Batmanghelidj v. The International Academy of Hope et al

Plaintiff: Nahal Batmanghelidj
Defendant: The Sarah Jane Brain Foundation and The International Academy of Hope
Case Number: 1:2018cv06562
Filed: July 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Victor Marrero
Nature of Suit: Qui Tam (31 U.S.C. § 3729(a))
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. The time for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to September 21, 2018. The International Academy of Hope answer due 9/21/2018; The Sarah Jane Brain Foundation answer due 9/21/2018. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods part 1 Judge. on 8/24/2018) (js) Modified on 8/24/2018 (js).
August 23, 2018 Filing 9 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer - first request - addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Anthony J. Tomari dated August 23, 2018. Document filed by The International Academy of Hope, The Sarah Jane Brain Foundation.(Tomari, Anthony)
August 6, 2018 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. The Sarah Jane Brain Foundation served on 8/1/2018, answer due 8/22/2018. Service was accepted by Charles Hammerman, Board Member. Document filed by Nahal Batmanghelidj. (Licul, Valdi)
July 30, 2018 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. The International Academy of Hope served on 7/26/2018, answer due 8/16/2018. Service was accepted by Frances Martin, Social Worker. Document filed by Nahal Batmanghelidj. (Licul, Valdi)
July 23, 2018 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The International Academy of Hope, The Sarah Jane Brain Foundation. (pne)
July 23, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
July 23, 2018 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
July 23, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Victor Marrero. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
July 23, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joshua Tarrant-Windt on behalf of Nahal Batmanghelidj. (Tarrant-Windt, Joshua)
July 23, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Valdi Licul on behalf of Nahal Batmanghelidj. (Licul, Valdi)
July 23, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Debra L. Raskin to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): THE WRONG NATURE OF SUIT AND CIVIL COVER SHEET WAS SELECTED. YOU MUST USE THE CIVIL COVER SHEET FORM FOUND ON OUR WEBSITE WITH CORRESPONDING NATURE OF SUITS THAT ARE IN OUR CM/ECF SYSTEM. IF THE NATURE OF SUIT YOU SELECTED IS NOT ON OUR CIVIL COVER SHEET, WE CANNOT ASSIGN A DISTRICT JUDGE TO THIS MATTER VIA our CM/ECF SYSTEM. PLEASE ALSO SEE THE AMENDED STANDING ORDER 15MC131 FOR THE TYPES OF FILINGS TO BE OPENED ELECTRONICALLY VS. IN PERSON. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct SDNY PDF form with one nature of suit selected. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (pne)
July 20, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The International Academy of Hope and The Sarah Jane Brain Foundation, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Nahal Batmanghelidj. (Raskin, Debra)
July 20, 2018 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Raskin, Debra) Modified on 7/23/2018 (pne).
July 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The International Academy of Hope, The Sarah Jane Brain Foundation. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15350708)Document filed by Nahal Batmanghelidj.(Raskin, Debra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Batmanghelidj v. The International Academy of Hope et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Sarah Jane Brain Foundation
Represented By: Anthony John Tomari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The International Academy of Hope
Represented By: Anthony John Tomari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nahal Batmanghelidj
Represented By: Debra L. Raskin
Represented By: Valdi Licul
Represented By: Joshua Tarrant-Windt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?