Delacruz v. Bright Horizons Family Solutions LLC
Plaintiff: Emanuel Delacruz
Defendant: Bright Horizons Family Solutions LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv07228
Filed: August 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to #4 Complaint. Document filed by Bright Horizons Family Solutions LLC.(McCloskey, Rebecca)
August 31, 2018 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Bright Horizons Family Solutions LLC.(McCloskey, Rebecca)
August 20, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Bright Horizons Family Solutions LLC served on 8/14/2018, answer due 9/4/2018. Service was accepted by DONNA SNOW, AGENT. Document filed by Emanuel Delacruz. (Mizrahi, Joseph)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 11/15/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/14/2018) (cf)
August 13, 2018 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bright Horizons Family Solutions LLC. (pne)
August 13, 2018 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Bright Horizons Family Solutions LLC. Document filed by Emanuel Delacruz.(Mizrahi, Joseph)
August 13, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Joseph H Mizrahi to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason: the pleading was not signed. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pne)
August 13, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
August 13, 2018 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
August 13, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
August 10, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bright Horizons Family Solutions LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Emanuel Delacruz. (Mizrahi, Joseph)
August 10, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Mizrahi, Joseph)
August 10, 2018 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SIGNATURE ERROR - COMPLAINT against Bright Horizons Family Solutions LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15434930)Document filed by Emanuel Delacruz.(Mizrahi, Joseph) Modified on 8/13/2018 (pne).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Delacruz v. Bright Horizons Family Solutions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emanuel Delacruz
Represented By: Joseph H Mizrahi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bright Horizons Family Solutions LLC
Represented By: Rebecca Marie McCloskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?