Sheldon v. Galant et al

Plaintiff: William Sheldon
Defendant: Dr. Galant
Case Number: 1:2018cv06320
Filed: July 12, 2018
Court: New York Southern District Court
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Unassigned
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
July 12, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
July 12, 2018 8 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of New York Northern; Case Number: 9:18-cv-00652. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
July 12, 2018 Notification to Superintendent of Filing - Provided Superintendent at Great Meadow Correctional Facility with notice of instant action and a copy of Plaintiff's #4 Inmate Authorization Form. USDC/NYND Finance Dept notified. (nas, ) [Transferred from New York Northern on 7/12/2018.]
July 12, 2018 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Notice of Compliance Deadline 8/13/2018 Case Review Deadline 9/12/2018 (nas, ) [Transferred from New York Northern on 7/12/2018.]
July 12, 2018 7 DECISION AND ORDER: ORDERED that plaintiff's in forma pauperis application (Dkt. No. #3 ) is GRANTED. ORDERED, that pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 21 and 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), Dr. Galant and all claims against him, are severed and transferred to the Southern District of New York; ORDERED, that no ruling is made as to the sufficiency of the Complaint with respect to the claims that have been severed and transferred to the Southern District, leaving that determination to the Southern District of New York. ORDERED, that the Clerk shall remove defendant Galant from the docket. ORDERED that if Plaintiff wishes to proceed with this action, he must file an Amended Complaint as set forth above within thirty (30) days from the date of the filing of this Decision and Order. ORDERED that, if Plaintiff timely files an Amended Complaint, this matter be returned to the Court for further review. ORDERED that if Plaintiff fails to timely file an Amended Complaint as directed, the Clerk shall enter judgment indicating that the remainder of this action is DISMISSED without prejudice without further order of this Court pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B) and 28 U.S.C. 1915A(b)(1) for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted and for failure to comply with this Decision and Order. ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for the appointment of counsel (Dkt. No. #6 ) is DENIED. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 7/12/18. {order served via regular mail on plaintiff}(nas) [Transferred from New York Northern on 7/12/2018.]
July 5, 2018 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by William Sheldon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (nas, ) [Transferred from New York Northern on 7/12/2018.]
June 20, 2018 5 TEXT ORDER REOPENING CASE: This action was administratively closed due to plaintiff's failure to comply with the filing fee requirements, and plaintiff was directed to respond to the Order if s/he wished to pursue this action. Plaintiff has now responded. The Clerk is directed to reopen this action and restore it to the Court's active docket. Authorized by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 6/20/18. {text order served via regular mail on plaintiff}(nas, ) [Transferred from New York Northern on 7/12/2018.]
June 20, 2018 4 INMATE AUTHORIZATION FORM by William Sheldon. (nas, ) [Transferred from New York Northern on 7/12/2018.]
June 20, 2018 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by William Sheldon. (nas, ) [Transferred from New York Northern on 7/12/2018.]
June 5, 2018 2 Featured Case ORDER Directing Administrative Closure with Opportunity to Comply with Filing Fee Requirement: ORDERED that because this action was not properly commenced, the Clerk is directed to administratively close this action. ORDERED that if plaintiff desires to pursue this action, he must so notify the Court WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS of the filing date of this Order and either (1) pay the full $400.00 filing fee for civil actions or (2) submit a completed and signed IFP Application that has been certified by an appropriate official at his facility and a signed Inmate Authorization Form. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 6/5/18. {order and blank forms served via regular mail on plaintiff}(nas) [Transferred from New York Northern on 7/12/2018.]
June 4, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against John/Jane Doe(s), Galant, D. Karandy, C.J. Koenigsmann, Albert Paolano filed by William Sheldon.(nas, ) [Transferred from New York Northern on 7/12/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sheldon v. Galant et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Galant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Sheldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?