Hong v. Aigle et al
Plaintiff: Brandon Hong
Defendant: C.O. Aigle and Security Captain Graham
Interested Party: CITY OF NEW YORK
Case Number: 1:2018cv08110
Filed: September 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED UNEXECUTED as to Graham. Document filed by Graham. (Maginley-Liddie, Lynelle)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Aigle waiver sent on 10/10/2018, answer due 12/10/2018. Document filed by Aigle. (Maginley-Liddie, Lynelle)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRO SE MEMORANDUM dated 9/25/2018 re: CHANGE OF ADDRESS for Brandon Hong. New Address: 4411801569, 15-00 Hazen Street, Elmhurst, NY, 11370. (kv)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Aimee Kara Lulich on behalf of CITY OF NEW YORK. (Lulich, Aimee)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 FRCP 4 SERVICE PACKAGE MAILED to Brandon Hong 4411801569, at NIC 1500 Hazen Street, East Elmhurst, NY 11370, on 9/17/2018 Re: #6 Order of Service, via REGULAR MAIL. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge. (sbr)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Mailed a copy of #6 Order of Service, to New York City Department of Correction 75-20 Astoria Blvd. East Elmhurst, NY 11370 and the New York City Law Department Corporation Counsel for the City of NY 100 Church Street New York, NY 10007. (aea)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF SERVICE: The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, together with an information package. The Clerk of Court is further directed to notify the New York City Department of Correction and the New York City Law Department of this order. The Court requests that Correction Officer Aigle and Security Captain Graham waive service of summons. Local Civil Rule 33.2 applies to this action. Within 120 days of the date of this order, Defendants must serve responses to these standard discovery requests. In their responses, Defendants must quote each request verbatim. SO ORDERED. Waiver of Service due by 10/15/2018. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 9/13/2018) (ne) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (wb)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Mailed a copy of #4 Order Granting IFP Application in Prisoner Case, to Brandon Hong NYSID: 11687360L B&C No. 4411801569 North Infirmary Command 15-00 Hazen Street East Elmhurst, NY 11370; Superintendent North Infirmary Command 15-00 Hazen Street East Elmhurst, NY 11370. (aea)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION IN PRISONER CASE: The Clerk of Court is directed to send a copy of this order and the prisoner authorization to the agency having custody of Plaintiff. That agency is directed to forward copies of Plaintiff's prison trust fund account for the past six months and to disburse the payments required under 28 U.S.C. 1915 to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York and to include the above docket number on the disbursement before sending it to the Court. If Plaintiff is transferred to another facility, the current facility shall provide a copy of this order to the facility to which Plaintiff is transferred. The Clerk of Court is also directed to send a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. Finally, it is Plaintiff's obligation to promptly submit a written notification to the Court if Plaintiff's address changes, and the Court may dismiss the action if Plaintiff fails to do so. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 9/10/2018) (anc) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by Brandon Hong.(sac)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Aigle, Graham. Document filed by Brandon Hong.(sac)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Brandon Hong.(sac)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hong v. Aigle et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Hong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. Aigle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Security Captain Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CITY OF NEW YORK
Represented By: Aimee Kara Lulich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?