Allianz China General Insurance Company, Ltd. v. Transatlantic Marine Claims Agency, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Allianz China General Insurance Company, Ltd.
Defendant: David Tan and Transatlantic Marine Claims Agency, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv07399
Filed: August 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: NewYork
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 fd
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2018 Filing 16 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Transatlantic Marine Claims Agency, Inc. served on 8/17/2018, answer due 9/7/2018. Service was accepted by Howard Simmons, Esq.. Document filed by Allianz China General Insurance Company, Ltd.. (Crawford, Philip)
August 22, 2018 Filing 15 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. David Tan(President of Transatlantic Marine Claims Agency, Inc.) served on 8/17/2018, answer due 9/7/2018. Service was accepted by Howard Simmons, Esq.. Document filed by Allianz China General Insurance Company, Ltd.. (Crawford, Philip)
August 17, 2018 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Transatlantic Marine Claims Agency, Inc.. (dnh)
August 17, 2018 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to David Tan(President of Transatlantic Marine Claims Agency, Inc.), David Tan(individually). (dnh)
August 17, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Philip Warren Crawford to RE-FILE Document No. #11 Request for Issuance of Summons, #8 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): #8 Request for Issuance of Summons - the form used for the summons is blank. #11 Request for Issuance of Summons- this summons request was previously issued to party. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 12/14/2018 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 906, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. (As further set forth in this Order.) Parties ordered to submit via ECF proposed case management plan and joint letter seven days before conference. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 8/16/2018) (cf)
August 16, 2018 Filing 11 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST - PREVIOUSLY ISSUED TO PARTY - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to David Tan, Individually and as President of Transatlantic Marine Claims Agency, Inc., re: #6 Complaint. Document filed by Allianz China General Insurance Company, Ltd.. (Crawford, Philip) Modified on 8/17/2018 (dnh).
August 16, 2018 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Transatlantic Marine Claims Agency, Inc., re: #6 Complaint. Document filed by Allianz China General Insurance Company, Ltd.. (Crawford, Philip)
August 16, 2018 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to David Tan, Individually and as President of Transatlantic Marine Claims Agency, Inc., re: #6 Complaint. Document filed by Allianz China General Insurance Company, Ltd.. (Crawford, Philip)
August 16, 2018 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUESTED BLANK SUMMONS FORM - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to David Tan, Individually and as President of Transatlantic Marine Claims Agency, Inc., re: #6 Complaint. Document filed by Allianz China General Insurance Company, Ltd.. (Crawford, Philip) Modified on 8/17/2018 (dnh).
August 16, 2018 Filing 7 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Crawford, Philip)
August 16, 2018 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against David Tan, Transatlantic Marine Claims Agency, Inc., David Tan. Document filed by Allianz China General Insurance Company, Ltd..(Crawford, Philip)
August 16, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Philip Warren Crawford. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: David Tan. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (jgo)
August 16, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Philip Warren Crawford to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): pdf case caption does not match initial pleading caption;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
August 16, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Philip Warren Crawford to RE-FILE re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF. Add party David Tan with party text 'as President of Transatlantic Marine Claims Agency, Inc.'; all of the parties whom the pleading is against were not selected. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
August 16, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
August 16, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Philip Warren Crawford. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of U.S.;. (jgo)
August 16, 2018 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
August 16, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Philip Warren Crawford to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons, #3 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): pdf case caption does not match initial pleading caption;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
August 16, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
August 15, 2018 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Beijing Jingdong 360 Du E-Commerce Ltd., Corporate Parent China Sinda Intellectual Property Ltd., Corporate Parent Shenzhen Huijingtongda Business Consulting Co. Ltd., Corporate Parent Shanghai Snow Light Investment Management Center, Corporate Parent Allianz SE for Allianz China General Insurance Company, Ltd.. Document filed by Allianz China General Insurance Company, Ltd..(Crawford, Philip)
August 15, 2018 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to David Tan, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Allianz China General Insurance Company, Ltd.. (Crawford, Philip) Modified on 8/16/2018 (jgo).
August 15, 2018 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Transatlantic Marine Claims Agency, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Allianz China General Insurance Company, Ltd.. (Crawford, Philip) Modified on 8/16/2018 (jgo).
August 15, 2018 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Crawford, Philip) Modified on 8/16/2018 (jgo).
August 15, 2018 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - COMPLAINT against David Tan, Transatlantic Marine Claims Agency, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15455032)Document filed by Allianz China General Insurance Company, Ltd..(Crawford, Philip) Modified on 8/16/2018 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allianz China General Insurance Company, Ltd. v. Transatlantic Marine Claims Agency, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Tan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transatlantic Marine Claims Agency, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allianz China General Insurance Company, Ltd.
Represented By: Philip Warren Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?