, Richard D. Courtney, Jay Davis, James Hooke, Henry E. Lentz, Macquarie Infrastructure Corporation, Ouma Sananikone, Martin Stanley, Liam Stewart, William H. Webb. (Schreiber, John)
April 22, 2019 Filing 100 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Robert Choi, Norman H. Brown, Jr., George W. Carmany III, Richard D. Courtney, Jay Davis, James Hooke, Henry E. Lentz, Macquarie Infrastructure Corporation, Ouma Sananikone, Martin Stanley, Liam Stewart, William H. Webb.(Schreiber, John)
April 19, 2019 Filing 99 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Macquarie Group Limited, Corporate Parent Macquarie Infrastructure and Real Assets Inc. for Macquarie Infrastructure Management (USA) Inc.. Document filed by Macquarie Infrastructure Management (USA) Inc..(Paparella, Christopher)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 98 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: #97 Letter, filed by Henry E. Lentz, Richard D. Courtney, Robert Choi, Norman H. Brown, Jr., George W. Carmany III, Macquarie Infrastructure Corporation, Martin Stanley, Liam Stewart, James Hooke, Ouma Sananikone, William H. Webb, Jay Davis. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 4/17/2019) (ama)
April 16, 2019 Filing 97 LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from John E. Schreiber dated April 16, 2019 re: requesting extension of page limits for briefing on MIC's and the 11 Individual Defendants' joint motion to dismiss. Document filed by Robert Choi, Norman H. Brown, Jr., George W. Carmany III, Richard D. Courtney, Jay Davis, James Hooke, Henry E. Lentz, Macquarie Infrastructure Corporation, Ouma Sananikone, Martin Stanley, Liam Stewart, William H. Webb.(Schreiber, John)
April 11, 2019 Filing 96 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Erik Schreiber on behalf of Robert Choi, Norman H. Brown, Jr., George W. Carmany III, Henry E. Lentz, Ouma Sananikone, Martin Stanley, William H. Webb. (Schreiber, John)
April 11, 2019 Filing 95 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard Walter Reinthaler on behalf of Robert Choi, Norman H. Brown, Jr., George W. Carmany III, Henry E. Lentz, Ouma Sananikone, Martin Stanley, William H. Webb. (Reinthaler, Richard)
April 9, 2019 Filing 94 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Barclays PLC for Barclays Capital Inc.. Document filed by Barclays Capital Inc..(Buergel, Susanna)
April 9, 2019 Filing 93 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alison Rebecca Gross Benedon on behalf of Barclays Capital Inc.. (Benedon, Alison)
April 9, 2019 Filing 92 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Susanna Michele Buergel on behalf of Barclays Capital Inc.. (Buergel, Susanna)
April 4, 2019 Filing 91 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Macquarie Infrastructure Management (USA) Inc. waiver sent on 2/26/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. Document filed by Moab Partners, L.P.. (Jensen, Jesse)
April 4, 2019 Filing 90 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Ouma Sananikone waiver sent on 2/26/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. Document filed by Moab Partners, L.P.. (Jensen, Jesse)
April 4, 2019 Filing 89 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Martin Stanley waiver sent on 2/26/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. Document filed by Moab Partners, L.P.. (Jensen, Jesse)
April 4, 2019 Filing 88 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. William H. Webb waiver sent on 2/26/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. Document filed by Moab Partners, L.P.. (Jensen, Jesse)
April 4, 2019 Filing 87 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. George W. Carmany III waiver sent on 2/26/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. Document filed by Moab Partners, L.P.. (Jensen, Jesse)
April 4, 2019 Filing 86 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Norman H. Brown, Jr. waiver sent on 2/26/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. Document filed by Moab Partners, L.P.. (Jensen, Jesse)
April 4, 2019 Filing 85 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Robert Choi waiver sent on 2/26/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. Document filed by Moab Partners, L.P.. (Jensen, Jesse)
April 4, 2019 Filing 84 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Henry E. Lentz waiver sent on 2/26/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. Document filed by Moab Partners, L.P.. (Jensen, Jesse)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 STIPULATION TO CLARIFY COMPLAINT: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between Plaintiff and Macquarie Management, that the Consolidated Class Action Complaint does not name Macquarie Management as a Defendant in Count I, but only as to Count II, Count III, and Count VI. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 4/4/2019) (rro)
