Schlossberg v. Bumble Trading, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Dylan Schlossberg
Defendant: Bumble Holding Ltd. and Bumble Trading, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv08376
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: New York Southern District Court
Presiding Judge: Deborah A Batts
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332dtp
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 7, 2018 19 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Badoo Trading Limited for Bumble Holding Ltd.. Document filed by Bumble Holding Ltd..(Rhodes, Michael)
November 7, 2018 18 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Bumble Holding Limited for Bumble Trading, Inc.. Document filed by Bumble Trading, Inc..(Rhodes, Michael)
November 7, 2018 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Max A Bernstein on behalf of Bumble Holding Ltd., Bumble Trading, Inc.. (Bernstein, Max)
November 7, 2018 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sarah Malke Lightdale on behalf of Bumble Holding Ltd., Bumble Trading, Inc.. (Lightdale, Sarah)
November 7, 2018 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kyle C. Wong on behalf of Bumble Holding Ltd., Bumble Trading, Inc.. (Wong, Kyle)
November 7, 2018 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Graham Rhodes on behalf of Bumble Holding Ltd., Bumble Trading, Inc.. (Rhodes, Michael)
October 25, 2018 13 Featured Case ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE FOR MAX A. BERNSTEIN granting #10 Motion for Max A. Bernstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts on 10/25/2018) (jca)
October 25, 2018 12 Featured Case ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #8 Motion for Michael G. Rhodes to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts on 10/25/2018) (jca)
October 25, 2018 11 Featured Case ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #9 Motion for Kyle C. Wong to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts on 10/25/2018) (jca)
October 18, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #9 MOTION for Kyle Christopher Wong to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-15772923. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #8 MOTION for Michael Graham Rhodes to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-15772817. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #10 MOTION for Max A. Bernstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-15772977. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
October 18, 2018 10 MOTION for Max A. Bernstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-15772977. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Bumble Holding Ltd., Bumble Trading, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Max A. Bernstein, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Bernstein, Max)
October 18, 2018 9 MOTION for Kyle Christopher Wong to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-15772923. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Bumble Holding Ltd., Bumble Trading, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kyle C. Wong, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Wong, Kyle)
October 18, 2018 8 MOTION for Michael Graham Rhodes to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-15772817. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Bumble Holding Ltd., Bumble Trading, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael G. Rhodes, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Rhodes, Michael)
October 17, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #7 MOTION for David Christopher Parisi to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-15760173. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of California (our court does not accept state bar certificates for California). Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Attorney Affidavit/Declaration - attach Proposed Order. (jc)
October 17, 2018 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for David Christopher Parisi to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-15760173. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Dylan Schlossberg. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of David C. Parisi, #2 Certificate of Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Parisi, David) Modified on 10/17/2018 (jc).
October 15, 2018 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Bumble Holding Ltd. waiver sent on 10/10/2018, answer due 1/8/2019; Bumble Trading, Inc. waiver sent on 10/10/2018, answer due 1/8/2019. Document filed by Dylan Schlossberg. (Parasmo, Grace)
September 17, 2018 5 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Grace E. Parasmo on behalf of Dylan Schlossberg. New Address: Parasmo Lieberman Law, 33 West 60th Street, 2nd Floor, New York, New York, USA 10023, 646-509-3913. (Parasmo, Grace)
September 17, 2018 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bumble Holding Ltd., Bumble Trading, Inc.. (pne)
September 17, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Grace E. Parasmo. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Dylan Schlossberg. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (pne)
September 17, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
September 17, 2018 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
September 17, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Deborah A. Batts. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
September 14, 2018 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bumble Trading, Inc. and Bumble Holding, Ltd., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Dylan Schlossberg. (Parasmo, Grace)
September 14, 2018 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Parasmo, Grace)
September 14, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Bumble Holding Ltd., Bumble Trading, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15568739)Document filed by Dylan Schlossberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Parasmo, Grace)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schlossberg v. Bumble Trading, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dylan Schlossberg
Represented By: Grace E. Parasmo
Represented By: David Parisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bumble Holding Ltd.
Represented By: Michael Graham Rhodes
Represented By: Max A Bernstein
Represented By: Kyle C. Wong
Represented By: Sarah Malke Lightdale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bumble Trading, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Graham Rhodes
Represented By: Max A Bernstein
Represented By: Kyle C. Wong
Represented By: Sarah Malke Lightdale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?