Range, Jr. v. 451 Broome Street Corp. et al
Plaintiff: King Range, Jr.
Defendant: 451 Broome Street Corp. and JRA Trademark Company, Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2018cv07245
Filed: August 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: NewYork
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David John Grech on behalf of JRA Trademark Company, Ltd.. (Grech, David)
September 28, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mercedes Colwin on behalf of JRA Trademark Company, Ltd.. (Colwin, Mercedes)
September 28, 2018 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint., CROSSCLAIM against JRA Trademark Company, Ltd.. Document filed by 451 Broome Street Corp..(Ehrlich, Gary)
September 28, 2018 Filing 13 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by 451 Broome Street Corp..(Ehrlich, Gary)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Defendant 451 Broome Street Corp. to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is hereby EXTENDED to September 28, 2018. Plaintiff shall promptly file proof of service of the summons and Complaint on Defendant 451 Broome Street Corp. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
September 7, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gary Scott Ehrlich on behalf of 451 Broome Street Corp.. (Ehrlich, Gary)
September 7, 2018 Filing 10 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to the Complaint addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Gary Ehrlich dated 9/7/18. Document filed by 451 Broome Street Corp..(Ehrlich, Gary)
August 30, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam Saul Hanski on behalf of King Range, Jr.. (Hanski, Adam)
August 17, 2018 Terminate Mediation Case Tracking Deadlines: Mediator Assignment Deadline, Mediator Expertise Request Deadline (mf)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that this case is referred for mediation to the Court-annexed Mediation Program. The parties are hereby notified that Local Rule 83.9 shall govern the mediation and are directed to participate in the mediation in good faith. The mediation should take place prior to the Initial Pretrial Conference, which is currently scheduled (by separate Order to be entered today) for November 14, 2018. The mediation will have no effect upon any scheduling Order issued by this Court without leave of this Court. This action is eligible for mediation subject to the limitations and restrictions as noted: ALL ISSUES ARE ELIGIBLE. Please reference the following when corresponding with the Mediation Office. E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone (212) 805-0643, and facsimile (212) 805-0647. Mediator to be Assigned by 8/24/2018. Mediator Expertise Request due by 8/20/2018. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 8/14/2018) (mro)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING EARLY MEDIATION AND THE INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to this Court for all purposes. In the Court's experience, cases of this nature often benefit from early mediation. To that end, by separate Order to be entered today, the Court is referring this case to the Court-annexed Mediation Program. Unless and until the Court orders otherwise, the parties shall schedule a mediation to take place before the initial pretrial conference scheduled below. Further, if the parties believe that there is need for limited discovery to facilitate the mediation, they shall confer with respect to the scope of such discovery and promptly raise any disputes with the Court in accordance with its Individual Rules and Practices in Civil Cases (available at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judge/Furman). Initial Conference set for 11/14/2018 at 03:15 PM in Courtroom 1105 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 8/14/2018) (mro)
August 13, 2018 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to JRA Trademark Company, Ltd.. (jgo)
August 13, 2018 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 451 Broome Street Corp.. (jgo)
August 13, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
August 13, 2018 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
August 13, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
August 10, 2018 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JRA Trademark Company, Ltd., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by King Range, Jr.. (Parker, Glen)
August 10, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 451 Broome Street Corp., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by King Range, Jr.. (Parker, Glen)
August 10, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Parker, Glen)
August 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 451 Broome Street Corp., JRA Trademark Company, Ltd.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15437033)Document filed by King Range, Jr..(Parker, Glen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Range, Jr. v. 451 Broome Street Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: King Range, Jr.
Represented By: Glen Howard Parker
Represented By: Adam Saul Hanski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 451 Broome Street Corp.
Represented By: Gary Scott Ehrlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JRA Trademark Company, Ltd.
Represented By: Mercedes Colwin
Represented By: David John Grech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?