Moler v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: IKAIKA MOLER
Defendant: Tote Services, United States Department of Transportation, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, United States Department of Transportation Maritime Administration, Acme Industrial, INc. and Tote, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv07991
Filed: August 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bruce Allan Ross on behalf of United States of America. (Ross, Bruce)
October 29, 2018 Filing 26 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from DAVID L. SCHER, ESQ. dated October 29, 2018 re: JOINT STATUS LETTER. Document filed by Ikaika Moler.(Scher, David)
October 29, 2018 Filing 25 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Ikaika Moler. (Scher, David)
October 22, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven J. Miller on behalf of Acme Industrial, Inc.. (Miller, Steven)
October 12, 2018 Filing 23 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Acme Industrial, Inc.. (dnh)
October 11, 2018 Filing 22 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #21 Letter filed by Ikaika Moler. ENDORSEMENT: DENIED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 10/11/2018) (mro)
October 11, 2018 Filing 21 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from DAVID L. SCHER, ESQ. dated October 11, 2018 re: Adjournment of 11/5/18 conference request. Document filed by Ikaika Moler.(Scher, David)
October 11, 2018 Filing 20 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ACME INDUSTRIAL, INC., re: #2 Complaint,. Document filed by Ikaika Moler. (Scher, David)
October 3, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney David Louis Scher to RE-FILE Document No. #19 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): 'As to' Error; the defendant name listed on the pdf and the docket entry must exactly match the party of record. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
October 2, 2018 Filing 19 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ACME INDUSTRIAL, re: #2 Complaint,. Document filed by Ikaika Moler. (Scher, David) Modified on 10/3/2018 (dnh).
September 27, 2018 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (dnh)
September 26, 2018 Filing 17 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States of America, re: #2 Complaint,. Document filed by Ikaika Moler. (Scher, David)
September 25, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney David Louis Scher to RE-FILE Document No. #8 Request for Issuance of Summons, #7 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): 'C/o' Error; 'c/o' must be included before the second party name (for example, United States of America c/o U.S. Attorney's Office). Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
September 25, 2018 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Tote, Inc.. (dnh)
September 25, 2018 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Tote Services. (dnh)
September 25, 2018 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Transportation Maritime Administration. (dnh)
September 25, 2018 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Transportation. (dnh)
September 24, 2018 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Tote, Inc., re: #2 Complaint,. Document filed by Ikaika Moler. (Scher, David)
September 24, 2018 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Tote Services, re: #2 Complaint,. Document filed by Ikaika Moler. (Scher, David)
September 24, 2018 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Transportation Maritime Administration, re: #2 Complaint,. Document filed by Ikaika Moler. (Scher, David)
September 24, 2018 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Transportation, re: #2 Complaint,. Document filed by Ikaika Moler. (Scher, David)
September 24, 2018 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States of America, re: #2 Complaint,. Document filed by Ikaika Moler. (Scher, David) Modified on 9/25/2018 (dnh).
September 24, 2018 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States of America Attorney General of the United States, re: #2 Complaint,. Document filed by Ikaika Moler. (Scher, David) Modified on 9/25/2018 (dnh).
September 6, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Louis Scher on behalf of Ikaika Moler. (Scher, David)
September 6, 2018 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Scher, David)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Initial Conference set for 11/5/2018 at 11:40 AM in Courtroom 15D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Analisa Torres. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 9/5/2018) (cf)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. (As further set forth in this Order.) The parties are free to withhold consent without negative consequences. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 9/5/2018) (cf)
September 4, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
September 4, 2018 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
September 4, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
September 4, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney David Louis Scher. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 05:8715; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1346; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (sj)
September 4, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney David Louis Scher. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Ikaika Moler; United States of America; United States Department of Transportation Maritime Administration. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party role was entered incorrectly. (sj)
September 4, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney David Louis Scher to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; the form used for the civil cover sheet is not the S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet form dated June 2017; the event wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (sj)
August 31, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Acme Industrial, INc., Tote Services, Tote, Inc., UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, United States Department of Transportation, United States Department of Transportation Maritime Administration. Document filed by IKAIKA MOLER.(Scher, David)
August 31, 2018 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - COMPLAINT against Acme Industrial, INc., Tote Services, Tote, Inc., UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, United States Department of Transportation, United States Department of Transportation Maritime Administration. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15520045)Document filed by IKAIKA MOLER.(Scher, David) Modified on 9/4/2018 (sj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moler v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IKAIKA MOLER
Represented By: David Louis Scher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tote Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Transportation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Bruce Allan Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Transportation Maritime Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acme Industrial, INc.
Represented By: Steven J. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tote, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?