Abruzzi Investments LLC v. 3CD, LLC et al

Plaintiff: ABRUZZI INVESTMENTS LLC
Defendant: 3CD, LLC and LANCE RICHARD HALL
Case Number: 1:2018cv08346
Filed: September 13, 2018
Court: New York Southern District Court
Presiding Judge: Valerie E Caproni
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 22, 2018 16 Featured Case ORDER: granting #15 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The initial pre-trial conference is adjourned to December 7, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. with the parties' letter due November 28, 2018. Counsel for Defendants is directed to file a notice of appearance on ECF as soon as possible. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 12/7/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 10/22/2018) (ama)
October 22, 2018 15 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Nicholas M. Menasche dated October 22, 2018. Document filed by Abruzzi Investments LLC.(Menasche, Nicholas)
October 22, 2018 14 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Summons and Amended Complaint, served. Lance Richard Hall served on 10/17/2018, answer due 11/7/2018. Service was accepted by Lance Richard Hall. Document filed by Abruzzi Investments LLC. (Menasche, Nicholas)
October 10, 2018 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against 3CD, LLC, Lance Richard Hall with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Abruzzi Investments LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Menasche, Nicholas)
October 1, 2018 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. 3CD, LLC served on 9/18/2018, answer due 10/12/2018. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty, an agent of the Secretary of State, of the State of New York. Service was made by Mail also. Document filed by Abruzzi Investments LLC. (Menasche, Nicholas)
October 1, 2018 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. 3CD, LLC served on 9/21/2018, answer due 10/12/2018. Service was accepted by Lance Richard Hall. Document filed by Abruzzi Investments LLC. (Menasche, Nicholas)
October 1, 2018 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Lance Richard Hall served on 9/21/2018, answer due 10/12/2018. Service was accepted by Lance Richard Hall. Document filed by Abruzzi Investments LLC. (Menasche, Nicholas)
September 18, 2018 9 Featured Case NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Counsel for all parties are directed to appear before the undersigned for an Initial Pretrial Conference ("IPTC") in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on November 2, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 443 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York, 10007. This Court encourages plaintiffs to serve defendants promptly. The parties are directed to submit a joint letter of no more than five pages by October 25, 2018, addressing the following in separate paragraphs. By the date of the IPTC, counsel for all parties are required to register as filing users in accordance with the Procedures of Electronic Case Filing and file a Notice of Appearance. Plaintiff's counsel, or the defendant's counsel in removed cases, is responsible for distributing copies of this Notice to all parties. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 11/2/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 9/18/2018) (ama)
September 17, 2018 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 3CD, LLC. (dnh)
September 14, 2018 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 3CD, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Abruzzi Investments LLC. (Menasche, Nicholas)
September 14, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Nicholas Maurice Menasche to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): party name on 'as to' docket entry text does not exactly match as listed on initial pleading caption;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
September 14, 2018 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lance Richard Hall. (jgo)
September 14, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
September 14, 2018 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
September 14, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
September 14, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Nicholas Maurice Menasche. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Abruzzi Investments LLC; Lance Richard Hall. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps;. (jgo)
September 14, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Nicholas Maurice Menasche. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 15:294; County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1332; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
September 13, 2018 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by ABRUZZI INVESTMENTS LLC.(Menasche, Nicholas)
September 13, 2018 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lance Richard Hall, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by ABRUZZI INVESTMENTS LLC. (Menasche, Nicholas)
September 13, 2018 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 3D, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by ABRUZZI INVESTMENTS LLC. (Menasche, Nicholas) Modified on 9/14/2018 (jgo).
September 13, 2018 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Menasche, Nicholas)
September 13, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against 3CD, LLC, LANCE RICHARD HALL. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15566772)Document filed by ABRUZZI INVESTMENTS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Menasche, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abruzzi Investments LLC v. 3CD, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABRUZZI INVESTMENTS LLC
Represented By: Nicholas Maurice Menasche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3CD, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LANCE RICHARD HALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?