April 3, 2019 Filing 82 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Macquarie Infrastructure Management (USA) Inc.. (Paparella, Christopher)
March 27, 2019 Filing 81 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Martin Paparella on behalf of Macquarie Infrastructure Management (USA) Inc.. (Paparella, Christopher)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting #79 Letter Motion for Extension of Time, APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 3/7/2019) (rro)
March 7, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Robert Choi answer due 4/22/2019; Barclay Capital Inc. answer due 4/22/2019; Barclays Capital Inc. answer due 4/22/2019; Norman H. Brown, Jr. answer due 4/22/2019; George W. Carmany III answer due 4/22/2019; Richard D. Courtney answer due 4/22/2019; Jay Davis answer due 4/22/2019; James Hooke answer due 4/22/2019; Henry E. Lentz answer due 4/22/2019; Macquarie Infrastructure Corporation answer due 4/22/2019; Macquarie Infrastructure Management (USA) Inc. answer due 4/22/2019; Ouma Sananikone answer due 4/22/2019; Martin Stanley answer due 4/22/2019; Liam Stewart answer due 4/22/2019; William H. Webb answer due 4/22/2019. Responses due by 6/21/2019 Replies due by 7/22/2019. (rro)
March 6, 2019 Filing 79 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to the Consolidated Class Action Complaint and set a briefing schedule for defendants' anticipated motions to dismiss, addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from All Parties dated March 6, 2019. Document filed by Robert Choi, Norman H. Brown, Jr., George W. Carmany III, Richard D. Courtney, Jay Davis, James Hooke, Henry E. Lentz, Macquarie Infrastructure Corporation, Ouma Sananikone, Martin Stanley, Liam Stewart, William H. Webb.(Schreiber, John)
February 25, 2019 Filing 78 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint, served. Barclays Capital Inc. served on 2/22/2019, answer due 3/15/2019. Service was accepted by Jessica Baker. Document filed by Moab Partners, L.P.. (Graziano, Salvatore)
February 25, 2019 Filing 77 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nicholas Stephen Hirst on behalf of Moab Partners, L.P.. (Hirst, Nicholas)
February 25, 2019 Filing 76 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lori Marks-Esterman on behalf of Moab Partners, L.P.. (Marks-Esterman, Lori)
February 25, 2019 Filing 75 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John G. Moon on behalf of Moab Partners, L.P.. (Moon, John)
February 21, 2019 Filing 74 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to William H. Webb. (pne)
February 21, 2019 Filing 73 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Robert Choi. (pne)
February 21, 2019 Filing 72 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ouma Sananikone. (pne)
February 21, 2019 Filing 71 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Norman H. Brown, Jr.. (pne)
February 21, 2019 Filing 70 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Martin Stanley. (pne)
February 21, 2019 Filing 69 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Macquarie Infrastructure Management (USA) Inc.. (pne)
February 21, 2019 Filing 68 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Henry E. Lentz. (pne)
February 21, 2019 Filing 67 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to George W. Carmany III. (pne)
February 21, 2019 Filing 66 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Barclay Capital Inc.. (pne)
February 20, 2019 Filing 65 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Barclays Capital Inc., re: #56 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Moab Partners, L.P.. (Graziano, Salvatore)
February 20, 2019 Filing 64 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Robert Choi, re: #56 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Moab Partners, L.P.. (Graziano, Salvatore)
February 20, 2019 Filing 63 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ouma Sananikone, re: #56 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Moab Partners, L.P.. (Graziano, Salvatore)
February 20, 2019 Filing 62 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Macquarie Infrastructure Management (USA) Inc., re: #56 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Moab Partners, L.P.. (Graziano, Salvatore)
February 20, 2019 Filing 61 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to William H. Webb, re: #56 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Moab Partners, L.P.. (Graziano, Salvatore)
February 20, 2019 Filing 60 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to George W. Carmany III, re: #56 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Moab Partners, L.P.. (Graziano, Salvatore)
February 20, 2019 Filing 59 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Norman H. Brown, Jr., re: #56 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Moab Partners, L.P.. (Graziano, Salvatore)
