Natural Resources Defense Council et al v. Zinke et al
Plaintiff: Humane Society of the United States, Natural Resources Defense Council, Center For Biological Diversity and Humane Society International
Defendant: U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, Department of the Interior, Jim Kurth, Greg Sheehan and Ryan Zinke
Case Number: 1:2018cv06903
Filed: August 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: NewYork
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2018 Filing 34 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jennifer Ann Jude on behalf of Department of the Interior, Jim Kurth, Greg Sheehan, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, Ryan Zinke. (Jude, Jennifer)
August 20, 2018 Filing 33 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Department of the Interior served on 8/16/2018, answer due 10/15/2018; Jim Kurth served on 8/16/2018, answer due 10/15/2018; Greg Sheehan served on 8/16/2018, answer due 10/15/2018; U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service served on 8/16/2018, answer due 10/15/2018; Ryan Zinke served on 8/16/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council; Humane Society of the United States; Humane Society International; Center For Biological Diversity. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Benjamin J. Link)(Dubner, Jeffrey)
August 14, 2018 Filing 32 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Department of the Interior, Jim Kurth, Greg Sheehan, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, Ryan Zinke. (jgo)
August 14, 2018 Filing 31 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Department of the Interior, Jim Kurth, Greg Sheehan, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, Ryan Zinke. (jgo)
August 14, 2018 Filing 30 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Ryan Zinke, in his official capacity; Department of the Interior; U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service; Jim Kurth, in his official capacity; and Greg Sheehan, in his official capacity, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Center For Biological Diversity, Humane Society International, Humane Society of the United States, Natural Resources Defense Council. (Dubner, Jeffrey)
August 14, 2018 Filing 29 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Ryan Zinke, in his official capacity; Department of the Interior; U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service; Jim Kurth, in his official capacity; and Greg Sheehan, in his official capacity, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Center For Biological Diversity, Humane Society International, Humane Society of the United States, Natural Resources Defense Council. (Dubner, Jeffrey)
August 14, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Jeffrey Benjamin Dubner to RE-FILE Document No. #23 Request for Issuance of Summons, #24 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons; These parties were previously issued a summons. If you require a new summons you must request an Amended Summons. Please include the word "Amended" on the summons PDF. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
August 13, 2018 Filing 28 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council.(Dubner, Jeffrey)
August 13, 2018 Filing 27 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Humane Society of the United States.(Dubner, Jeffrey)
August 13, 2018 Filing 26 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Humane Society International.(Dubner, Jeffrey)
August 13, 2018 Filing 25 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Center For Biological Diversity.(Dubner, Jeffrey)
August 13, 2018 Filing 24 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ryan Zinke, in his official capacity; U.S. Department of the Interior; U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service; Jim Kurth, in his official capacity; and Greg Sheehan, in his official capacity, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Center For Biological Diversity, Humane Society International, Humane Society of the United States, Natural Resources Defense Council. (Dubner, Jeffrey) Modified on 8/14/2018 (dnh).
August 13, 2018 Filing 23 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ryan Zinke, in his official capacity; U.S. Department of the Interior; U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service; Jim Kurth, in his official capacity; and Greg Sheehan, in his official capacity, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Center For Biological Diversity, Humane Society International, Humane Society of the United States, Natural Resources Defense Council. (Dubner, Jeffrey) Modified on 8/14/2018 (dnh).
August 9, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Jeffrey Benjamin Dubner to RE-FILE Document No. #14 Request for Issuance of Summons, #15 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Summons may only be requested for parties of record. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
August 9, 2018 Filing 22 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ryan Zinke. (dnh)
August 9, 2018 Filing 21 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Greg Sheehan. (dnh)
August 9, 2018 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jim Kurth. (dnh)
August 9, 2018 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service. (dnh)
August 9, 2018 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Department of the Interior. (dnh)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 11/16/2018 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 906, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan; and as further set forth in this Order. Parties ordered to submit via ECF proposed case management plan and joint letter seven days before conference. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 8/8/2018) (anc)
August 6, 2018 Filing 16 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ryan Zinke, in his official capacity, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Center For Biological Diversity, Humane Society International, Humane Society of the United States, Natural Resources Defense Council. (Dubner, Jeffrey) Modified on 8/9/2018 (dnh).
