Gamble v. Priston et al

Plaintiff: Kevin Gamble
Defendant: M. Balley, Corr. Officer J. Priston and S. Venne Steward
Case Number: 1:2018cv06309
Filed: July 12, 2018
Court: New York Southern District Court
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Unassigned
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
July 12, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
July 12, 2018 7 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of New York Eastern; Case Number: 1:18-cv-03286. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
July 6, 2018 6 Featured Case TRANSFER ORDER, The Clerk of Court is hereby directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. 28 U.S.C. 1391(b); 1404(a). No summons shall issue from this Court. A decision on Plaintiff s request to proceed in forma pauperis is reserved for the transferee court. The Court notes that Plaintiff failed to file a Prison Litigation Reform Act authorization form. That provision of Rule 83.1 of the Local Rules of the Eastern District of New York which requires a seven day delay is waived. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to serve a copy of this order on Plaintiff at his address of record and note service on the docket.Case transferred to District of SDNY. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 7/5/2018) c/m (Galeano, Sonia) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/12/2018.]
June 15, 2018 5 NOTICE, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to A Magistrate Judge, filed by Kevin Gamble. (Galeano, Sonia) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/12/2018.]
June 5, 2018 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/12/2018.]
May 30, 2018 3 Prisoner Authorization (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/12/2018.]
May 30, 2018 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kevin Gamble. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/12/2018.]
May 30, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against M. Balley, J. Priston, S. Venne Steward, filed by Kevin Gamble. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/12/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gamble v. Priston et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Balley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corr. Officer J. Priston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Venne Steward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Gamble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?