February 20, 2019 Filing 58 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Henry E. Lentz, re: #56 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Moab Partners, L.P.. (Graziano, Salvatore)
February 20, 2019 Filing 57 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Martin Stanley, re: #56 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Moab Partners, L.P.. (Graziano, Salvatore)
February 20, 2019 Filing 56 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against Richard D. Courtney, Jay Davis, James Hooke, Macquarie Infrastructure Corporation, Liam Stewart, Barclay Capital Inc., Robert Choi, Martin Stanley, Norman H. Brown, Jr., George W. Carmany III, Henry E. Lentz, Ouma Sananikone, William H. Webb, Macquarie Infrastructure Management (USA) Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Moab Partners, L.P.. Related document: #1 Complaint,.(Graziano, Salvatore)
February 20, 2019 Filing 55 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jesse Lee Jensen on behalf of Moab Partners, L.P.. (Jensen, Jesse)
February 20, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lauren Amy Ormsbee on behalf of Moab Partners, L.P.. (Ormsbee, Lauren)
February 20, 2019 Filing 53 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Salvatore Jo Graziano on behalf of Moab Partners, L.P.. (Graziano, Salvatore)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 OPINION AND ORDER. For the foregoing reasons, movants' motions for consolidation are GRANTED based on the similarity of the Related Actions. Because I find that Moab is the presumptive lead plaintiff and no other movants have rebutted that presumption, Moab's motion for appointment as lead plaintiff and for approval of lead counsel is GRANTED. The remaining motions from Paul Reimer, James Goetz, the Selz Funds, MERS, and the Stone Trust for appointment as lead plaintiff and for approval of lead counsel are DENIED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to terminate the pending motions at Docket Numbers. 20, 23, 26, 29, 32, and 34. Moab is directed to file an amended consolidated complaint no later than thirty (30) days after the date of issuance of this Opinion & Order. Defendants are directed to answer or otherwise respond to the amended consolidated complaint no later than thirty (30) days after Moab serves the amended consolidated complaint. SO ORDERED. re: #23 MOTION to Appoint James Goetz to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel. MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:18-cv-03744 filed by James Goetz, #20 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:18-cv-3744. MOTION to Appoint Paul Arthur Reimer to serve as lead plaintiff(s) filed by Paul Arthur Reimer, #29 MOTION to Appoint Municipal Employees' Retirement System of Michigan to serve as lead plaintiff(s) filed by Municipal Employees' Retirement System of Michigan, #26 MOTION to Appoint Karnak Partners, L.P., the Selz Family 2011 Trust, the Bernard Selz Revocable Trust, the Bernard T. Selz 2008 15-Year Charitable Lead Annuity Trust, the Bernard T. Selz 2008 20-Year Charitable Lead Annuity Trust, Selz Capital LLC, a filed by Selz Capital LLC, Bernard T. Selz 2008 15-Year Charitable Lead Annuity Trust, Bernard Selz Revocable Trust, Bernard T. Selz 2008 20-Year Charitable Lead Annuity Trust, Karnak Partners, L.P., Lisa Pagliaro Selz Revocable Trust, Selz Family 2011 Trust, #34 MOTION to Appoint Moab Partners, L.P. to serve as lead plaintiff(s) filed by Moab Partners, L.P., #32 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 18-cv-03744. MOTION to Appoint Thomas J. Stone Trust to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Approve Counsel filed by Thomas J. Stone Trust. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 1/30/2019) (rjm)
October 18, 2018 Filing 51 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Macquarie Group Limited for Macquarie Infrastructure Corporation. Document filed by Macquarie Infrastructure Corporation.(Schreiber, John)
October 18, 2018 Filing 50 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Erik Schreiber on behalf of Richard D. Courtney, Jay Davis, James Hooke, Macquarie Infrastructure Corporation, Liam Stewart. (Schreiber, John)
October 18, 2018 Filing 49 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard Walter Reinthaler on behalf of Richard D. Courtney, Jay Davis, James Hooke, Macquarie Infrastructure Corporation, Liam Stewart. (Reinthaler, Richard)
July 16, 2018 Filing 48 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #29 MOTION to Appoint Municipal Employees' Retirement System of Michigan to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . . Document filed by Municipal Employees' Retirement System of Michigan. (Rosenfeld, David)