August 6, 2018 Filing 15 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Geoffrey S. Berman, U.S. Attorney for the Southern District of New York, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Center For Biological Diversity, Humane Society International, Humane Society of the United States, Natural Resources Defense Council. (Dubner, Jeffrey) Modified on 8/7/2018 (dnh). Modified on 8/9/2018 (dnh).
August 6, 2018 Filing 14 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jefferson B. Sessions, U.S. Attorney General, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Center For Biological Diversity, Humane Society International, Humane Society of the United States, Natural Resources Defense Council. (Dubner, Jeffrey) Modified on 8/7/2018 (dnh). Modified on 8/9/2018 (dnh).
August 6, 2018 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Greg Sheehan, in his official capacity, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Center For Biological Diversity, Humane Society International, Humane Society of the United States, Natural Resources Defense Council. (Dubner, Jeffrey) Modified on 8/9/2018 (dnh).
August 6, 2018 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jim Kurth, in his official capacity, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Center For Biological Diversity, Humane Society International, Humane Society of the United States, Natural Resources Defense Council. (Dubner, Jeffrey) Modified on 8/9/2018 (dnh).
August 6, 2018 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Center For Biological Diversity, Humane Society International, Humane Society of the United States, Natural Resources Defense Council. (Dubner, Jeffrey) Modified on 8/9/2018 (dnh).
August 6, 2018 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of the Interior, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Center For Biological Diversity, Humane Society International, Humane Society of the United States, Natural Resources Defense Council. (Dubner, Jeffrey) Modified on 8/9/2018 (dnh).
August 2, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Jeffrey Benjamin Dubner to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Request for Issuance of Summons, #5 Request for Issuance of Summons, #9 Request for Issuance of Summons, #8 Request for Issuance of Summons, #3 Request for Issuance of Summons, #4 Request for Issuance of Summons, #7 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the summons is not the official A.O. Summons form. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
August 2, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
August 2, 2018 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
August 2, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
August 2, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jeffrey Benjamin Dubner. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Jim Kurth, Greg Sheehan, Ryan Zinke. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (pc)
August 1, 2018 Filing 9 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Geoffrey S. Berman, U.S. Attorney for the Southern District of New York, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Center For Biological Diversity, Humane Society International, Humane Society of the United States, Natural Resources Defense Council. (Dubner, Jeffrey) Modified on 8/2/2018 (pc).
August 1, 2018 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jefferson B. Sessions, U.S. Attorney General, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Center For Biological Diversity, Humane Society International, Humane Society of the United States, Natural Resources Defense Council. (Dubner, Jeffrey) Modified on 8/2/2018 (pc).
August 1, 2018 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ryan Zinke, in his official capacity, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Center For Biological Diversity, Humane Society International, Humane Society of the United States, Natural Resources Defense Council. (Dubner, Jeffrey) Modified on 8/2/2018 (pc).
August 1, 2018 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Greg Sheehan, in his official capacity, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Center For Biological Diversity, Humane Society International, Humane Society of the United States, Natural Resources Defense Council. (Dubner, Jeffrey) Modified on 8/2/2018 (pc).
August 1, 2018 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jim Kurth, in his official capacity, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Center For Biological Diversity, Humane Society International, Humane Society of the United States, Natural Resources Defense Council. (Dubner, Jeffrey) Modified on 8/2/2018 (pc).
August 1, 2018 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Center For Biological Diversity, Humane Society International, Humane Society of the United States, Natural Resources Defense Council. (Dubner, Jeffrey) Modified on 8/2/2018 (pc).
August 1, 2018 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of the Interior, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Center For Biological Diversity, Humane Society International, Humane Society of the United States, Natural Resources Defense Council. (Dubner, Jeffrey) Modified on 8/2/2018 (pc).
August 1, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Dubner, Jeffrey)
August 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Department of the Interior, Jim Kurth, Greg Sheehan, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, Ryan Zinke. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15393226)Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Humane Society of the United States, Humane Society International, Center For Biological Diversity.(Dubner, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Natural Resources Defense Council et al v. Zinke et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Jude
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of the Interior
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Jude
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Kurth
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Jude
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Sheehan
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Jude
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Zinke
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Jude
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Humane Society of the United States
Represented By: Jeffrey Benjamin Dubner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natural Resources Defense Council
Represented By: Jeffrey Benjamin Dubner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center For Biological Diversity
Represented By: Jeffrey Benjamin Dubner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Humane Society International
Represented By: Jeffrey Benjamin Dubner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?