Corbett v. City Of New York et al
Plaintiff: Jonathan Corbett
Defendant: Thomas M. Prasso and City Of New York
Case Number: 1:2018cv07022
Filed: August 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: NewYork
Presiding Judge: Katherine Polk Failla
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Letter Motion for Conference. Application GRANTED. A pre-motion conference is hereby scheduled for October 3, 2018, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 618 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. In light of this request, Defendant's time to answer the Complaint is hereby EXTENDED until after their motion to dismiss has been decided. (Pre-Motion Conference set for 10/3/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 618, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla.) (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 8/27/2018) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (rro)
August 27, 2018 Filing 8 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Jonathan Corbett dated 08/27/2018 re: #7 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Conference on defendants' motion to dismiss addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Annette Lalic dated August 27, 2018. Plaintiff does not oppose.. Document filed by Jonathan Corbett. (Corbett, Jonathan)
August 27, 2018 Filing 7 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Conference on defendants' motion to dismiss addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Annette Lalic dated August 27, 2018. Document filed by City Of New York, Thomas M. Prasso.(Lalic, Annette)
August 27, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Annette Marie Lalic on behalf of City Of New York, Thomas M. Prasso. (Lalic, Annette)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: granting #3 Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing. On August 9, 2018, Plaintiff filed a motion for permission to participate in the Court's electronic filing system. (Dkt. # 3). Plaintiff's motion includes all necessary information and affirmations, and is therefore GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to allow Plaintiff access to the electronic filing system and terminate the motion appearing at Docket Entry # 3.SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 8/13/2018) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (ama)
August 9, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION FOR PERMISSION FOR ELECTRONIC CASE FILING: re: for Permission for Jonathan Corbett to participate in electronic case filing in this case. Document filed by Jonathan Corbett.(sc)
August 6, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to City Of New York. (pc)
August 6, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Thomas M. Prasso. (pc)
August 6, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (pc) (pc).
August 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City Of New York, Thomas M. Prasso. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 465401215075)Document filed by Jonathan Corbett.(pc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/6/2018: #1 Exhibits) (pc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Corbett v. City Of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas M. Prasso
Represented By: Annette Marie Lalic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of New York
Represented By: Annette Marie Lalic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Corbett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?