July 16, 2018 Filing 47 DECLARATION of Avi Josefson in Support re: #34 MOTION to Appoint Moab Partners, L.P. to serve as lead plaintiff(s) .. Document filed by Moab Partners, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Rothenberg Declaration, #2 Exhibit B - May 17, 2017 Transcript, #3 Exhibit C - June 27, 2017 Transcript, #4 Exhibit D - CII Investor-Company Roundtable, #5 Exhibit E - MERS 2014 Annual Report, #6 Exhibit F - NYT Article, #7 Exhibit G - MERS 2016 Annual Report, #8 Exhibit H - Bloomberg Screenshots, #9 Exhibit I - ISS Proxy Analysis, #10 Exhibit J - MAY 18, 2018 Form 8-K)(Josefson, Avi)
July 16, 2018 Filing 46 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #34 MOTION to Appoint Moab Partners, L.P. to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . . Document filed by Moab Partners, L.P.. (Josefson, Avi)
July 9, 2018 Filing 45 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #34 MOTION to Appoint Moab Partners, L.P. to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . . Document filed by Moab Partners, L.P.. (Josefson, Avi)
July 9, 2018 Filing 44 DECLARATION of David A. Rosenfeld in Opposition re: #23 MOTION to Appoint James Goetz to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel . MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:18-cv-03744 ., #20 MOTION to Appoint Counsel . MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:18-cv-3744 . MOTION to Appoint Paul Arthur Reimer to serve as lead plaintiff(s) ., #26 MOTION to Appoint Karnak Partners, L.P., the Selz Family 2011 Trust, the Bernard Selz Revocable Trust, the Bernard T. Selz 2008 15-Year Charitable Lead Annuity Trust, the Bernard T. Selz 2008 20-Year Charitable Lead Annuity Trust, Selz Capital LLC, a, #34 MOTION to Appoint Moab Partners, L.P. to serve as lead plaintiff(s) ., #32 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 18-cv-03744 . MOTION to Appoint Thomas J. Stone Trust to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Approve Counsel .. Document filed by Municipal Employees' Retirement System of Michigan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 4/17/18 Letter from Moab Partners to Macquarie Infrastructure Corporation, #2 Exhibit 2 - 4/17/18 Business Wire, #3 Exhibit 3 - 5/2/18 PR Newswire, #4 Exhibit 4 - 5/2/18 Business Wire)(Rosenfeld, David)
July 9, 2018 Filing 43 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #23 MOTION to Appoint James Goetz to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel . MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:18-cv-03744 ., #20 MOTION to Appoint Counsel . MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:18-cv-3744 . MOTION to Appoint Paul Arthur Reimer to serve as lead plaintiff(s) ., #26 MOTION to Appoint Karnak Partners, L.P., the Selz Family 2011 Trust, the Bernard Selz Revocable Trust, the Bernard T. Selz 2008 15-Year Charitable Lead Annuity Trust, the Bernard T. Selz 2008 20-Year Charitable Lead Annuity Trust, Selz Capital LLC, a, #34 MOTION to Appoint Moab Partners, L.P. to serve as lead plaintiff(s) ., #32 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 18-cv-03744 . MOTION to Appoint Thomas J. Stone Trust to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Approve Counsel . . Document filed by Municipal Employees' Retirement System of Michigan. (Rosenfeld, David)
July 9, 2018 Filing 42 DECLARATION of Kim Miller in Opposition re: #34 MOTION to Appoint Moab Partners, L.P. to serve as lead plaintiff(s) .. Document filed by James Goetz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4)(Miller, Kim)
July 9, 2018 Filing 41 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #34 MOTION to Appoint Moab Partners, L.P. to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . . Document filed by James Goetz. (Miller, Kim)
July 9, 2018 Filing 40 RESPONSE to Motion re: #29 MOTION to Appoint Municipal Employees' Retirement System of Michigan to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . . Document filed by Bernard Selz Revocable Trust, Bernard T. Selz 2008 15-Year Charitable Lead Annuity Trust, Bernard T. Selz 2008 20-Year Charitable Lead Annuity Trust, Karnak Partners, L.P., Lisa Pagliaro Selz Revocable Trust, Selz Capital LLC, Selz Family 2011 Trust. (Kaplan, Robert)
July 9, 2018 Filing 39 NOTICE of NON-OPPOSITION TO COMPETING LEAD PLAINTIFF MOTIONS. Document filed by Paul Arthur Reimer. (Hopkins, Shannon)
July 9, 2018 Filing 38 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motion of Thomas J. Stone Trust for Consolidation, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Counsel re: #32 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 18-cv-03744 . MOTION to Appoint Thomas J. Stone Trust to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Approve Counsel .. Document filed by Thomas J. Stone Trust. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
June 25, 2018 Filing 37 DECLARATION of Avi Josefson in Support re: #34 MOTION to Appoint Moab Partners, L.P. to serve as lead plaintiff(s) .. Document filed by Moab Partners, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification, #2 Exhibit B - Loss Charts, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Pendency of Riviera Beach, #4 Exhibit D - BLB&G Resume)(Josefson, Avi)
