Heargear, LLC v. 180s LLC et al
Plaintiff: HEARGEAR, LLC
Defendant: Patriarch Partners, LLC and 180s LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv07098
Filed: August 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2018 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Initial Conference served on Counsel for Defendants on September 5, 2018. Document filed by Heargear, LLC. (Lindenbaum, Jeffrey)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Defendants to answer or otherwise move is extended to October 22, 2018. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
August 29, 2018 Filing 12 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Jonathan Bach dated August 29, 2018. Document filed by 180s LLC, Patriarch Partners, LLC.(Bach, Jonathan)
August 17, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Nesheiwat on behalf of Heargear, LLC. (Nesheiwat, Michael)
August 13, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 11/8/2018 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 8/10/2018) (ne)
August 8, 2018 Filing 9 AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (jgo)
August 8, 2018 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Patriarch Partners, LLC. (jgo)
August 8, 2018 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 180s LLC. (jgo)
August 8, 2018 Case Eligible for Patent Pilot Program. (jgo)
August 8, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
August 8, 2018 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
August 8, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
August 8, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jeffrey A. Lindenbaum. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Heargear, LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps;. (jgo)
August 8, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jeffrey A. Lindenbaum. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
August 7, 2018 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by HEARGEAR, LLC.(Lindenbaum, Jeffrey)
August 7, 2018 Filing 5 AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review.(Lindenbaum, Jeffrey)
August 7, 2018 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Patriarch Partners, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by HEARGEAR, LLC. (Lindenbaum, Jeffrey)
August 7, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 180s LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by HEARGEAR, LLC. (Lindenbaum, Jeffrey)
August 7, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Lindenbaum, Jeffrey)
August 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 180s LLC, Patriarch Partners, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15418863)Document filed by HEARGEAR, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 330 Patent, #2 Exhibit B - 878 Patent)(Lindenbaum, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heargear, LLC v. 180s LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HEARGEAR, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Lindenbaum
Represented By: Michael Nesheiwat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patriarch Partners, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan Paul Bach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 180s LLC
Represented By: Jonathan Paul Bach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?