Trustees of the New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund et al v. Manny P. Concrete Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Trustees of the New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund, Trustees of the New York City District Council of Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund and The New York City and Vicinity Carpenters Labor-Management Corporation
Defendant: Manny P. Concrete Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv04111
Filed: May 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J. Nathan
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION for 71 Motion for Attorney Fees, filed by Trustees of the New York City District Council of Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, The New York City and Vicinity Carpenters Labor-Management Corporatio n, Trustees of the New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund, 76 Report and Recommendations. The Court therefore adopts the R & R in its entirety and GRANTS (1) Plaintiffs' motion for attorneys' fees and costs in the amount of $42,682.87 and (2) Plaintiff's request for post-judgment interest, with interest to accrue at the statutory rate set forth in 2 8 U.S.C. § 1961. This resolves Dkt. No. 71. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to enter judgment in accordance with Dkt. No. 70 and this Order and to close the case. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 3/30/2021) (nb) Transmission to Finance Unit (Cashiers) for processing. Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing.
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER: Accordingly, Defendant is directed to file its opposition, if any, by July 31, 2020, or the Court will consider the motion unopposed. (As further set forth in this Order.) ( Responses due by 7/31/2020) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 7/21/2020) (cf)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 OPINION & ORDER re: 65 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment, 55 MOTION for Summary Judgment: For the reasons stated above, the Court GRANTS Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment and DENIES Defendant's cross motion. This resolves D kt. Nos. 55 and 65. Defendant is ORDERED to pay Plaintiffs $22,477.77. Defendant is also ORDERED to pay Plaintiffs their reasonable attorney's fees and costs. The Court will refer the calculation of reasonable fees to Magistrate Judge Wang by separate order. The Court also notes that much of Defendant's briefing consists not of legal argument, but of excerpts of emails between Defendant's counsel and Plaintiffs' counsel. The emails, all attached as exhibits, consist of u nprofessional attacks against opposing counsel, and Defendant's counsel repeats those attacks in its brief. None of this is relevant to the legal issues presented in this case. In addition, as the Court has noted, Defendant's response to Pl aintiff's Rule 56.1 Statement facially did not comply with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure or this District's Local Rules. Nor did Defendant even submit a Rule 56.1 Statement supporting its cross-motion for summary judgment. The Court admonishes Defendant's counsel for this behavior and advises counsel against such actions in future litigation. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 4/30/2020) (jwh) Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing.
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of the New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund et al v. Manny P. Concrete Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund
Represented By: Paige Davis
Represented By: Todd Dickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the New York City District Council of Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund
Represented By: Paige Davis
Represented By: Todd Dickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The New York City and Vicinity Carpenters Labor-Management Corporation
Represented By: Paige Davis
Represented By: Todd Dickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manny P. Concrete Company, Inc.
Represented By: Manny A. Frade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?