June 25, 2018 Filing 36 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #34 MOTION to Appoint Moab Partners, L.P. to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . . Document filed by Moab Partners, L.P.. (Josefson, Avi)
June 25, 2018 Filing 35 DECLARATION of Jeremy A. Lieberman in Support re: #32 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 18-cv-03744 . MOTION to Appoint Thomas J. Stone Trust to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Approve Counsel .. Document filed by Thomas J. Stone Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Press Release, #2 Exhibit B - Certification, #3 Exhibit C - Loss Chart, #4 Exhibit D - Firm Resume)(Lieberman, Jeremy)
June 25, 2018 Filing 34 MOTION to Appoint Moab Partners, L.P. to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . Document filed by Moab Partners, L.P..(Josefson, Avi)
June 25, 2018 Filing 33 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #32 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 18-cv-03744 . MOTION to Appoint Thomas J. Stone Trust to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Approve Counsel . . Document filed by Thomas J. Stone Trust. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
June 25, 2018 Filing 32 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 18-cv-03744 ., MOTION to Appoint Thomas J. Stone Trust to serve as lead plaintiff(s) ., MOTION to Approve Counsel . Document filed by Thomas J. Stone Trust. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lieberman, Jeremy)
June 25, 2018 Filing 31 DECLARATION of David A. Rosenfeld in Support re: #29 MOTION to Appoint Municipal Employees' Retirement System of Michigan to serve as lead plaintiff(s) .. Document filed by Municipal Employees' Retirement System of Michigan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PSLRA Notice, #2 Exhibit B - Certification, #3 Exhibit C - Estimated losses, #4 Exhibit D - Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP firm resume)(Rosenfeld, David)
June 25, 2018 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #29 MOTION to Appoint Municipal Employees' Retirement System of Michigan to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . . Document filed by Municipal Employees' Retirement System of Michigan. (Rosenfeld, David)
June 25, 2018 Filing 29 MOTION to Appoint Municipal Employees' Retirement System of Michigan to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . Document filed by Municipal Employees' Retirement System of Michigan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rosenfeld, David)
June 25, 2018 Filing 28 DECLARATION of Solomon B. Cera in Support re: #26 MOTION to Appoint Karnak Partners, L.P., the Selz Family 2011 Trust, the Bernard Selz Revocable Trust, the Bernard T. Selz 2008 15-Year Charitable Lead Annuity Trust, the Bernard T. Selz 2008 20-Year Charitable Lead Annuity Trust, Selz Capital LLC, a. Document filed by Bernard Selz Revocable Trust, Bernard T. Selz 2008 15-Year Charitable Lead Annuity Trust, Bernard T. Selz 2008 20-Year Charitable Lead Annuity Trust, Karnak Partners, L.P., Lisa Pagliaro Selz Revocable Trust, Selz Capital LLC, Selz Family 2011 Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - copy of the notice of pendency of class action, #2 Exhibit B- copies of certificates of plaintiffs, #3 Exhibit C - copies of chart of losses of the Selz Funds, #4 Exhibit D - firm resume for Cera LLP)(Kaplan, Robert)
June 25, 2018 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #26 MOTION to Appoint Karnak Partners, L.P., the Selz Family 2011 Trust, the Bernard Selz Revocable Trust, the Bernard T. Selz 2008 15-Year Charitable Lead Annuity Trust, the Bernard T. Selz 2008 20-Year Charitable Lead Annuity Trust, Selz Capital LLC, a . Document filed by Bernard Selz Revocable Trust, Bernard T. Selz 2008 15-Year Charitable Lead Annuity Trust, Bernard T. Selz 2008 20-Year Charitable Lead Annuity Trust, Karnak Partners, L.P., Lisa Pagliaro Selz Revocable Trust, Selz Capital LLC, Selz Family 2011 Trust. (Kaplan, Robert)
June 25, 2018 Filing 26 MOTION to Appoint Karnak Partners, L.P., the Selz Family 2011 Trust, the Bernard Selz Revocable Trust, the Bernard T. Selz 2008 15-Year Charitable Lead Annuity Trust, the Bernard T. Selz 2008 20-Year Charitable Lead Annuity Trust, Selz Capital LLC, and the Lisa Pagliaro Selz Revocable Trust to serve as lead plaintiff(s) ; consolidation of related cases; and approval of selection of lead counsel for the class. Document filed by Selz Family 2011 Trust, Bernard Selz Revocable Trust, Bernard T. Selz 2008 15-Year Charitable Lead Annuity Trust, Bernard T. Selz 2008 20-Year Charitable Lead Annuity Trust, Selz Capital LLC, Lisa Pagliaro Selz Revocable Trust, Karnak Partners, L.P..(Kaplan, Robert)
