Rouviere et al v. Depuy Orthopaedics, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jodi Rouviere and Andre Rouviere
Defendant: Depuy Orthopaedics, Inc., Depuy Products, Inc., Depuy International, Limited, Johnson & Johnson, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., Stryker Corporation, Stryker Sales Corporation and Howmedica Osteonics Corporation
Case Number: 1:2018cv04814
Filed: May 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Stewart D. Aaron
Presiding Judge: Alison J. Nathan
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ORDER: NOW, THEREFORE, it is hereby ORDERED that, no later than Tuesday, May 11, 2021, DePuy shall file (1) a public version of the Letter Opposition with any portions it seeks to file under seal redacted, and (2) a motion for leav e to file under seal those redacted portions. If no such papers are filed by that date, the Court will unseal ECF Nos. 290 through 290-6. So Ordered. (Motions due by 5/11/2021., Responses due by 5/11/2021) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 5/4/2021) (js)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 296 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 287 Letter Motion for Discovery: Plaintiffs' motion, pursuant to Rules 16(b) and 37(c) of the Federal Rule of Civil Procedure, is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. No later than May 14, 2021, Plai ntiffs may serve supplemental expert reports of Dr. Gannon and Dr. Bobst. Thereafter, the parties shall meet and confer and submit to the Court, no later than May 17, 2021, a joint letter regarding a proposed schedule for rebuttal reports and for depositions of Dr. Gannon, Dr. Bobst and any rebuttal experts. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 4/29/2021) (Aaron, Stewart)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER: On Wednesday, April 28, 2021, at 2:00 p.m. EDT, the Court will hold a telephonic oral argument regarding Plaintiffs' pending motion to modify the current scheduling order, pursuant to Rule 16(d) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedu re, to permit the submission of supplemental expert reports. At the scheduled time, the parties shall each separately call (888) 278-0296 (or (214) 765-0479) and enter access code 6489745. In addition, it is hereby ORDERED, as follows: No lat er than Friday, April 23, 2021, DePuy shall file a letter setting forth whether "DePuy's counsel and Plaintiffs agreed that DePuy would provide copies to Plaintiff of any records or materials obtained pursuant to the signed release p rovided to DePuy's counsel," as set forth in Plaintiffs' Motion (see Pls.' Mot., ECF No. 287, at 2 n.3.); and No later than Friday, April 23, 2021, Plaintiffs shall file proof regarding the agreement they assert was mad e, as set forth in paragraph 1 above (e.g., copies of correspondence, sworn declaration, etc.). (Oral Argument set for 4/28/2021 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 4/19/2021) (js)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER granting 288 Letter Motion for Discovery. Request Granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 4/2/2021) (js)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER granting 268 Letter Motion for Discovery; granting 271 Letter Motion for Discovery. The briefing schedule set forth in the letter motions at Dkt. Nos. 268, 271 is GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 1/7/21) (yv)
December 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER denying 244 Motion for Reconsideration: Plaintiffs' motion, pursuant to Rule 59(e) of the Federal Rule of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 6.3, requesting the Court to alter, amend or set aside its November 24 Order is DENIED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 12/19/2020) (Aaron, Stewart)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER with respect to 246 Letter Motion for Discovery: Local Civil Rule 6.3, which is applicable to motions for reconsideration, states: "The time periods for the service of answering and reply memoranda, if any, shall be governed by Local C ivil Rule 6.1(a) or (b), as in the case of the original motion." Here, since the original motion was discovery-related, the time period under Local Civil Rule 6.1(a) shall apply, such that answering papers are due within seven days and reply papers are due two days thereafter. The parties of course may consent to a modification of this schedule, or seek an extension of time for good cause shown. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 12/7/2020) (Aaron, Stewart)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER granting 236 Letter Motion to Seal. ENDORSEMENT: Request GRANTED nunc pro tunc. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 11/25/2020) (kl)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER granting 214 Letter Motion: DePuy's motion to strike the DePuy-related opinions offered by Jarrell is GRANTED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 11/24/2020) (Aaron, Stewart)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER granting 219 Letter Motion to Seal. Request GRANTED. ECF No. 218 shall be placed under seal. No later than 12/1/2020, Plaintiffs shall either (1) respond to Howmedica's request that "Plaintiffs should be ordered to reimburse rea sonable fees and costs incurred by [Howmedica] in connection with its efforts to remedy Plaintiffs' wrongful disclosures," or (2) reach a reasonable accommodation with Howmedica. So Ordered. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 11/20/2020) (js) (Main Document 221 replaced on 11/20/2020) (kl). Modified on 11/20/2020 (kl).
