Ryeco, LLC v. M/V MSC Pina et al
Plaintiff: Ryeco, LLC
Defendant: M/V MSC Vittoria, M/V MSC Pina, Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A. and Mediterranean Shipping Company (USA) Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv07397
Filed: August 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: NewYork
Presiding Judge: Katherine B Forrest
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333 ad
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that plaintiff Ryeco, LLC, by and through undersigned counsel and pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i), hereby voluntarily dismisses its claims against defendants M/V MSC Pina, M/V MSC Vittoria, Mediterranean Shipping Company (USA) Inc. and Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A. in their entirety, with prejudice and without costs to either side. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 9/10/2018) (ne)
August 29, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) All Defendants. Document filed by Ryeco, LLC. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).. (Brown, Gregory)
August 16, 2018 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to M/V MSC Vittoria. (jgo)
August 16, 2018 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to M/V MSC Pina. (jgo)
August 16, 2018 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.. (jgo)
August 16, 2018 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mediterranean Shipping Company (USA) Inc.. (jgo)
August 16, 2018 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
August 16, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
August 16, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine B. Forrest. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
August 16, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Gregory Adam Brown. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: M/V MSC Pina; M/V MSC Vittoria. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (jgo)
August 16, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Gregory Adam Brown. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 46:30701; County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1333; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
August 15, 2018 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ryeco, LLC. (Brown, Gregory)
August 15, 2018 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mediterranean Shipping Company (USA) Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ryeco, LLC. (Brown, Gregory)
August 15, 2018 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to M/V MSC Vittoria, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ryeco, LLC. (Brown, Gregory)
August 15, 2018 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to M/V MSC Pina, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ryeco, LLC. (Brown, Gregory)
August 15, 2018 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Ryeco, LLC.(Brown, Gregory)
August 15, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Brown, Gregory)
August 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against M/V MSC Pina, M/V MSC Vittoria, Mediterranean Shipping Company (USA) Inc., Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15454734)Document filed by Ryeco, LLC.(Brown, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ryeco, LLC v. M/V MSC Pina et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V MSC Vittoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V MSC Pina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mediterranean Shipping Company (USA) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryeco, LLC
Represented By: Gregory Adam Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?