June 25, 2018 Filing 25 DECLARATION of Kim E. Miller in Support re: #23 MOTION to Appoint James Goetz to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel . MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:18-cv-03744 .. Document filed by James Goetz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification, #2 Exhibit B - Loss Chart, #3 Exhibit C - PRNewswire, #4 Exhibit D - KSF Firm Resume)(Miller, Kim)
June 25, 2018 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #23 MOTION to Appoint James Goetz to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel . MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:18-cv-03744 . . Document filed by James Goetz. (Miller, Kim)
June 25, 2018 Filing 23 MOTION to Appoint James Goetz to serve as lead plaintiff(s) ., MOTION to Appoint Counsel ., MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:18-cv-03744 . Document filed by James Goetz. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Miller, Kim)
June 25, 2018 Filing 22 DECLARATION of Shannon L. Hopkins in Support re: #20 MOTION to Appoint Counsel . MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:18-cv-3744 . MOTION to Appoint Paul Arthur Reimer to serve as lead plaintiff(s) .. Document filed by Paul Arthur Reimer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Hopkins, Shannon)
June 25, 2018 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #20 MOTION to Appoint Counsel . MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:18-cv-3744 . MOTION to Appoint Paul Arthur Reimer to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . . Document filed by Paul Arthur Reimer. (Hopkins, Shannon)
June 25, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION to Appoint Counsel ., MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:18-cv-3744 ., MOTION to Appoint Paul Arthur Reimer to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . Document filed by Paul Arthur Reimer. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hopkins, Shannon)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #13 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. APPLICATION GRANTED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 5/15/2018) (rro)
May 9, 2018 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Richard D. Courtney waiver sent on 5/7/2018, answer due 7/6/2018. Document filed by City of Riviera Beach General Employees Retirement System. (Josefson, Avi)
May 9, 2018 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Liam Stewart waiver sent on 5/7/2018, answer due 7/6/2018. Document filed by City of Riviera Beach General Employees Retirement System. (Josefson, Avi)
May 9, 2018 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Jay Davis waiver sent on 5/7/2018, answer due 7/6/2018. Document filed by City of Riviera Beach General Employees Retirement System. (Josefson, Avi)
May 9, 2018 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. James Hooke waiver sent on 5/7/2018, answer due 7/6/2018. Document filed by City of Riviera Beach General Employees Retirement System. (Josefson, Avi)
May 9, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Macquarie Infrastructure Corporation served on 4/26/2018, answer due 5/17/2018. Service was accepted by Yekaterina Warr. Document filed by City of Riviera Beach General Employees Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Josefson, Avi)
May 9, 2018 Filing 13 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Avi Josefson and John E. Schreiber dated May 9, 2018. Document filed by City of Riviera Beach General Employees Retirement System.(Josefson, Avi)
April 24, 2018 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Richard D. Courtney. (pc)
April 24, 2018 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Macquarie Infrastructure Corporation. (pc)
April 24, 2018 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to James Hooke. (pc)
April 24, 2018 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jay Davis. (pc)
April 24, 2018 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Liam Stewart. (pc)
April 24, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Avi Josefson. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: City of Riviera Beach General Employees Retirement System. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (pc)
April 24, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Avi Josefson. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (pc)
April 24, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
April 24, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
April 24, 2018 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
April 23, 2018 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Richard D. Courtney, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by City of Riviera Beach General Employees Retirement System. (Josefson, Avi)
April 23, 2018 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Liam Stewart, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by City of Riviera Beach General Employees Retirement System. (Josefson, Avi)
