Marzullo v. 621 Events, LLC

Plaintiff: Joseph Marzullo
Defendant: 621 Events, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv06352
Filed: July 13, 2018
Court: New York Southern District Court
Office: Foley Square Office
County: NewYork
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
August 28, 2018 MEDIATOR SESSION SCHEDULED First Mediation Session scheduled for 09/27/2018, 10 A.M. at Mediator's Office.(ah)
August 6, 2018 15 Featured Case ORDER granting #14 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Application granted. SO ORDERED. 621 Events, LLC answer due 9/28/2018. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 8/6/2018) (rj) Modified on 8/9/2018 (rj).
August 3, 2018 NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 9/4/2018.(mf)
August 3, 2018 14 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise Respond to Complaint addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Peter J. Tomao dated 8/3/18. Document filed by 621 Events, LLC.(Tomao, Peter)
August 2, 2018 13 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Peter Joseph Tomao on behalf of 621 Events, LLC. New Address:. (Tomao, Peter)
August 2, 2018 12 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by 621 Events, LLC.(Tomao, Peter)
August 2, 2018 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter Joseph Tomao on behalf of 621 Events, LLC. (Tomao, Peter)
July 18, 2018 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. 621 Events, LLC served on 7/18/2018, answer due 8/8/2018. Document filed by Joseph Marzullo. (Liebowitz, Richard)
July 18, 2018 9 Featured Case ORDER: This case, involving claims under the Copyright Act, 17 U.S.C. 101 et seq., has been assigned to this Court for all purposes. In the Court's experience, cases involving copyright claims often benefit from early mediation. To that end, prior to a Rule 16(b) case management conference, the Court is referring this case to the Mediation Office for settlement purposes under Local Civil Rule 83.9. The parties are hereby notified that Local Rule 83.9 shall govern the mediation, and the parties are directed to participate in the mediation in good faith. No later than one week after the conclusion of all mediation in this case, the parties are directed to notify the Court whether they successfully resolved the case in mediation. The Court specifically requests a mediator with expertise in copyright matters be assigned. To facilitate prompt mediation, the Court orders Plaintiff: to file proof of service no more than three days after service has been effected; and to produce to Defendant, by the earlier of 1) 14 days after service of process or 2) three business days in advance of any mediation session, copies of records sufficient to show the royalty paid the last three times the picture that is at issue in this case was licensed, as well as the number of times the picture was licensed in the last five years. This action is eligible for mediation subject to the limitations and restrictions as noted: ALL ISSUES ARE ELIGIBLE. Please reference the following when corresponding with the Mediation Office. E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone (212) 805-0643, and facsimile (212) 805-0647. Mediator to be Assigned by 7/30/2018. Mediator Expertise Request due by 7/23/2018. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 7/18/2018) (mro)
July 17, 2018 8 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Liebowitz, Richard)
July 16, 2018 7 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (vf)
July 16, 2018 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 621 Events, LLC. (vf)
July 16, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
July 16, 2018 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (vf)
July 16, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (vf)
July 16, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Richard Liebowitz to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Nature of Suit; Origin; Basis of Jurisdiction; Courthouse Assignment Sections not provided. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (vf)
July 16, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Richard Liebowitz to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): civil cover sheet caption not complete. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (vf)
July 16, 2018 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Liebowitz, Richard) Modified on 7/16/2018 (vf).
July 13, 2018 4 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review.(Liebowitz, Richard)
July 13, 2018 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Liebowitz, Richard) Modified on 7/16/2018 (vf).
July 13, 2018 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 621 Events, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Joseph Marzullo. (Liebowitz, Richard)
July 13, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against 621 Events, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15317747)Document filed by Joseph Marzullo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit A-2, #3 Exhibit A-3, #4 Exhibit A-4, #5 Exhibit B-1, #6 Exhibit B-2, #7 Exhibit B-3, #8 Exhibit B-4, #9 Exhibit C, #10 Exhibit D-1, #11 Exhibit D-2, #12 Exhibit D-3, #13 Exhibit D-4)(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marzullo v. 621 Events, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Marzullo
Represented By: Richard Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 621 Events, LLC
Represented By: Peter Joseph Tomao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?