Range, Jr. v. Prince Street-Soho, LLC et al
Plaintiff: King Range, Jr.
Defendant: Prince Street-Soho, LLC and Woolrich, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv08303
Filed: September 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Sarah Elizabeth Bell to RE-FILE Document #15 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. ERROR(S): Not All Corporate Parents were added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s) one party name at a time. (lb)
November 8, 2018 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Prince Street-Soho, LLC, Woolrich, Inc..(Sigda, Eric)
November 8, 2018 Filing 15 FILING ERROR NOT ALL CORPORATE PARENTS/OTHER AFFILIATES WERE ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Woolrich International Ltd. for Woolrich, Inc.. Document filed by Woolrich, Inc..(Bell, Sarah) Modified on 11/9/2018 (lb).
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 12/7/2018 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 12C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Gregory H. Woods; and as further set forth in this Order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 10/31/2018) (anc)
October 29, 2018 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Judge Richard J. Sullivan is no longer assigned to the case. (sjo)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #12 Motion for Robert S. Fine to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 10/19/2018) (ne)
October 18, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #12 MOTION for Robert S. Fine to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-15772065. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jc)
October 18, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Robert S. Fine to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-15772065. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Prince Street-Soho, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fine, Robert)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Defendants' deadline to answer the complaint is extended to November 8, 2018. SO ORDERED. (Prince Street-Soho, LLC answer due 11/8/2018; Woolrich, Inc. answer due 11/8/2018) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 10/9/2018) (jca)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 12/7/2018 at 10:45 AM in Courtroom 905, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 10/9/2018) (jca)
October 9, 2018 Filing 9 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Eric B Sigda dated October 9, 2018. Document filed by Prince Street-Soho, LLC. Return Date set for 11/8/2018 at 05:30 PM.(Sigda, Eric)
October 2, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam Saul Hanski on behalf of King Range, Jr.. (Hanski, Adam)
September 13, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam Saul Hanski on behalf of King Range, Jr.. (Hanski, Adam)
September 13, 2018 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Woolrich, Inc.. (pne)
September 13, 2018 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Prince Street-Soho, LLC. (pne)
September 13, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
September 13, 2018 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
September 13, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Richard J. Sullivan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
September 12, 2018 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Woolrich, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by King Range, Jr.. (Parker, Glen)
September 12, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Prince Street-Soho, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by King Range, Jr.. (Parker, Glen)
September 12, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Parker, Glen)
September 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Prince Street-Soho, LLC, Woolrich, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15560167)Document filed by King Range, Jr..(Parker, Glen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Range, Jr. v. Prince Street-Soho, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: King Range, Jr.
Represented By: Glen Howard Parker
Represented By: Adam Saul Hanski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prince Street-Soho, LLC
Represented By: Robert S Fine
Represented By: Eric Bruce Sigda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woolrich, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?