April 23, 2018 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jay Davis, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by City of Riviera Beach General Employees Retirement System. (Josefson, Avi)
April 23, 2018 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to James Hooke, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by City of Riviera Beach General Employees Retirement System. (Josefson, Avi)
April 23, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Macquarie Infrastructure Corporation, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by City of Riviera Beach General Employees Retirement System. (Josefson, Avi)
April 23, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Josefson, Avi)
April 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Richard D. Courtney, Jay Davis, James Hooke, Macquarie Infrastructure Corporation, Liam Stewart. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14978368)Document filed by City of Riviera Beach General Employees Retirement System.(Josefson, Avi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Riviera Beach General Employees Retirement System v. Macquarie Infrastructure Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Hooke
Represented By: Richard Walter Reinthaler
Represented By: John Erik Schreiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Davis
Represented By: Richard Walter Reinthaler
Represented By: John Erik Schreiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macquarie Infrastructure Corporation
Represented By: Richard Walter Reinthaler
Represented By: John Erik Schreiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard D. Courtney
Represented By: Richard Walter Reinthaler
Represented By: John Erik Schreiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liam Stewart
Represented By: Richard Walter Reinthaler
Represented By: John Erik Schreiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George W. Carmany III
Represented By: Richard Walter Reinthaler
Represented By: John Erik Schreiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry E. Lentz
Represented By: Richard Walter Reinthaler
Represented By: John Erik Schreiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Stanley
Represented By: Richard Walter Reinthaler
Represented By: John Erik Schreiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Capital Inc.
Represented By: Alison Rebecca Gross Benedon
Represented By: Susanna Michele Buergel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norman H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Richard Walter Reinthaler
Represented By: John Erik Schreiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macquarie Infrastructure Management (USA) Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Martin Paparella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclay Capital Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Choi
Represented By: Richard Walter Reinthaler
Represented By: John Erik Schreiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William H. Webb
Represented By: Richard Walter Reinthaler
Represented By: John Erik Schreiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ouma Sananikone
Represented By: Richard Walter Reinthaler
Represented By: John Erik Schreiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Riviera Beach General Employees Retirement System
Represented By: Avi Josefson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Bernard Selz Revocable Trust
Represented By: Robert N. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James Goetz
Represented By: Kim Elaine Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Selz Capital LLC
Represented By: Robert N. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Thomas J. Stone Trust
Represented By: Jeremy Alan Lieberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Bernard T. Selz 2008 15-Year Charitable Lead Annuity Trust
Represented By: Robert N. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Selz Family 2011 Trust
Represented By: Robert N. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Municipal Employees' Retirement System of Michigan
Represented By: David Avi Rosenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Bernard T. Selz 2008 20-Year Charitable Lead Annuity Trust
Represented By: Robert N. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Paul Arthur Reimer
Represented By: Shannon Lee Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lisa Pagliaro Selz Revocable Trust
Represented By: Robert N. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Karnak Partners, L.P.
Represented By: Robert N. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Lead plaintiff: Moab Partners, L.P.
Represented By: James Michael Fee
Represented By: Nicholas Stephen Hirst
Represented By: Salvatore Jo Graziano
Represented By: John G. Moon
Represented By: Jesse Lee Jensen
Represented By: Lauren Amy Ormsbee
Represented By: Avi Josefson
Represented By: Lori Marks-Esterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?