Nachshen v. East 14 Realty, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Steven Nachshen
Defendant: H.K. Second Ave Restaurant Inc. and East 14 Realty, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv08304
Filed: September 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned attorneys, that the time for defendant H.K. SECOND AVE RESTAURANT INC. to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is hereby extended until November 30, 2018. The parties hereby consent to electronic service per Rule 5(b)(2)(E) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. SO ORDERED. (H.K. Second Ave Restaurant Inc. answer due 11/30/2018.) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 11/1/2018) (rro)
October 30, 2018 Filing 10 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by H.K. Second Ave Restaurant Inc.. (Pizzuto, Philip)
October 2, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam Saul Hanski on behalf of Steven Nachshen. (Hanski, Adam)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 1/25/2019 at 03:15 PM in Courtroom 906 of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse at 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. Parties ordered to submit via ECF proposed case management plan and joint letter seven days before conference. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 9/17/2018) (mro)
September 13, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam Saul Hanski on behalf of Steven Nachshen. (Hanski, Adam)
September 13, 2018 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to H.K. Second Ave Restaurant Inc.. (pne)
September 13, 2018 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to East 14 Realty, LLC. (pne)
September 13, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
September 13, 2018 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
September 13, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
September 12, 2018 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to East 14 Realty, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Steven Nachshen. (Parker, Glen)
September 12, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to H.K. SECOND AVE RESTAURANT INC., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Steven Nachshen. (Parker, Glen)
September 12, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Parker, Glen)
September 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against East 14 Realty, LLC, H.K. Second Ave Restaurant Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15560236)Document filed by Steven Nachshen.(Parker, Glen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nachshen v. East 14 Realty, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Nachshen
Represented By: Glen Howard Parker
Represented By: Adam Saul Hanski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.K. Second Ave Restaurant Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East 14 Realty, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?