Securities and Exchange Commission v. Moore et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: James Bernard Moore and Universal Voicetech, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv07803
Filed: August 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2018 Filing 19 AMENDED NOTICE of Mailing Address of Defendant, James Bernard Moore. Current address is Inmate #14532-104, FDC Miami Federal Detention Center, P.O. Box 019120, Miami Florida 33101;however, will be permanently assigned to D.Ray James Correctional Institution, P.O. Box 2000, Folkston, Georgia 31537. Document filed by James Bernard Moore. (kv)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on #15 granting in part #11 Letter Motion to Stay. ENDORSEMENT: Defendants' application (Dkt. No. 11) is GRANTED in part. This action is stayed until the conclusion of the related criminal case (United States v. James Moore, 18-mj-7370-UA-1). All conferences and other deadlines are cancelled. The parties shall inform the Court when the related criminal case is resolved, and shall file a joint status letter by November 12, 2018, and every 45 days thereafter updating the Court on the status of the criminal proceedings. Defendants' request for a 16 month stay is DENIED, without prejudice to renewal at the conclusion of the related criminal case. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mail a copy of this Order to the pro se Defendants. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/26/2018) (ne) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
September 26, 2018 Case Stayed (ne)
September 26, 2018 Mailed a copy of #18 Order on Motion to Stay, to James Bernard Moore c/o David M. Garvin, P.A. 200 S. Biscayne Ave. Ste. 3150 Miami, FL 33131; Universal Voicetech, Inc. 9 Island Avenue Apt. 1904 Miami Beach FL 33139. (vba)
September 26, 2018 Mailed a copy of #16 Order, Set Deadlines, to James Bernard Moore c/o David M. Garvin, P.A. 200 S. Biscayne Ave. Ste. 3150 Miami, FL 33131; Universal Voicetech, Inc. 9 Island Avenue Apt. 1904 Miami Beach FL 33139. (vba) Modified on 9/26/2018 (vba).
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file a response to Defendants' motion no later than October 10, 2018. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mail a copy of this Order to the pro se Defendants. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Responses due by 10/10/2018) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/25/2018) (cf) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
September 25, 2018 Filing 15 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Preethi Krishnamurthy dated 09/25/2018 re: #11 MOTION to Stay. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Krishnamurthy, Preethi)
September 25, 2018 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Court's Order scheduling initial pretrial conference and the Court's individual rules served on defendants James Bernard Moore and Universal Voicetech, Inc. on 09/14/2018. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Krishnamurthy, Preethi)
September 24, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE OF MAILING ADDRESS OF DEFENDANT, JAMES BERNARD MOORE. Document filed by James Bernard Moore. (sc)
September 24, 2018 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by James Bernard Moore.(mro)
September 20, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (sac)
September 20, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION re: to Stay Proceedings. Document filed by James Bernard Moore. (sac)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 10/23/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 1106, Thurgood Marshal Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/13/2018) (jca)
September 5, 2018 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. James Bernard Moore served on 9/4/2018, answer due 9/25/2018. Service was accepted by James Bernard Moore. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Krishnamurthy, Preethi)
September 5, 2018 Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (bcu)
September 5, 2018 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (bcu)
September 5, 2018 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:17-cv-04950-LGS. Notice of Assignment to follow. (bcu)
August 31, 2018 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Universal Voicetech, Inc.. (dnh)
August 31, 2018 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to James Bernard Moore. (dnh)
August 30, 2018 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Defendant Universal Voicetech, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Krishnamurthy, Preethi)
August 30, 2018 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Defendant James Bernard Moore, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Krishnamurthy, Preethi)
August 28, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Preethi Krishnamurthy on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission. (Krishnamurthy, Preethi)
August 28, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Marc Peter Berger. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code XX Out of State. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to New York. (pc)
August 28, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (pc)
August 28, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
August 28, 2018 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Lorna G. Schofield as possibly related to 17cv4950. (pc)
August 27, 2018 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 17-cv-4950. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission.(Berger, Marc)
August 27, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Berger, Marc)
August 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against James Bernard Moore, Universal Voicetech, Inc.. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission.(Berger, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Moore et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Bernard Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Voicetech, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Marc Peter Berger
Represented By: Preethi Krishnamurthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?