United States of America, Department of Justice, Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco Firearms and Explosives v. Messados Inc.
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA and United States of America, Department of Justice, Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco Firearms and Explosives
Defendant: Messados and Messados Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv07925
Filed: August 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Edgardo Ramos
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2018 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Messados Inc.. (dnh)
September 20, 2018 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Messados, Inc., re: #4 Complaint. Document filed by United States of America, Department of Justice, Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco Firearms and Explosives. (Cowart, Brandon)
August 31, 2018 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Messados Inc.. Document filed by United States of America, Department of Justice, Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco Firearms and Explosives.(Cowart, Brandon)
August 31, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Brandon Herbert Cowart to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong filer/filers were selected for the request for issuance of summons. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pne)
August 31, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Brandon Herbert Cowart to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reasons: the wrong filer/filers were selected for the pleading; the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected; names of plaintiff and defendant are incorrect on the docket entry for Document No. #1 . Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pne)
August 31, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Brandon Herbert Cowart. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $3000. The following correction has been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to No Dollar Demand. (pne)
August 31, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Brandon Herbert Cowart. The party information for the following parties has been modified: United States of America, Department of Justice, Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco Firearms and Explosives, Messados Inc.. The information for the parties has been modified for the following reason: party name contained a typographical error. (pne)
August 31, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
August 31, 2018 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
August 31, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
August 30, 2018 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST FILER ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Messados, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Cowart, Brandon) Modified on 8/31/2018 (pne).
August 30, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Cowart, Brandon)
August 30, 2018 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - FILER ERROR -COMPLAINT against Messados. Document filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(Cowart, Brandon) Modified on 8/31/2018 (pne).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America, Department of Justice, Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco Firearms and Explosives v. Messados Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Messados
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Messados Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Brandon Herbert Cowart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America, Department of Justice, Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco Firearms and Explosives
Represented By: Brandon Herbert Cowart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?