November 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the documents that the Court provisionally had placed under seal (i.e., ECF Nos. 158, 179, 182, 188, 203) shall remain under seal. No later than November 30, 2020, Howmedica shall redact any confidential information from each of these filings and file on the public docket redacted versions of each of these filings. The Court thereafter shall review the publicly filed versions to ensure that Howmedica was not over-inclusive in its redactions. (And as further set forth in the Order.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 11/14/2020) (Aaron, Stewart)
October 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER re: 199 Response to Motion, filed by Howmedica Osteonics Corporation: The Court has placed Plaintiffs' Letter Motion filed at ECF No. 198 under seal. No later than Monday, 11/2/2020, Plaintiffs shall re-file on the public docket their Letter Motion with the name of the engineer expert redacted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 10/31/2020) (Aaron, Stewart)
October 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER granting 169 Letter Motion to Seal: Defendant Howmedica's motion to seal the documents filed at ECF Nos. 171 to 174, 181 and 190 to 192 is GRANTED with conditions. No later than 11/13/2020, Howmedica shall redact any confidential inform ation from each of these filings (including the filings made by Plaintiffs) and file on the public docket redacted versions of each of these filings. The Court thereafter shall review the publicly filed versions to ensure that Howmedica was not over-inclusive in its redactions. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 10/25/2020) (Aaron, Stewart)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 163 Letter Motion to Compel: Defendants' request is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. As soon as possible, Plaintiffs shall ship the tissue specimens via FedEx or other recognized overnight courie r service to HOC's counsel. The Court declines to adjourn the deposition of Dr. Gannon and declines to extend any deadlines; provided, however, that if the subject slides are not received by HOC's counsel by Tuesday, 10/13/2020, Defendants may renew their request for such relief. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 10/9/2020) (Aaron, Stewart)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER denying without prejudice 151 Letter Motion for Discovery. Following a telephone conference with the parties, and for the reasons stated on the record, Defendants' request that Plaintiffs be prohibited from relying on documents produced on the final day of discovery isDenied without Prejudice. So Ordered. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 9/29/2020) (js)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER denying 154 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File: Based upon the record currently before the Court, Plaintiffs' request is DENIED. Plaintiffs have not provided an adequate showing of cause to justify their eleventh-hour request. For example, Plaintiffs do not state when they first consulted with the "engineer" expert, when they first retained him/her and/or what work product, if any, (s)he created. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 9/18/2020) (Aaron, Stewart)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER denying 147 Letter Motion for Discovery: Defendant Howmedica's Letter Motion for a Protective Order forbidding Plaintiffs from taking the remote deposition of Jack Jieafa is DENIED. The deposition shall proceed on 8/21/2020, but shall be limited to 90 minutes. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 8/18/2020) (Aaron, Stewart)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER with respect to 145 Letter Motion for Discovery: For clarification, Plaintiffs may inquire at the August 7 deposition regarding Biolox Head-related topics to the extent that such topics overlap with topics regarding the Summit Stem (e.g., C ourt Category No. 5, ECF No. 115). Otherwise, as set forth in my prior Order (ECF No. 144), Biolox Head-related topics are to be addressed in the second deposition. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 8/6/2020) (Aaron, Stewart)
August 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER granting 141 Letter Motion to Compel: Plaintiffs' Letter Motion is GRANTED. DePuy's offer to have its 30(b)(6) designee testify with respect to the Biolox Head only on certain topics (see DePuy Ltr. Resp., ECF No. 142, at 4 (refer encing categories 1, 2, 5, 7, 10, 11 and 12)), but not others, smacks of "cherry-picking." DePuy has not established an undue burden in having its designee testify about the remaining topics. Thus, the Court, in its discretion, hereby ORDER S that DePuy shall have a witness testify regarding the topics included in Plaintiffs' Second Amended Notice of Video Deposition (ECF No. 141-1, Ex. A). However, in order to ensure that DePuy has adequate time to prepare its witness to testify a bout the Biolox Head-related topics, DePuy has the option of notifying Plaintiffs' counsel no later than 12 noon EST on Tuesday, 8/4/2020, that it wishes to have its witness testify about those topics by remote deposition on a different, mutuall y agreeable later date within the Court-prescribed deadline, in which case such deposition shall not exceed one hour, with the time spent in both depositions counting against Plaintiffs' prescribed allotment. Thus, if DePuy exercises its option, and Plaintiffs' counsel intends to ask questions regarding the Biolox-Head-related topics, he must ensure that he leaves himself time to do so. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 8/1/2020) (Aaron, Stewart)
July 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER denying 135 Letter Motion to Compel: Plaintiffs Letter Motion (ECF No. 135) is DENIED. The deposition of Howmedica's corporate representative(s) shall be taken by videoconference no later than August 21, 2020, and shall not exceed eight hours in duration. Plaintiffs and Howmedica shall share the additional expenses of taking the deposition remotely by videoconference, as set forth in the Order. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 7/11/2020) (Aaron, Stewart)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER: IT IS, on this 10th day of June, 2020, ORDERED that the following are the deposition topics as to which an HOC witness or witnesses shall testify: Written materials or warnings that accompanied the MDM (including the Instructions for Use) during the period 2010 to 2017. The packaging, labeling and marketing of the MDM during the period 2010 to 2017. Any recalls initiated regarding the MDM. The history of the perfor mance of the MDM, including any reports of defects, failures or other adverse events. The intended, permitted or foreseeable use of the MDM within any other hip system, device or components, whether manufactured by HOC or any other manufacturer, and whether or not communicated to or authorized by the FDA or any other oversight authority. Any reactions caused by use and/or corrosion of the MDM, including hypersensitivit y, foreign body reaction, metal toxicity and allergic reactions. Any coatings used or considered for use on the MDM. The 510(k) application and approval process for the MDM. Failure rates associated with the MDM. The Design History File for the MDM and the information contained therein. Use of the MDM with components designed, manufactured and sold by other medical device manufacturers. Testing and/or analyses done on the MDM. So Ordered. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 6/10/2020) (js)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 108 Letter Motion for Discovery: DePuy's motion for a protective order is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The DePuy Rule 30(b)(6) witness or witnesses shall testify about the 12 categories enumerated in this Order. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 6/3/2020) (Aaron, Stewart)
March 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER denying 101 Letter Motion to Compel: Plaintiffs motion to compel further responses to their interrogatories is DENIED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 3/7/2020) (Aaron, Stewart)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rouviere et al v. Depuy Orthopaedics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jodi Rouviere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre Rouviere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Depuy Orthopaedics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Depuy Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Depuy International, Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stryker Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stryker Sales Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howmedica Osteonics Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?