Percy v. Inside Edition, Inc.

Plaintiff: Billups P. Percy
Defendant: Inside Edition, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv07060
Filed: August 6, 2018
Court: New York Southern District Court
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Richard J Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 17, 2018 14 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE TERMINATED- SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a final decision was rendered on 9/17/2018 in a court action filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (Attachments: #1 Order) (ne)
September 17, 2018 13 Featured Case ORDER: The Court is in receipt of a letter from Plaintiff informing the Court that the parties have "reached[ed a] settlement in princip[le)." (Doc. No. 12.) Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT this case is dismissed with prejudice but without costs, and that the initial conference currently scheduled to be held on Friday, September 21, 2018 is cancelled. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT the Court retains jurisdiction to enforce the settlement agreement. See Kokkonen v. Guardian Life Ins. Co. of Am., 511U.S.375, 381 (1994). However, within thirty days of the date of this Order, any party may send a letter requesting to restore this action to the docket with an explanation for the request. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to close this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 9/17/2018) (ne)
September 13, 2018 12 NOTICE of Settlement and Request for 30-day discontinuance. Document filed by Billups P. Percy. (Dunne, Joseph)
September 5, 2018 11 Featured Case ORDER: Initial Conference set for 9/21/2018 at 11:45 AM in Courtroom 905, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan, and as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 9/5/2018) (jca)
September 4, 2018 10 ANSWER to #6 Complaint. Document filed by Inside Edition, Inc..(Penchina, Robert)
September 4, 2018 9 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent CBS Corporation, Corporate Parent National Amusements, Inc. for Inside Edition, Inc.. Document filed by Inside Edition, Inc..(Penchina, Robert)
August 8, 2018 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Inside Edition, Inc.. (dnh)
August 7, 2018 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Inside Edition, Inc., re: #6 Complaint. Document filed by Billups P. Percy. (Dunne, Joseph)
August 7, 2018 6 COMPLAINT against Inside Edition, Inc.. Document filed by Billups P. Percy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Dunne, Joseph)
August 7, 2018 5 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (jgo)
August 7, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Joseph Anthony Dunne to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): due to party modification, the wrong filer was selected for the request for issuance of summons;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
August 7, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
August 7, 2018 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
August 7, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Richard J. Sullivan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
August 7, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Joseph Anthony Dunne to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): due to party modification, the wrong filer/filers were selected for the pleading;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
August 7, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Joseph Anthony Dunne. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Billups P. Percy. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (jgo)
August 6, 2018 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST FILER ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Inside Edition, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Billups Percy. (Dunne, Joseph) Modified on 8/7/2018 (jgo).
August 6, 2018 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Dunne, Joseph)
August 6, 2018 2 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review.(Dunne, Joseph)
August 6, 2018 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - COMPLAINT against Inside Edition, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15413717)Document filed by Billups Percy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Dunne, Joseph) Modified on 8/7/2018 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Percy v. Inside Edition, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inside Edition, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Penchina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billups P. Percy
Represented By: Joseph Anthony Dunne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?